Securities and Exchange Commission v. Alternate Energy Holdings, Inc et al

Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Alternate Energy Holdings, Inc, Donald L Gillispie, Jennifer Ransom, Bosco Financial, LLC and Energy Executive Consulting, LLC
 
Case Number: 1:2010cv00621
Filed: December 16, 2010
 
Court: Idaho District Court
Office: Boise - Southern Office
County: Ada - Southern
Referring Judge: Ronald E Bush
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Lodge
 
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 1, 2012 165 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER RE: SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION'S AMENDED MOTION TO COMPEL granting 137 Motion to Compel, but only insofar as ordering Defendant to respond to the at-issue Requests for Production of Documents by May 8, 2012 and in a manner consistent with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Ronald E Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (krb)
March 13, 2013 241 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 201 Motion to Strike ; granting 216 Motion to Supplement; granting in part and denying in part 219 Motion for Order to Show Cause; granting 222 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)
November 4, 2013 264 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 258 Plaintiff's Renewed Request to Freeze Approximately $2 Million; granting 259 Plaintiff's Request for Judicial Notice. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Alternate Energy Holdings, Inc et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Mark Philip Fickes
Represented By: David A Berman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alternate Energy Holdings, Inc
Represented By: Richard Alan Roth
Represented By: Richard H Greener
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald L Gillispie
Represented By: Richard Alan Roth
Represented By: Richard H Greener
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Ransom
Represented By: Richard H Greener
Represented By: Richard Alan Roth
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bosco Financial, LLC
Represented By: Richard H Greener
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Energy Executive Consulting, LLC
Represented By: Richard H Greener
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]