Hill v. United States of America et al

Defendant: United States of America and John H Truksa
Plaintiff: Sean C Hill
Case Number: 1:2011cv00413
Filed: September 2, 2011
Court: Idaho District Court
Office: Boise - Southern Office
County: Canyon - Southern
Presiding Judge: B. Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 21, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 32 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. In accordance with the Memorandum Decision set out above, IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Negligence and Proximate Cause (Dkt. 32) is GRANTED. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
October 1, 2013 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO STAY granting 47 Motion to Stay, and all time limits and deadlines in this case with the one exception listed below - are extended for a period of time equal to the duration of the lapse in appropriations to the Department of Justice. Depositions and court hearings are vacated. The parties shall cooperatively establish new dates for depositions. HOWEVER, this stay does not apply to applications for emergency relief of any type in stayed cases. Thus, motions for tempor ary restraining orders and preliminary injunctions will proceed. This Order shall apply nunc pro tunc to 10/1/2013. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)
October 2, 2013 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER LIFTING STAY. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)
July 15, 2014 81 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 77 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. United States of America et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John H Truksa
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean C Hill
Represented By: John W Kluksdal
Represented By: Kira Dale Pfisterer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]