United States of America v. 478 West Great Basin Drive, Meridian, Ada County, Idaho

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: 478 West Great Basin Drive, Meridian, Ada County, Idaho
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv00426
Filed: September 13, 2011
 
Court: Idaho District Court
Office: Boise - Southern Office
County: Ada - Southern
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
 
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 08:1324
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 24, 2012 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION AND AGREEMENT FOR SETTLEMENT OF CLAIM approving and granting 27 Stipulation and Agreement for Settlement of Claim. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)
April 24, 2012 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION AND NOTICE OF AGREEMENT FOR PAYMENT OF TAXES TO ADA COUNTY TREASURER approving and granting 28 Stipulation and Notice of Agreement for Payment of Taxes to Ada County, Idaho. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)
April 24, 2012 34 Opinion or Order of the Court DEFAULT JUDGMENT as to Jorge Pacheco in favor of United States of America against 478 West Great Basin Drive, Meridian, Ada County, Idaho. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)
June 29, 2012 36 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, DECREE OF FORFEITURE AND CERTIFICATE OF REASONABLE CAUSE granting 35 Motion for Entry of Judgment. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (krb)
September 13, 2012 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PETITION FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS granting 37 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)(Emailed to hg and jd in Finance by cjm.) Modified on 9/14/2012 to remove sealed designation given by motion per verification with law clerk, LC3/js. NEF regenerated (cjm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: United States of America v. 478 West Great Basin Drive, Meridian, Ada County, Idaho
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Anthony G Hall
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 478 West Great Basin Drive, Meridian, Ada County, Idaho
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]