Idaho Trust Bank v. BancInsure, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Idaho Trust Bank
Defendant: BancInsure, Inc. and Continental Casualty Company
Case Number: 1:2012cv00032
Filed: January 24, 2012
Court: Idaho District Court
Office: Boise - Southern Office
County: Ada - Southern
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 20, 2014 132 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER ON CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT denying 95 Defendant BancInsure Inc's Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 98 Plaintiff Idaho Trust Bank's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)
August 15, 2014 173 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER RE: BANCINSURE'S MOTION FOR STAY (DKT. 152). It is hereby ordered: Defendant BancInsure's Motion for Stay 152 is GRANTED. This case is stayed through 8/21/2014. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
August 31, 2012 49 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 20 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Ronald E Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (krb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Idaho Trust Bank v. BancInsure, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Idaho Trust Bank
Represented By: Erik F Stidham
Represented By: Kevin C Braley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BancInsure, Inc.
Represented By: Brian L Bradford
Represented By: Carleton R Burch
Represented By: David T DiBiase
Represented By: Phillip S Oberrecht
Represented By: Randall Lee Schmitz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Casualty Company
Represented By: Tyler J Anderson
Represented By: Michele On-ja Choe
Represented By: Gerald T Husch
Represented By: LaMar F Jost
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]