Bricklayers of Western Pennsylvania Pension Plan v. Hecla Mining Company et al

Plaintiff: Bricklayers of Western Pennsylvania Pension Plan
Defendant: Hecla Mining Company, Phillips S. Baker, Jr. and James A. Sabala
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00042
Filed: February 1, 2012
 
Court: Idaho District Court
Office: CDA - Northern Office
County: Kootenai - Northern
Presiding Judge: B. Lynn Winmill
 
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 26, 2013 104 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting with leave to amend 92 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs may file an amended complaint on or before 10/18/2013. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)
November 5, 2013 105 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in accordance with the 104 Memorandum Decision and Order. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that judgment be entered in favor of defendants, and that this case be dismissed in its entirety with prejudice. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)
July 12, 2012 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying (25) Motion to Consolidate Cases; denying (12) Motion to Consolidate Cases; granting (18) Motion ; denying (21) Motion to Consolidate Cases; denying (21) Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying (24) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 2:1 2-cv-00042-BLW; denying (22) Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying (15) Motion to Consolidate Cases; denying (16) Motion to Consolidate Cases; granting (18) Motion ; denying (21) Motion to Consolidate Cases; denying (22) Motion to Consolidate Cases i n case 2:12-cv-00067-BLW. Institutional Investors shall be the lead plaintiffs, and their counsel shall be appointed lead counsel.Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. Associated Cases: 2:12-cv-00042-BLW, 2:12-cv-00067-BLW(caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Bricklayers of Western Pennsylvania Pension Plan v. Hecla Mining Company et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bricklayers of Western Pennsylvania Pension Plan
Represented By: Philip Howard Gordon
Represented By: Bruce S Bistline
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hecla Mining Company
Represented By: Albert P Barker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillips S. Baker, Jr.
Represented By: Albert P Barker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James A. Sabala
Represented By: Albert P Barker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]