Athome Care, Inc. v. The Evangelical Lutheran Good Samaritan Society

Defendant: The Evangelical Lutheran Good Samaritan Society
Plaintiff: Athome Care, Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00053
Filed: February 7, 2012
 
Court: Idaho District Court
Office: Boise - Southern Office
County: Ada - Southern
Presiding Judge: B. Lynn Winmill
 
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
April 25, 2012 17 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 7 Motion to Change Venue. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)
October 10, 2012 23 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER adopting 2 ] Stipulation for Protective Order. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)
April 30, 2013 40 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 34 Motion to Compel the Production of Documents. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)
July 16, 2013 54 Featured Case ORDER granting Plaintiff's 46 Second Motion to Compel the Production of Financial Documents. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Athome Care, Inc. v. The Evangelical Lutheran Good Samaritan Society
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Evangelical Lutheran Good Samaritan Society
Represented By: Keely E Duke
Represented By: Sanja Prutina
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Athome Care, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Charles Morris
Represented By: Daniel W Bower
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]