Fleming v. Escort, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Hoyt A Fleming
Defendant: Escort, Inc., Beltronics USA, Inc., Best Buy Co., Inc., Amazon.com, Inc., Hayneedle, Inc., Buy.com, Inc., Tigerdirect, Inc., Fry's Electronics, Herrington Catalog, Buy Radar Detectors, Inc., Best Radar Detectors, ABT, Inc., J&R Music and Computer World, Sears Holding Corp., 1stRadarDetectors, Beach Camera/Buydig.com, Inc., AM Merchandising, Inc., Excel Distributing, Inc., DBSouth, Inc., Fulfillment Services, Inc., Car Toys, Inc. and DAS Distributors, Inc.
Counter_claimant: Escort, Inc. and Beltronics USA, Inc.
Counter_defendant: Hoyt A Fleming
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00066
Filed: February 13, 2012
 
Court: Idaho District Court
Office: Boise - Southern Office
County: Ada - Southern
Presiding Judge: B. Lynn Winmill
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 30, 2013 103 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER the motion to vacate Markman hearing (docket no. 78 ) is GRANTED and the hearing set for November 8, 2013, is VACATED. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
March 12, 2014 138 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER The motion to dismiss (docket no. 63 ) is DENIED. The motion to supplement (docket no. 66 ) is GRANTED. The motion to supplement motion to set aside default (docket no. 58 ) and the motion to set aside default (dock et no. 51 ) are GRANTED. the default (docket no. 48 ) is SET ASIDE and Beach Camera/Buydig.com Inc. is reinstated as a party defendant. Fleming's request for attorney fees (made in briefing and not by motion) is DENIED. Beach Cameras motion fo r extension regarding discovery (docket no. 55 ) is DEEMED MOOT. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp) Modified on 3/12/2014 to edit text (jp).
September 29, 2014 178 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER The motion for sanctions and to terminate (docket 144 ) and the motion for an order to show cause (docket 71 ) are GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The motion to compel regarding electronically stored information a nd for sanctions (docket 135 ) is GRANTED. The motion for preliminary injunction (docket 145 ) is DENIED. The motion to strike, or in the alternative to file sur-reply brief (docket 101 ) is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The motion to enforc e Local Rule 3.4 (docket 107 ) is DEEMED MOOT. The motion to supplement patent invalidity contentions (docket 76 ) is GRANTED and defendants shall file their supplement within 20 days from the date of this Order. The motion to clarify (docket 77) i s GRANTED. the Second Motion to Dismiss (docket 79 ) is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The motion for protective order and sanctions (docket 81 ) is GRANTED IN PART AND DECLARED MOOT IN PART. The motions to unseal (docket 72 , 87 & 117 ) a re DENIED. The motion to unseal (docket 95 ) is GRANTED. The motion to file redacted version (docket no. 105 ) is DENIED. the motion to add the 9500ix (docket 86 ) is GRANTED. The motion to compel privilege log (docket 124 ) is GRANTED. The motion to compel redactions log and sanctions (docket 119 ) is DEEMED MOOT. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
March 6, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 10 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; conditionally granting in part and denying in part 18 Motion to Dismiss. The Clerk shall send out a Notice of a Case Management Conference to all counsel. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (krb)
April 30, 2013 44 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER. It is hereby ordered, that the Court will reserve ruling on the 43 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant Beach Camera/Buy.Dig.Com. It is further ordered, that Fleming shall file, within ten days, an aff idavit in support of his motion explaining (1) whether he was proceeding under Idaho Rule 4(d)(4)(B); and, if so, (2) how he complied with each requirement of that Rule, and how he obtained the address of Beach Camera. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)
August 5, 2013 61 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER, granting in part and denying in part 33 MOTION to Dismiss Counts One and Two of the Complaint; granting in pary and denying in part 42 MOTION to Dismiss Counts One and Two of the Complaint; granting MO TION to Stay the Remaining Claims. This action is stayed against all defendants except Escort until further order of this Court. The action against Escort shall proceed and is not subject to this stay. Claim Construction Hearing set for 11/8/2013 09:00 AM in Boise - Courtroom 3 before Judge B. Lynn Winmill. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Fleming v. Escort, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hoyt A Fleming
Represented By: Steven F Schossberger
Represented By: Bradlee R Frazer
Represented By: Michael S Dowler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Escort, Inc.
Represented By: Terry C Copple
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beltronics USA, Inc.
Represented By: Terry C Copple
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best Buy Co., Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hayneedle, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buy.com, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tigerdirect, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fry's Electronics
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herrington Catalog
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buy Radar Detectors, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best Radar Detectors
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABT, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J&R Music and Computer World
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sears Holding Corp.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1stRadarDetectors
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beach Camera/Buydig.com, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AM Merchandising, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Excel Distributing, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DBSouth, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fulfillment Services, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Car Toys, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAS Distributors, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Escort, Inc.
Represented By: Terry C Copple
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Beltronics USA, Inc.
Represented By: Terry C Copple
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Hoyt A Fleming
Represented By: Michael S Dowler
Represented By: Bradlee R Frazer
Represented By: Steven F Schossberger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]