Watters et al v. Otter et al

Plaintiff: Occupy Boise, Edward Watters, Steven Farnworth, Dean Gunderson and Matthew Alexander Neiwirth
Defendant: C.L. (Butch) Otter, Teresa Luna and G. Jerry Russell
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00076
Filed: February 17, 2012
 
Court: Idaho District Court
Office: Boise - Southern Office
County: Ada - Southern
Presiding Judge: B. Lynn Winmill
 
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 26, 2013 115 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 82 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; deeming as moot 84 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)
November 1, 2013 119 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER Occupy Boise's Second Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Dkt. 106 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as set forth in this decision. Occupy Boise's Amended First Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Dkt . 116 ) is GRANTED to the extent that Occupy Boise sought to make clear that it never withdrew its challenges to the 2012 rules, but it is DENIED to the extent that Occupy Boise sought a ruling that its challenges to the deleted or revised 2012 rules was not moot. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
December 9, 2013 122 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER Occupy Boise's Second Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 106 is Granted in part and Denied in part. Occupy Boise's Amended First Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 116 is GRANTED to the extent that Occu py Boise sought to make clear that it never withdrew its challenges to the 2012 rules, but it is DENIED to the extent that Occupy Boise sought a ruling that its challenges to the deleted or revised 2012 rules was not moot. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp) Modified on 12/9/2013 to link to dkt 119 (jp).
June 11, 2014 140 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER the motion to dismiss (docket no. 133 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' third motion for partial summary judgment (docket no. 126 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
February 26, 2012 17 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 4 Motion for TRO/Injunctive Relief. The State is directed to delay seizing any personal belongings related to camping, and cooking and fire building materials, until 3/2/2012. This injunction shall be in full force and effect until the Court rules after the evidentiary hearing. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by cjm)
June 8, 2012 53 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 24 Motion to modify or clarify preliminary injunction. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (dks)
September 4, 2012 70 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 67 Motion for Protective Order. the State shall submit a clean electronic copy of the withheld documents under seal by 9/6/2012. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Watters et al v. Otter et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Occupy Boise
Represented By: Bryan Keith Walker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Watters
Represented By: Bryan Keith Walker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Farnworth
Represented By: Bryan Keith Walker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dean Gunderson
Represented By: Bryan Keith Walker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Alexander Neiwirth
Represented By: Bryan Keith Walker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.L. (Butch) Otter
Represented By: Carl J Withroe
Represented By: Thomas C. Perry
Represented By: Michael S Gilmore
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa Luna
Represented By: Michael S Gilmore
Represented By: Carl J Withroe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Jerry Russell
Represented By: Michael S Gilmore
Represented By: Carl J Withroe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]