Sperow v. USA

Respondent: USA
Petitioner: Gregory Frank Sperow
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00158
Filed: March 27, 2012
 
Court: Idaho District Court
Office: Boise - Southern Office
County: Ada - Southern
Presiding Judge: B. Lynn Winmill
 
Nature of Suit: Motions to Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 15, 2012 11 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 4 Motion for Order Concerning Attorney-Client Privilege and to Stay the Instant Proceedings; granting 7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying 9 Motion to Amend Motion to Vacate, Set Asid e, or Correct Sentence Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2255 and Motion for Transcripts. Philip H. Gordon is directed to make himself available at a reasonable time and place to answer material questions regarding Sperows § 2255 Motion presented by the Assistant United States Attorney, and to produce an affidavit responding to Sperows allegations of ineffective assistance of counsel within 45 days of this order. The Government shall file its Response to the § 2255 Motion 1 within 30 days after Mr. Gordon complies with this Order. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)
June 20, 2013 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. The Clerk of the Court shall file this Order in both Case No. 1:06-cr-126-BLW and Case No. 1:12-cv-00158-BLW. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (krb)
April 25, 2012 6 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 3 Motion for Copy of Reporters Transcripts; staying 2 Notice of Filing and Order Setting Briefing Schedule Regarding Motion Pursuant to 28 § USC 2255. The Clerk of Court sha ll provide to Sperow: a. A copy of the transcript of the 6/25/2009 continued sentencing hearing filed on 9/10/2009 appearing at Dkt. 949. b. A copy of the transcripts requested by the Government of the changeof plea hearing and the sentencing hearing of 6/17/2009 when they become available on CM/ECF. c. A Prisoner Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis form. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Sperow v. USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Anthony G Hall
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gregory Frank Sperow
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]