Joseph v. Boise State University et al

Plaintiff: Thuy P Joseph
Defendant: Boise State University and Idaho Human Rights Commission
Case Number: 1:2012cv00267
Filed: May 25, 2012
Court: Idaho District Court
Office: Boise - Southern Office
County: Ada - Southern
Presiding Judge: Mikel H. Williams
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 15, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. 7 ) be GRANTED IN PART and that Plaintiff's Complaint against Boise State University be DISMISSED with leave to amend the Complaint. Plaintiff shall file an Amended Complaint within 30 days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Mikel H. Williams. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
March 7, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION; granting 7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; incorporating and adopting 24 Report and Recommendation. Plaintiffs Complaint against the Idaho Human Rights Commission is DISMISSED in its entir ety without leave to amend. Plaintiffs Complaint against Boise State University is DISMISSED with leave to amend the Complaint being GRANTED. Any Amended Complaint shall be filed within 30 days from the date of the Magistrate Judges Order 24 , 25 . Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm) Modified on 3/8/2013 to correct filing date (cjm).
February 21, 2014 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS the Report and Recommendation entered on 8/13/13 (Dkt. 40 ), should be, and is hereby, INCORPORATED by reference and ADOPTED in its entirety. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's Second Motion to Dismi ss (Dkt. 3[1)] is GRANTED and this case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE against all Defendants. The Motion to Seal (Dkt. 42 ) is ADMINISTRATIVELY TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joseph v. Boise State University et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thuy P Joseph
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boise State University
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Idaho Human Rights Commission
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]