Rodriguez et al v. Independent School District of Boise City, No.1

Plaintiff: Guadalupe Rodriguez, Jose Lopez and C L
Defendant: Independent School District of Boise City No. 1
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00390
Filed: August 2, 2012
 
Court: Idaho District Court
Office: Boise - Southern Office
County: Ada - Southern
Presiding Judge: B. Lynn Winmill
 
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 20:1400
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 11, 2013 19 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Motion Regarding Right to Discovery (Dkt. 14 ). Signed by Judge Candy W Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
October 28, 2013 47 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER. Defendant's Motion to Quash Subpoena and for Protective Order 26 and its Supplement (Dkt. 27) are GRANTED. Plaintiff's Motion to Compel 30 is DENIED. The deadline for motions to supplement the record is 11 /8/2013. Responses to any new motion to supplement the record shall be due on or before 11/22/2013. No replies will be allowed. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
March 28, 2014 55 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Special Education Hearing Officer Jean Uranga's Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law, and Order is AFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED IN PART. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment 24 is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file a brief on or before 4/28/2014. Defendantshall file a response to Plaintiffs' brief on or before 5/19/2014. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Rodriguez et al v. Independent School District of Boise City, No.1
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guadalupe Rodriguez
Represented By: Lisa Doreen Shultz
Represented By: Charlene K Quade
Represented By: Scott R Learned
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Lopez
Represented By: Scott R Learned
Represented By: Charlene K Quade
Represented By: Lisa Doreen Shultz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C L
Represented By: Scott R Learned
Represented By: Charlene K Quade
Represented By: Lisa Doreen Shultz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Independent School District of Boise City No. 1
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]