Moto Tech, LLC v. KTM North America, Inc.

Plaintiff: Moto Tech, LLC
Defendant: KTM North America, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2013cv00165
Filed: April 3, 2013
Court: Idaho District Court
Office: Boise - Southern Office
County: Ada - Southern
Presiding Judge: Ronald E. Bush
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 10, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER, ( ADR Plan to be filed by 12/10/2013., Amended Pleadings due by 12/10/2013., Discovery due by 7/27/2014., Joinder of Parties due by 12/10/2013., Motions due by 8/1/2014.). Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (krb)
December 9, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER Defendant KTM North America, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss 18 is GRANTED. Defendant's Motion to Take Judicial Notice 19 is MOOT. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (jp)
September 25, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER KTM's Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. 35 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The motion is granted to the extent that the Court has dismissed MotoTech's false advertising claim under the ICPA. The motion is den ied in all other respects. KTM's Request for Judicial Notice (Dkt. 36 ) is GRANTED as to Exhibit 3 and DENIED as to Exhibits 1 and 2. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moto Tech, LLC v. KTM North America, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moto Tech, LLC
Represented By: Brian L. Webb
Represented By: Thomas J Angstman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KTM North America, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]