Saetrum v. Ada County Sheriff's Office et al

Defendant: John and Jane Does, Jake Vogt, Gary Raney and Ada County Sheriff's Office
Plaintiff: Adam Todd Saetrum
Case Number: 1:2013cv00425
Filed: September 27, 2013
Court: Idaho District Court
Office: Boise - Southern Office
County: Ada - Southern
Presiding Judge: B. Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 22, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Re: Motion to Dismiss; Motion to Stay Discovery and Motion to Disqualify. Defendants' motion to dismiss the First Amended Complaint in its entirety be (Docket No. [20 is GRANTED; defendants' motion to stay discovery (Do cket No. 29 ) is GRANTED and all discovery is stayed until the court rules on any motion to dismiss any Second Amended Complaint; and Deputy Vogt's motion to disqualify Rodney Saetrum as counsel for plaintiff (Docket No. 18 )is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiff has 20 days from the date this Order is signed to file a Second Amended Complaint, if he can do so consistent with this Order.. Signed by Judge William B. Shubb. (jp)
August 25, 2014 66 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER RE: MOTION TO DISMISS; MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION; MOTION TO STRIKE; and MOTION RE: PERSONAL JURISDICTION denying 43 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration; denying in part and granting in part 44 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying as moot 45 Defendant's Motion to Strike; denying 55 Plaintiff's Motion for a Ruling Regarding Service and Personal Jurisdiction. The stay of discovery imposed in the 5/22/2014 Order is L IFTED. Plaintiff has twenty days from the date this Order is signed to file a Third Amended Complaint, if he can do so consistent with this Order. Signed by Judge William B. Shubb. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)
January 14, 2014 9 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER RE: Motion for a More Definite Statement. The motion for a more definite statement (Docket No. 4 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge William B. Shubb. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saetrum v. Ada County Sheriff's Office et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jake Vogt
Represented By: Ray J Chacko
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Raney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ada County Sheriff's Office
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Todd Saetrum
Represented By: Rodney R Saetrum
Represented By: David W Lloyd
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]