Swenson v. County of Kootenai et al

Defendant: Joshua Studor, John Doe, Kenneth Brooks, Rocky Watson, Kootenai County Sheriffs Office, County of Kootenai, Jim Reierson, Shawn Lindblom, Barry McHugh, Scott Wayman, Jason Austin, Jonathan Brandel and Barry E Watson
Plaintiff: Suzanne Alene Swenson
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00026
Filed: January 16, 2013
 
Court: Idaho District Court
Office: CDA - Northern Office
County: Kootenai - Northern
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
February 14, 2014 113 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 52 Motion to Compel; denying 53 Motion to Strike; granting in part and denying in part 59 Motion to Compel; denying 74 Motion for Entry of Default; denying 90 Motion to Strike; denying 98 Motion to Compel; denying 104 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)
March 25, 2014 138 Featured Case ORDER ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS The Memorandum Decision and Order and Report and Recommendation (Dkt. 114 ) shall be INCORPORATED by reference and ADOPTED by this Court. Defendant Wayman and Watson's Motions to Dismiss (Dkt. 49 ) is GRA NTED. Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint (Dkt. 62 ) is DENIED. Defendants Kootenai County, Kootenai County Sheriff's Office, Watson,Lindblom, McHugh, Reierson, Studor, Brooks, Austin and Brandel's Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. 70 ) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Only the excessive force claim against Defendant Lindblom shall be allowed to proceed to trial. Plaintiff's Objections (Dkt. 120 and Dkt. 129 ) are DENIED. Plaintiff's Objection regarding th e tax return disclosure (Dkt. 121 ) is GRANTED IN PART. Plaintiffs Motion for Judicial Notice and Demand for Jury Trial (Dkt. 123 and 124 ) are DENIED AS MOOT as a jury trial is set on the claim for excessive force which has not been dismissed. P laintiff's Motions to Show Cause Why Defendants Should Not be Charged, Tried and Convicted of Perjury (Dkt. 130 ) and (Dkt. 132 ) are DENIED as beyond the scope of this civil litigation. The Court will withdraw the reference on Plaintiff' s Motion to Modify Scheduling Order (Dkt. 93 ) and said Motion is GRANTED IN PART consistent with this Order. The trial set for 7/22/14 is VACATED and the trial is RESET for 9/16/14 at 9:30 a.m. at the Federal Courthouse in Coeur d' Alene, Idaho to allow for the expert discovery to be completed. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
May 21, 2013 47 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS ; adopting 44 Report and Recommendations.; denying 12 Motion for Default Judgment; denying 13 Motion for Entry of Default. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (krb)
December 10, 2013 97 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION incorporating and adopting 85 Report and Recommendations; denying 51 Plaintiff's Motion for Proof of Authority to Represent and Entry for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Swenson v. County of Kootenai et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Studor
Represented By: Peter C Erbland
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Brooks
Represented By: Peter C Erbland
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rocky Watson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kootenai County Sheriffs Office
Represented By: Peter C Erbland
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Kootenai
Represented By: Peter C Erbland
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Reierson
Represented By: Peter C Erbland
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Lindblom
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry McHugh
Represented By: Peter C Erbland
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Wayman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Austin
Represented By: Peter C Erbland
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Brandel
Represented By: Peter C Erbland
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry E Watson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzanne Alene Swenson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]