Quicksilver Air Inc. et al v. Helicopter Engine Repair Overhaul Services et al

Defendant: Timken Company, Rolls Royce Corporation and Helicopter Engine Repair Overhaul Services
Plaintiff: Richard C. Swisher, Sharon Swisher and Quicksilver Air Inc.
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv00006
Filed: January 5, 2012
 
Court: Idaho District Court
Office: Moscow - Central Office
County: Clearwater - Central
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
 
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 24, 2012 48 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part (40 in 3:12-cv-00006-BLW) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to (35 in 3:12-cv-00006-BLW) MOTION to Transfer Case. Defendants shall file Response by 12/27/2012 and any Reply is due by 12/ 21/2012. Motions (6 in 3:12-cv-00367-BLW) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, (7 in 3:12-cv-00366-BLW) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, (13 in 3:12-cv-00006-BLW) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction will be heard toge ther. It is hereby ordered these three cases (Quicksilver 12-06; Pauley 12-367; and White 12-366) be transferred to Chief Judge Winmill for all purposes. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, that the three cases be consolidated for all pretrial purposes. The Court will discuss further with counsel whether the cases should be consolidated for trial. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. Associated Cases: 3:12-cv-00006-BLW, 3:12-cv-00366-BLW, 3:12-cv-00367-BLW(caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)
November 20, 2012 56 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER re: 53 STIPULATION FOR PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (krb)
January 22, 2013 68 Featured Case ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDNAT ARROW AVIATION, LLC re ( 37 in 3:12-cv-00367-BLW) Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Arrow Aviation, LLC, ( 40 in 3:12-cv-00366-BLW) Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Arrow Aviation, LLC, ( 66 i n 3:12-cv-00006-BLW) Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. all related pending motions and matters, and the actions brought by Plaintiffs are hereby dismissed without prejudice against Defendant Arrow Aviation, LLC. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, that this Order shall be deemed entered on the same date and time the Stipulation of Dismissal was filed on 1/18/2013, and the Clerk shall transmit this Order along with the rest of the filed to the Central District of California pursuant to the Court's decision. Associated Cases: 3:12-cv-00006-BLW, 3:12-cv-00366-BLW, 3:12-cv-00367-BLW (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Quicksilver Air Inc. et al v. Helicopter Engine Repair Overhaul Services et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timken Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rolls Royce Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helicopter Engine Repair Overhaul Services
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard C. Swisher
Represented By: Charles Henry Carpenter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Swisher
Represented By: Charles Henry Carpenter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quicksilver Air Inc.
Represented By: Charles Henry Carpenter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]