Brigiotta's Farmland Produce and Garden Center, Inc. v. United Potato Growers of Idaho, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Brigiotta's Farmland Produce and Garden Center, Inc.
Defendant: United Potato Growers of Idaho, Inc., United Potato Growers of America, Inc., United II Potato Growers of Idaho, Inc., Albert T Wada, Wada Farms Potatoes, Inc., Wada-Van Orden Potatoes, Inc., Wada Farms Marketing Group, LLC., Dole Fresh Vegetables, Inc., Dole Food Co., Blaine Larsen Farms, Inc., Potandon Produce, LLC., General Mills, Inc., Michael Cranney d/b/a Cranny Farms, Cornelison Farms, Inc., Snake River Plains Potatoes, Inc., Driscoll Potatoes, Inc., Lance Funk d/b/a Lance Funk Farms, Rigby Produce, Inc., Pleasant Valley Potato, Inc., Raybould Brothers Farms, LLC, RD Offutt Co., Idahoan Foods, LLC and Bayer Cropscience, LLP
 
Case Number: 4:2010cv00307
Filed: June 18, 2010
 
Court: Idaho District Court
Office: Pocatello - Eastern Office
County: Bonneville - Eastern
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
 
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15:25
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 4, 2010 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF INTERIM CLASS COUNSEL, granting 91 Motion and memorandum in support of Appointment of Interim Lead Counsel Pursuant to FRCP 23(g)(3). The Court appoints a Plaintiffs Executive Committee (PEC) consisting of t he following firms: Hausfeld LLP; Bernstein Liebhard LLP; Freed Kanner London & Millen; Girardi I Keese; Labaton Sucharow LLP; Pearson Simon Warshaw Penny LLP; Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP; Spector Roseman Kodroff & Willis PC; Steyer Lowenthal Bo odrookas Alvarez & Smith LLP; and Weinstein Kitchenoff & Asher LLC. The Court appoints Hausfeld LLP to serve as Chair of the Committee. The Court appoints Gordon Law Offices as Plaintiff's liaison counsel. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by cjm)
November 12, 2010 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND NOTICE OF HEARING, (Case Management Conference set for 12/14/2010 03:00 PM in Boise - Courtroom 3 before Judge B. Lynn Winmill.). Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. Associated Cases: 4:10-md-02186-BLW, 4:10-cv-00307-BLW, 4:10-cv-00520-BLW, 4:10-cv-00546-BLW(caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by cjm)
December 7, 2010 123 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Counsel may appear via telephone at the 12/14/2010 case management conference. Counsel planning to appear via telephone shall notify the Court of their intention to appear via telephone by sending an email to Courtroom Deputy Clerk Jamie Gearhart no later than 12/10/2010. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. Associated Cases: 4:10-md-02186-BLW et al.(caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by cjm)
December 17, 2010 138 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO.1. The parties shall submit a joint stipulation for page limits and other means for making the initial round of dispositive motions efficient, or their respective positions by 1/28/2011. Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs shall fi le their Amended Complaint by 2/11/2011. Responsive Pleadings (Answers of Motions) due 3/18/2011. All Plaintiffs shall file their responses to Defendants' motions by 5/6/2011. All Defendants shall file their reply briefs by 6/3/2011. Preservatio n Cutoff Date shall be 12/13/2010. The parties shall have completed the process of conducting a Rule 26(f) conference by 1/21/2011. The parties shall submit a joint proposed preservation order or their respective positions by 1/28/2011. The parties s hall meet and confer and provide the Court with a joint proposed protective order or their respective positions by 1/28/2011. If necessary, the Court will schedule a second case management conference when it issues its decision on the dispositive mot ions. The Court will hear oral argument on the motions on 6/22/2011 at 1:00 pm in the District Courtroom in Pocatello, ID before Judge B. Lynn Winmill. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. Associated Cases: 4:10-md-02186-BLW et al.(caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by cjm)
February 2, 2011 147 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: PAGE LIMITS FOR INITIAL DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS re (58 in 4:10-md-02186-BLW) Notice (Other) filed by Potandon Produce, LLC., Potandon Produce LLC, (59 in 4:10-md-02186-BLW) Notice (Other), filed by Potandon Produce, LLC., Potandon Produce LLC, (57 in 4:10-md-02186-BLW) Notice (Other), filed by Martha Florez, Brigiotta's Farmland Produce and Garden Center, Inc., Brittney Vander Heiden, Taul LLC, Sergio Marvilla, Navtej Bhandari, Jonathan Rizzo, Abigail Rizzo, Kory Pentland, Joyce Rizzo, Trang Nguyen, Todd Simon. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. Associated Cases: 4:10-md-02186-BLW et al.(caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by cjm)
February 2, 2011 148 Opinion or Order of the Court PRESERVATION ORDER. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. Associated Cases: 4:10-md-02186-BLW et al.(caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by cjm)
February 2, 2011 149 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. Associated Cases: 4:10-md-02186-BLW et al.(caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by cjm)
December 2, 2011 215 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 153 Motion to Dismiss; granting 154 Motion to Dismiss; granting 155 Motion to Dismiss; denying 156 Motion to Dismiss; granting 157 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 158 Motion t o Dismiss; granting 160 Motion to Dismiss; denying 162 Motion to Dismiss; granting 163 Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot 183 Motion to Add Names; finding as moot 183 Motion for Discovery; denying 185 Motion to Amend/Correct( Amended Complaint due by 1/13/2012.). Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by cjm)(Docketed separately in lead case 4:10-MD-2186-BLW.)
April 16, 2012 241 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying without prejudice (219) Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) in case 4:10-cv-00307-BLW; denying without prejudice (162) Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) in case 4:10-md-02186-BLW; denying wi thout prejudice (128) Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) in case 4:10-cv-00520-BLW; denying without prejudice (139) Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) in case 4:10-cv-00546-BLW; denying without prejudice (80) Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) in case 4:10-cv-00575-BLW; denying without prejudice (156) Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) in case 4:10-cv-00576-BLW; denying without prejudice (78) Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) in case 4:10-cv-00583-BLW. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. Associated Cases: 4:10-md-02186-BLW et al.(caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)
July 27, 2012 264 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying (233) Motion for Summary Judgment; denying (234) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying (238) Motion to Dismiss; denying (240) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim in case 4:10-cv-0030 7-BLW; denying (180) Motion for Summary Judgment; denying (182) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying (183) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying (194) Motion to Dismiss in case 4:10-md-02186-BLW; denying (143) M otion for Summary Judgment; denying (144) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying (147) Motion ; denying (151) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim in case 4:10-cv-00520-BLW; denying (154) Motion for Summary Judgment; de nying (155) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying (157) Motion to Dismiss; denying (162) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim in case 4:10-cv-00546-BLW; denying (95) Motion for Summary Judgment; denying (96) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying (102) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim in case 4:10-cv-00575-BLW; denying (171) Motion for Summary Judgment; denying (172) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying (174) Motion to Dismiss; denying (179) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim in case 4:10-cv-00576-BLW; denying (93) Motion for Summary Judgment; denying (94) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying (100) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim in case 4:10-cv-00583-BLW. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. Associated Cases: 4:10-md-02186-BLW et al.(caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)
August 31, 2012 274 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR THE DISCOVERY OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION re (227 in 4:10-md-02186-BLW-CWD) Case Management Order No.2; (235 in 4:10-md-02186-BLW-CWD) Case Management Order No.3. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. Associated Cases: 4:10-md-02186-BLW-CWD et al.(caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)
October 1, 2012 294 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re (239 in 4:10-md-02186-BLW-CWD) Case Management Order No. 4, (260 in 4:10-md-02186-BLW-CWD) Stipulation by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. Motions to Compel deadline extended to 10/12/2012. Answering Defendants proposed search terms deadline extended to 10/22/2012. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. Associated Cases: 4:10-md-02186-BLW-CWD et al.(caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)
January 9, 2013 358 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting ( 329 in 4:10-md-02186-BLW-CWD) Stipulation re Case Management Order No.4 239 . Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. Associated Cases: 4:10-md-02186-BLW-CWD, 4:10-cv-00307-BLW-CWD(caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)
October 1, 2013 471 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 5. Completion of Fact Discovery due by 3/3/2014. Class Certification Motions due by 4/17/2014 with Responses due by 8/15/2014 and Replies due by 11/14/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 7/14/2015 with Responses due by 9/15/201 5 and Replies due by 10/15/2015. Magistrate Judge Candy W. Dale will handle the bulk of discovery motions. She may conduct informal mediation, expedite the briefing schedule, and conduct hearings at her discretion. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. Associated Cases: 4:10-md-02186-BLW-CWD, 4:10-cv-00307-BLW-CWD, 4:13-cv-00251-BLW-CWD(caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)
October 22, 2013 476 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING DEPOSITION PROTOCOL. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. Associated Cases: 4:10-md-02186-BLW-CWD, 4:10-cv-00307-BLW-CWD, 4:13-cv-00251-BLW-CWD(caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)
January 10, 2014 561 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Case Management Order No. 5 is Amended as follows: (Completion of Fact Discovery: Fact Discovery due by 7/3/2014); Direct and indirect purchaser class plaintiffs' Motions for Class Certification and Expert Reports in Support thereof are d ue on 8/15/14. Defendants' Opposition to Motions for Class Certification and Expert Reports in Support thereof are due on 12/12/14. Reply Memoranda, and any Expert Reports in Support thereof, are due on 2/13/15. All remaining deadlines in CMO No. 5 (Dkt. 480 ) shall remain in effect. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. Associated Cases: 4:10-md-02186-BLW-CWD, 4:10-cv-00307-BLW-CWD, 4:13-cv-00251-BLW-CWD((jp)
January 31, 2014 571 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER in case 4:10-cv-00307-BLW-CWD; granting in part and denying in part 544 Motion to Compel in case 4:10-md-02186-BLW-CWD ( 522 in 4:10-cv-00307-BLW-CWD). Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. Associated Cases: 4:10-md-02186-BLW-CWD, 4:10-cv-00307-BLW-CWD, 4:13-cv-00251-BLW-CWD (klw) Modified on 1/31/2014 (klw). Modified on 1/31/2014 to add link (cjm).
April 11, 2014 584 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER RE MDL DKT. 539, DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL (539 in 4:10-md-02186-BLW-CWD)( 528 in 4:10-cv-00307-BLW-CWD) MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Identified on Defendants' Privilege Logs . Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Motion to Compel (Dkt. 539) is GRANTEDIN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. Associated Cases: 4:10-md-02186-BLW-CWD, 4:10-cv-00307-BLW-CWD(caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)
May 8, 2014 593 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER overruling and denying re ( 587 in 4:10-cv-00307-BLW-CWD, 631 in 4:10-md-02186-BLW-CWD, 182 in 4:13-cv-00251-BLW-CWD) Defendant;s Objection to Magistrate Judge Dale's Order. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. Associated Cases: 4:10-md-02186-BLW-CWD, 4:10-cv-00307-BLW-CWD, 4:13-cv-00251-BLW-CWD(caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)
May 30, 2014 603 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER in case 4:10-cv-00307-BLW-CWD; granting in part and denying in part 539 Motion to Compel in case 4:10-md-02186-BLW-CWD. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. Associated Cases: 4:10-md-02186-BLW-CWD, 4:10-cv-00307-BLW-CWD(caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (klw)
October 2, 2014 638 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re (694 in 4:10-md-02186-BLW-CWD and 233 in 4:13-cv-00251-BLW-CWD) MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiff Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judmgnet on Defendant Potandon Produce LLC's Counterclaim. On or b efore Friday, 10/3/2014, Potandon Produce L.L.C and AWG shall each file a brief, no more than 20 pages, addressing whetherPotandons counterclaim should proceed on its own track. If the parties cannot resolve the issues related to improper disclosure of documents, they shall file an appropriate request on or before Friday, 10/3/2014. (Case Management deadline set for 10/3/2014.)Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. Associated Cases: 4:10-md-02186-BLW-CWD, 4:10-cv-00307-BLW-CWD, 4:13-cv-00251-BLW-CWD(caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Brigiotta's Farmland Produce and Garden Center, Inc. v. United Potato Growers of Idaho, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brigiotta's Farmland Produce and Garden Center, Inc.
Represented By: Bruce S Bistline
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Potato Growers of Idaho, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Potato Growers of America, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United II Potato Growers of Idaho, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert T Wada
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wada Farms Potatoes, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wada-Van Orden Potatoes, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wada Farms Marketing Group, LLC.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dole Fresh Vegetables, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dole Food Co.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blaine Larsen Farms, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Potandon Produce, LLC.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Mills, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Cranney d/b/a Cranny Farms
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cornelison Farms, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Snake River Plains Potatoes, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Driscoll Potatoes, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lance Funk d/b/a Lance Funk Farms
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rigby Produce, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pleasant Valley Potato, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raybould Brothers Farms, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RD Offutt Co.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Idahoan Foods, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Cropscience, LLP
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]