Strickholm v. Evangelical Lutheran Good Samaritan Society et al

Plaintiff: Eric Strickholm
Defendant: Evangelical Lutheran Good Samaritan Society
Case Number: 4:2011cv00059
Filed: February 17, 2011
Court: Idaho District Court
Office: Pocatello - Eastern Office
County: Bonneville - Eastern
Presiding Judge: Mikel H. Williams
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 19, 2013 50 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 40 Motion in Limine; denying 28 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
February 28, 2013 53 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DESICION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 34 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 39 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 21 Motion in Limine; denying 27 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (krb)
March 1, 2013 54 Opinion or Order of the Court AMEDNED MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant's 34 MOTION in Limine; denying Plaintiff's 27 MOTION in Limine; granting in part and denying in part Defendant's 21 MOTION in Limine; granting i n part and denying in part Defendant's 39 MOTION in Limine; amending 53 Memorandum Decision and Order. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)
June 24, 2011 9 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 4 Motion to Compel arbitration and stay proceedings. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by dks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strickholm v. Evangelical Lutheran Good Samaritan Society et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Strickholm
Represented By: Michael D Gaffney
Represented By: John Michael Avondet
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evangelical Lutheran Good Samaritan Society
Represented By: Christopher D Comstock
Represented By: Keely E Duke
Represented By: Richard E Hall
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]