Western Watersheds Project v. U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service et al

Defendant: NOAA Fisheries, U.S. Forest Service, Jack Whitworth, Whitworth Ranches, Inc. and U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service
Plaintiff: Western Watersheds Project
Case Number: 4:2012cv00197
Filed: April 18, 2012
Court: Idaho District Court
Office: Pocatello - Eastern Office
County: Lemhi - Eastern
Presiding Judge: B. Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 16:1538
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 8, 2012 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION REGARDING Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule re 25 Stipulation. Federal Defendants' Cross Motion and Opposition due by 11/16/2012. Plaintiff's Response/Reply due by 12/11/2012. Federal Defendants' Reply due by 1/4/2013. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)
November 26, 2012 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 37 Stipulation filed by NOAA Fisheries, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, U.S. Forest Service. Federal Defendants Cross-Motion and Opposition due 12/17/2012, Plaintiffs Response/Reply due 1/16/2013 and Federal Defendants Reply due 2/6/2013. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (krb)
November 26, 2012 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING ASIDE ENTRY OF DEFAULT granting 34 Motion to Set Aside Default. That Defendants Jack Whitworth and Whitworth Ranches, Inc. shall file a responsive pleading within ten (10) days of the date this Order is entered. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (krb)
December 14, 2012 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING JOINT MOTION TO STAY granting 41 Motion to Stay. IT IS ORDERED that the Joint Motion 41 is GRANTED and that this action is STAYED for 60 days. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (krb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Western Watersheds Project v. U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NOAA Fisheries
Represented By: Erik Edward Petersen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Forest Service
Represented By: Erik Edward Petersen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Whitworth
Represented By: Erik Edward Petersen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whitworth Ranches, Inc.
Represented By: Erik Edward Petersen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service
Represented By: Erik Edward Petersen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Western Watersheds Project
Represented By: Lauren M Rule
Represented By: Kristin F. Ruether
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]