Asset Vision, LLC et al v. Fielding et al

Defendant: Brad H Hall, Creg Fielding, Cole Hall and Brad Hall and Associates
Plaintiff: Asset Vision LLC and Deer Valley Trucking, Inc.
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv00288
Filed: July 2, 2013
 
Court: Idaho District Court
Office: Pocatello - Eastern Office
County: Bonneville - Eastern
Presiding Judge: Ronald E. Bush
 
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:504 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 8, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. NOW THEREFORE IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, that unless all parties file awritten agreement on or before 10/22/2013 that the Court need not recuse itselfpursuant to Canons 3(C)(1) & (D), the Court will recuse itself and direct the Clerk to reassign this case to another Judge. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
November 6, 2013 38 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. ADR Plan to be filed by 1/31/2014. Amended Pleadings due by 2/28/2014. Completion of Discovery due by 6/30/2014. Joinder of Parties due by 2/28/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 7/31/2014. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
December 4, 2013 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. IT IS ORDERED: Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limitations 42 is GRANTED in part as explained above. Plaintiffs' Motion to Shorten Time 43 is DEEMED MOOT. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
December 17, 2013 50 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER. IT IS ORDERED: Brad Hall & Associates, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint 27 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Plaintiffs may file an Amended Complaint on or before 12/31/2013. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
January 23, 2014 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 66 MOTION to Expedite and to Shorten Time filed by Asset Vision LLC, Deer Valley Trucking, Inc., and Granting 65 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 46 SEALED MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Asset Vision LLC, Deer Valley Trucking, Inc. Plaintiff's reply brief to its motion for preliminary injunction shall be filed by January 28, 2014. Signed by Judge Terry J Hatter, Jr. ((Hatter, Terry)
February 26, 2014 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 46 Sealed Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Terry J Hatter, Jr. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (Hatter, Terry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Asset Vision, LLC et al v. Fielding et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad H Hall
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Creg Fielding
Represented By: Shelly C. Shannahan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cole Hall
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Hall and Associates
Represented By: Dana M Herberholz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Asset Vision LLC
Represented By: Gregory M Hess
Represented By: D. Craig Parry
Represented By: Joshua K Chandler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deer Valley Trucking, Inc.
Represented By: D. Craig Parry
Represented By: Gregory M Hess
Represented By: Joshua K Chandler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]