Lakeview Cheese Company, LLC v Nelson-Ricks Creamery Co et al

Defendant: Nelson-Ricks Cheese Company, Inc., Nelson-Ricks Creamery Company and Greenberg Cheese Company
Plaintiff: Lakeview Cheese Company, LLC
Case Number: 4:2013cv00361
Filed: August 15, 2013
Court: Idaho District Court
Office: Pocatello - Eastern Office
County: Madison - Eastern
Presiding Judge: Candy W. Dale
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 13, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 Motion to Set Aside Default. Defendants Answer is due on or before January 3, 2014. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (klw)
February 12, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 27 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Lakeview shall post security in the amount of $25,000 no later than 48 hours after this order issues. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)(Emailed to hg and jd in Finance.)
August 21, 2014 53 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 51 Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement. Greenburg must comply with the agreement, make timely payments as the agreement requires and compensate Lakeview for the attorney fees and costs it has incurred in se eking to enforce the Settlement Agreement. Lakeview shall submit an affidavit detailing the fees and costs it has incurred in enforcing the Settlement Agreement no late than 8/29/2014. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lakeview Cheese Company, LLC v Nelson-Ricks Creamery Co et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nelson-Ricks Cheese Company, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nelson-Ricks Creamery Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenberg Cheese Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lakeview Cheese Company, LLC
Represented By: Brett L Foster
Represented By: Richard T Jackson
Represented By: Scott E. Randolph
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]