Battelle Energy Alliance, LLC v. Southfork Security, Inc. et al

Defendant: Corey Thuen, Southfork Security, Inc. and Does 1-10
Plaintiff: Battelle Energy Alliance, LLC
Case Number: 4:2013cv00442
Filed: October 10, 2013
Court: Idaho District Court
Office: Pocatello - Eastern Office
County: Bonneville - Eastern
Presiding Judge: B. Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 29, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER. Battelles request for preliminary injunctive relief (Dkt. 2 ) is DENIED without prejudice. The Temporary Restraining Order entered on 10/15/2013 (Dkt. 8 ) is dissolved to the extent defendants were restrained from pos ting Visdoms source code on the internet. The Court will, however, continue to retain the images of defendants computer hard drives during the pendency of this action, pending further input from the parties. The Court will expedite the trial of this matter. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)
March 12, 2014 56 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER Battelle's Motion for Summary Judgment and for Permanent Injunction (Dkt. [41)] is DENIED. Defendants' Motion for Leave to File a Supplemental Memorandum (Dkt. 53 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
October 15, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 2 Ex Parte Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order. At 4:45 p.m. on this 15th day of October, 2013, the Court issues this Temporary Restraining Order enjoining defendants, and thei r agents, employees, attorneys or all persons acting in concert and participation with either of them. Battelle shall hand-serve defendants with copies of (1) the complaint, (2) the ex parte application for a temporary restraining order, including al l supporting documents and declarations; and (3) a copy of order, within 24 hours of the issuance of this order. Battelle shall post security in the amount of $25,000 no later than 48 hours after this order issues. This Temporary Restraining Ord er will EXPIRE at 4:45p.m. on October 29, 2013. The parties are ordered to appear for the preliminary-injunction hearing before Judge Bryan on Thursday, 10/17/2013 at 9:30 a.m., in Courtroom 1 of the Federal Courthouse in Boise, Idaho, which located at 550 West Fort Street. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)(Emailed to hg and jd in Finance.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Battelle Energy Alliance, LLC v. Southfork Security, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corey Thuen
Represented By: Bradlee R Frazer
Represented By: Jason D Scott
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southfork Security, Inc.
Represented By: Bradlee R Frazer
Represented By: Jason D Scott
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Battelle Energy Alliance, LLC
Represented By: Scott E. Randolph
Represented By: Mark A Miller
Represented By: A. Dean Bennett
Represented By: Ginger Utley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]