Schlicksup v. Caterpillar, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Daniel J Schlicksup
Defendant: Caterpillar, Inc., David B Burritt, Alice Barbour, Robin D Beran, James B Buda, Douglas R Oberhelman and Edward J Rapp
Case Number: 1:2009cv01208
Filed: June 12, 2009
Court: Illinois Central District Court
Office: Peoria Office
County: Peoria
Referring Judge: Byron G. Cudmore
Presiding Judge: Michael M. Mihm
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 14, 2012 144 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Alice Barbour, Robin D Beran, James B Buda, David B Burritt, Caterpillar, Inc., Douglas R Oberhelman, Edward J Rapp. (Turner, Joseph)
February 3, 2012 Featured Case TEXT ONLY ORDER postponing Motion Hearing scheduled for February 7, 2012, regarding pending summary judgment motions. Parties to contact the Court on or before 2/10/2012 with status report on settlement discussions. Hearing date will be scheduled after the status report is given, if necessary. Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 2/3/2012. (MMM4, ilcd)
January 23, 2012 TEXT ONLY NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 108 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Claim Against Defendant James S. Buda, 109 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Claim Against Defendant David B. Burritt, 110 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Claim Against Defendant Douglas R. Oberhelman, 106 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Claim Against Defendant Alice Barbour, 104 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Defendants Caterpillar Inc. and Edward J. Rapp, 107 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Claim Against Defendant Robin D. Beran: Oral Arguments on Motions for Summary Judgment have been set to be heard on 2/7/2012 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom B in Peoria before Judge Michael M. Mihm. (KSB, ilcd)
December 22, 2011 143 RESPONSE to Motion re 139 MOTION to Strike PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED RESPONSE OPPOSING THEIR MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Plaintiff Daniel J Schlicksup. (O'Day, Daniel)
December 6, 2011 142 REPLY to Response to Motion re 107 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Claim Against Defendant Robin D. Beran, 110 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Claim Against Defendant Douglas R. Oberhelman, 108 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Claim Against Defendant James S. Buda, 109 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Claim Against Defendant David B. Burritt, 106 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Claim Against Defendant Alice Barbour COMBINED REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR RESPECTIVE MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Defendants Alice Barbour, Robin D Beran, James B Buda, David B Burritt, Douglas R Oberhelman. (Turner, Joseph)
December 6, 2011 141 REPLY to Response to Motion re 104 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Defendants Caterpillar Inc. and Edward J. Rapp CATERPILLAR INC.'S AND EDWARD J RAPP'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Defendants Caterpillar, Inc., Edward J Rapp. (Turner, Joseph)
December 6, 2011 140 MEMORANDUM in Support re 139 MOTION to Strike PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED RESPONSE OPPOSING THEIR MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Defendants Alice Barbour, Robin D Beran, James B Buda, David B Burritt, Caterpillar, Inc., Douglas R Oberhelman, Edward J Rapp. (Turner, Joseph)
December 6, 2011 139 MOTION to Strike PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED RESPONSE OPPOSING THEIR MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Defendants Alice Barbour, Robin D Beran, James B Buda, David B Burritt, Caterpillar, Inc., Douglas R Oberhelman, Edward J Rapp. Responses due by 12/23/2011 (Turner, Joseph)
November 15, 2011 138 Exhibit re 136 Response to Motion for Summary Judgment by Daniel J Schlicksup. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Excerpts from the Deposition Transcript of Ed Rapp - Part 2, # 2 Exhibit Excerpts from the Deposition Transcript of Ed Rapp - Part 3, # 3 Exhibit Excerpts from the Deposition Transcript of Ed Rapp - Part 4, # 4 Exhibit Excerpts from the Deposition Transcript of Ed Rapp - Part 5, # 5 Exhibit Excerpts from the Deposition Transcript of Ed Rapp - Part 6, # 6 Exhibit Excerpts from the Deposition Transcript of Ed Rapp - Part 7, # 7 Exhibit Excerpts from the Deposition Transcript of Ed Rapp - Part 8, # 8 Exhibit Excerpts from the Deposition Transcript of Ed Rapp - Part 9)(O'Day, Daniel)
November 15, 2011 137 Exhibit re 136 Response to Motion for Summary Judgment by Daniel J Schlicksup. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Excerpts from the Deposition Transcript of Terri Pierpont, # 2 Exhibit Excerpts from the Deposition Transcript of Sally Stiles, # 3 Exhibit Excerpts from the Deposition Transcript of Rodney Perkins, # 4 Exhibit Excerpts from the Deposition Transcript of Robin Beran, # 5 Exhibit Excerpts from the Deposition Transcript of Nancy Snowden, # 6 Exhibit Excerpts from the Deposition Transcript of Michael Samp, # 7 Exhibit Excerpts from the Deposition Transcript of Matthew Thompson, # 8 Exhibit Excerpts from the Deposition Transcript of John Heller, # 9 Exhibit Excerpts from the Deposition Transcript of Janie Copeland, # 10 Exhibit Excerpts from the Deposition Transcript of James Buda, # 11 Exhibit Excerpts from the Deposition Transcript of Giles Parsons, # 12 Exhibit Excerpts from the Deposition Transcript of David Burritt, # 13 Affidavit Excerpts from the Deposition Transcript of Daniel Schlicksup)(O'Day, Daniel)
November 15, 2011 136 RESPONSE to Motion re 104 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Defendants Caterpillar Inc. and Edward J. Rapp filed by Plaintiff Daniel J Schlicksup. (O'Day, Daniel)
November 14, 2011 NOTICE of Cancellation of Hearing. Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled for November 17, 2011, is cancelled and will rescheduled by the Court at a later date. (MMM4, ilcd)
October 25, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael M. Mihm: Parties present via telephone with Plaintiff Daniel J. Schlicksup with Attys Daniel O'Day/David Dorris, and Attys Steven Pearlman/Joseph Turner for the Defendants for Motion Hearing on Tuesday, 10/25/2011 at 1:00PM. Same held. Dft's 134 Expedited Motion to Strike Pltf's Responses to Their Motions for Summary Judgment is GRANTED IN PART/DENIED IN PART. Pltf's Responses to Dft's Motions for Summary Judgment are STRICKEN IN PART with leave to refile Responses conforming the the rulings made during the hearing. Pltf's responses are due on or before 11/15/2011. Dft may submit its replies on or before 12/6/2011. (Court Reporter NM.) (SF, ilcd)
October 19, 2011 TEXT ONLY NOTICE of Hearing on Document No. 134 Expedited Motion To Strike Plaintiff's Responses To Their Motions For Summary Judgment. This Motion has been set for Hearing on 10/25/2011 at 1:00 PM by telephone from Peoria (court will place call) before Judge Michael M. Mihm. (KSB, ilcd)
October 13, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael M. Mihm: Parties present via phone by Attys O'Day/Dorris for Plaintiff and Atty Pearlman for Defendant for Motion Hearing at 11:00 a.m. on Thurs, 10/13/2011 re: motion to strike 134 - same held. Oral arguments held. Court will set up further telephone conference to make ruling. No further response/reply need to be filed at this time. Remaining schedule for briefs related to Summary Judgment Motions will be set at the next conference call.(Court Reporter JJ.) (KB, ilcd)
October 12, 2011 TEXT ONLY NOTICE of Hearing on Defendant's Motion 134 to Strike Plaintiff's Responses To Their Motions For Summary Judgment. The Hearing has been set for 10/13/2011 at 11:00 AM by telephone from Peoria (court will place call) before Judge Michael M. Mihm. (KSB, ilcd)
October 7, 2011 Featured Case TEXT ONLY ORDER granting 133 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Replies due by 10/17/2011. Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 10/07/2011.(MMM4, ilcd)
October 6, 2011 135 MEMORANDUM in Support re 134 MOTION to Strike Expedited Motion To Strike Plaintiff's Responses To Their Motions For Summary Judgment filed by Defendants Alice Barbour, Robin D Beran, James B Buda, David B Burritt, Caterpillar, Inc., Douglas R Oberhelman, Edward J Rapp. (Pearlman, Steven)
October 6, 2011 134 MOTION to Strike Expedited Motion To Strike Plaintiff's Responses To Their Motions For Summary Judgment by Defendants Alice Barbour, Robin D Beran, James B Buda, David B Burritt, Caterpillar, Inc., Douglas R Oberhelman, Edward J Rapp. Responses due by 10/24/2011 (Pearlman, Steven)
October 6, 2011 133 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Defendants' Unopposed Motion for a 10-day Extension of Time To File Reply Briefs In Support of Their Respective Motions For Summary Judgment by Defendants Alice Barbour, Robin D Beran, James B Buda, David B Burritt, Caterpillar, Inc., Douglas R Oberhelman, Edward J Rapp. Responses due by 10/24/2011 (Pearlman, Steven)
October 5, 2011 132 Featured Case ORDER by U.S. Magistrate Judge Byron Cudmore: Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Depositions 117 DENIED. See written order. (LB, ilcd)
October 3, 2011 131 RESPONSE to Motion re 117 MOTION to Compel filed by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Turner, Joseph)
September 27, 2011 130 Exhibit re 120 Affidavit,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, AA by Daniel J Schlicksup. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit AAW - PART 1, # 2 Exhibit AAW - PART 2, # 3 Exhibit AAW - PART 3, # 4 Exhibit AAAI, # 5 Exhibit AAAJ)(O'Day, Daniel)
September 27, 2011 129 Exhibit re 126 Response to Motion by Daniel J Schlicksup. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Excerpts from the Deposition Transcript of Daniel Schlicksup, # 2 Exhibit Excerpts from the Deposition Transcript of Nancy Snowden, # 3 Exhibit Excerpts from the Deposition Transcript of Sally Stiles, # 4 Exhibit Excerpts from the Deposition Transcript of Matthew Thompson)(O'Day, Daniel)
September 27, 2011 128 Exhibit re 126 Response to Motion by Daniel J Schlicksup. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Excerpts from the Deposition Transcript of Ed Rapp - Part 1, # 2 Exhibit Excerpts from the Deposition Transcript of Ed Rapp - Part 2, # 3 Exhibit Excerpts from the Deposition Transcript of Ed Rapp - Part 3, # 4 Exhibit Excerpts from the Deposition Transcript of Ed Rapp - Part 4, # 5 Exhibit Excerpts from the Deposition Transcript of Ed Rapp - Part 5, # 6 Exhibit Excerpts from the Deposition Transcript of Ed Rapp - Part 6, # 7 Exhibit Excerpts from the Deposition Transcript of Ed Rapp - Part 7, # 8 Exhibit Excerpts from the Deposition Transcript of Ed Rapp - Part 8, # 9 Exhibit Excerpts from the Deposition Transcript of Ed Rapp - Part 9)(O'Day, Daniel)
September 27, 2011 127 Exhibit re 126 Response to Motion by Daniel J Schlicksup. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Excerpts from the Deposition Transcript of Robin Beran, # 2 Exhibit Excerpts from the Deposition Transcript of James Buda, # 3 Exhibit Excerpts from the Deposition Transcript of David Burritt, # 4 Exhibit Excerpts from the Deposition Transcript of Janie Copeland, # 5 Exhibit Excerpts from the Deposition Transcript of John Heller, # 6 Exhibit Excerpts from the Deposition Transcript of Giles Parsons, # 7 Exhibit Excerpts from the Deposition Transcript of Rodney Perkins)(O'Day, Daniel)
September 26, 2011 126 RESPONSE to Motion re 104 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Defendants Caterpillar Inc. and Edward J. Rapp filed by Plaintiff Daniel J Schlicksup. (O'Day, Daniel)
September 26, 2011 125 RESPONSE to Motion re 110 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Claim Against Defendant Douglas R. Oberhelman filed by Plaintiff Daniel J Schlicksup. (O'Day, Daniel)
September 26, 2011 124 RESPONSE to Motion re 109 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Claim Against Defendant David B. Burritt filed by Plaintiff Daniel J Schlicksup. (O'Day, Daniel)
September 26, 2011 123 RESPONSE to Motion re 108 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Claim Against Defendant James S. Buda filed by Plaintiff Daniel J Schlicksup. (O'Day, Daniel)
September 26, 2011 122 RESPONSE to Motion re 107 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Claim Against Defendant Robin D. Beran filed by Plaintiff Daniel J Schlicksup. (O'Day, Daniel)
September 26, 2011 121 RESPONSE to Motion re 106 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Claim Against Defendant Alice Barbour filed by Plaintiff Daniel J Schlicksup. (O'Day, Daniel)
September 23, 2011 120 AFFIDAVIT by Daniel J Schlicksup. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit K, # 2 Exhibit L, # 3 Exhibit M, # 4 Exhibit N, # 5 Exhibit O, # 6 Exhibit P, # 7 Exhibit Q, # 8 Exhibit R, # 9 Exhibit S, # 10 Exhibit T, # 11 Exhibit U, # 12 Exhibit V, # 13 Exhibit W, # 14 Exhibit X, # 15 Exhibit Y, # 16 Exhibit Z, # 17 Exhibit AB, # 18 Exhibit AC, # 19 Exhibit AD, # 20 Exhibit AE, # 21 Exhibit AF, # 22 Exhibit AG, # 23 Exhibit AH, # 24 Exhibit AI, # 25 Exhibit AJ, # 26 Exhibit AK, # 27 Exhibit AL, # 28 Exhibit AM, # 29 Exhibit AN, # 30 Exhibit AO, # 31 Exhibit AP, # 32 Exhibit AQ, # 33 Exhibit AR, # 34 Exhibit AS, # 35 Exhibit AT, # 36 Exhibit AU, # 37 Exhibit AV, # 38 Exhibit AW, # 39 Exhibit AX, # 40 Exhibit AY, # 41 Exhibit AZ, # 42 Exhibit AAA, # 43 Exhibit AAB, # 44 Exhibit AAC, # 45 Exhibit AAD, # 46 Exhibit AAE, # 47 Exhibit AAF, # 48 Exhibit AAG, # 49 Exhibit AAH, # 50 Exhibit AAI, # 51 Exhibit AAJ, # 52 Exhibit AAK, # 53 Exhibit AAL, # 54 Exhibit AAM, # 55 Exhibit AAN, # 56 Exhibit AAO, # 57 Exhibit AAP, # 58 Exhibit AAQ, # 59 Exhibit AAR, # 60 Exhibit AAS, # 61 Exhibit AAT, # 62 Exhibit AAU, # 63 Exhibit AAV, # 64 Exhibit AAX, # 65 Exhibit AAY, # 66 Exhibit AAZ, # 67 Exhibit AAAA, # 68 Exhibit AAAB, # 69 Exhibit AAAC, # 70 Exhibit AAAD, # 71 Exhibit AAAE, # 72 Exhibit AAAF, # 73 Exhibit AAAG, # 74 Exhibit AAAH, # 75 Exhibit AAAK, # 76 Exhibit AAAL - PART 1, # 77 Exhibit AAAL - PART 2, # 78 Exhibit AAAM, # 79 Exhibit AAAN, # 80 Exhibit AAAO, # 81 Exhibit AAAP, # 82 Exhibit AAAQ, # 83 Exhibit AAAR, # 84 Exhibit AAAS, # 85 Exhibit AAAT, # 86 Exhibit AAAU, # 87 Exhibit AAAV, # 88 Exhibit AAAW, # 89 Exhibit AAAX, # 90 Exhibit AAAY, # 91 Exhibit AAAZ, # 92 Exhibit AAAAA, # 93 Exhibit AAAAB, # 94 Exhibit AAAAC, # 95 Exhibit AAAAD, # 96 Exhibit AAAAE, # 97 Exhibit AAAAF, # 98 Exhibit AAAAG, # 99 Exhibit AAAAH, # 100 Exhibit AAAAI, # 101 Exhibit AAAAJ, # 102 Exhibit AAAAK, # 103 Exhibit AAAAL, # 104 Exhibit AAAAM, # 105 Exhibit AAAAN, # 106 Exhibit AAAAO, # 107 Exhibit AAAAP, # 108 Exhibit AAAAQ, # 109 Exhibit AAAAR, # 110 Exhibit AAAAS, # 111 Exhibit AAAAT, # 112 Exhibit AAAAU, # 113 Exhibit AAAAV, # 114 Exhibit AAAAW, # 115 Exhibit AAAAX - PART 1, # 116 Exhibit AAAAX - PART 2, # 117 Exhibit AAAAX - PART 3, # 118 Exhibit AAAAX - PART 4, # 119 Exhibit AAAAX - PART 5, # 120 Exhibit AAAAX - PART 6, # 121 Exhibit AAAAY, # 122 Exhibit AAAAZ, # 123 Exhibit AAAAAA, # 124 Exhibit AAAAAB, # 125 Exhibit AAAAAC, # 126 Exhibit AAAAAD, # 127 Exhibit AAAAAE, # 128 Exhibit AAAAAF, # 129 Exhibit AAAAAG, # 130 Exhibit AAAAAH, # 131 Exhibit AAAAAI, # 132 Exhibit AAAAAJ, # 133 Exhibit AAAAAK, # 134 Exhibit AAAAAL, # 135 Exhibit AAAAAM, # 136 Exhibit AAAAAN, # 137 Exhibit AAAAAO, # 138 Exhibit AAAAAP, # 139 Exhibit AAAAAQ, # 140 Exhibit AAAAAR, # 141 Exhibit AAAAAS, # 142 Exhibit AAAAAT, # 143 Exhibit AAAAAU, # 144 Exhibit AAAAAV, # 145 Exhibit AAAAAW, # 146 Exhibit AAAAAX, # 147 Exhibit AAAAAY, # 148 Exhibit AAAAAZ, # 149 Exhibit AAAAAAA, # 150 Exhibit AAAAAAB, # 151 Exhibit AAAAAAC, # 152 Exhibit AAAAAAD, # 153 Exhibit AAAAAAE, # 154 Exhibit AAAAAAF, # 155 Exhibit AAAAAAG, # 156 Exhibit AAAAAAH, # 157 Exhibit AAAAAAI, # 158 Exhibit AAAAAAJ, # 159 Exhibit AAAAAAK, # 160 Exhibit AAAAAAL, # 161 Exhibit AAAAAAM, # 162 Exhibit AAAAAAN, # 163 Exhibit AAAAAAO, # 164 Exhibit AAAAAAP, # 165 Exhibit AAAAAAQ, # 166 Exhibit AAAAAAR, # 167 Exhibit AAAAAAS, # 168 Exhibit AAAAAAT, # 169 Exhibit AAAAAAU, # 170 Exhibit AAAAAAV, # 171 Exhibit AAAAAAW, # 172 Exhibit AAAAAAX, # 173 Exhibit AAAAAAY, # 174 Exhibit AAAAAAZ, # 175 Exhibit AAAAAAAA, # 176 Exhibit AAAAAAAB, # 177 Exhibit AAAAAAAC, # 178 Exhibit AAAAAAAD, # 179 Exhibit AAAAAAAE, # 180 Exhibit AAAAAAAF, # 181 Exhibit AAAAAAAG, # 182 Exhibit AAAAAAAH, # 183 Exhibit AAAAAAAI, # 184 Exhibit AAAAAAAJ, # 185 Exhibit AAAAAAAK, # 186 Exhibit AAAAAAAL, # 187 Exhibit AAAAAAAM, # 188 Exhibit AAAAAAAN, # 189 Exhibit AAAAAAAO, # 190 Exhibit AAAAAAAP, # 191 Exhibit AAAAAAAQ, # 192 Exhibit AAAAAAAR, # 193 Exhibit AAAAAAAS, # 194 Exhibit AAAAAAAT, # 195 Exhibit AAAAAAAU, # 196 Exhibit AAAAAAAV, # 197 Exhibit AAAAAAAW, # 198 Exhibit AAAAAAAX, # 199 Exhibit AAAAAAAY, # 200 Exhibit AAAAAAAZ, # 201 Exhibit AAAAAAAAA, # 202 Exhibit AAAAAAAAB, # 203 Exhibit AAAAAAAAC, # 204 Exhibit AAAAAAAAD, # 205 Exhibit AAAAAAAAE, # 206 Exhibit AAAAAAAAF, # 207 Exhibit AAAAAAAAG, # 208 Exhibit AAAAAAAAH, # 209 Exhibit AAAAAAAAI, # 210 Exhibit AAAAAAAAJ, # 211 Exhibit AAAAAAAAK, # 212 Exhibit AAAAAAAAL, # 213 Exhibit AAAAAAAAM, # 214 Exhibit AAAAAAAAN, # 215 Exhibit AAAAAAAAO - PART 1, # 216 Exhibit AAAAAAAAO - PART 2, # 217 Exhibit AAAAAAAAO - PART 3, # 218 Exhibit AAAAAAAAO - PART 4, # 219 Exhibit AAAAAAAAP, # 220 Exhibit AAAAAAAAQ, # 221 Exhibit AAAAAAAAR, # 222 Exhibit AAAAAAAAS, # 223 Exhibit AAAAAAAAT, # 224 Exhibit AAAAAAAAU, # 225 Exhibit AAAAAAAAV, # 226 Exhibit AAAAAAAAW, # 227 Exhibit AAAAAAAAX, # 228 Exhibit AAAAAAAAY, # 229 Exhibit AAAAAAAAZ, # 230 Exhibit AAAAAAAAAA, # 231 Exhibit AAAAAAAAAB, # 232 Exhibit AAAAAAAAAC, # 233 Exhibit AAAAAAAAAD, # 234 Exhibit AAAAAAAAAE, # 235 Exhibit AAAAAAAAAF, # 236 Exhibit AAAAAAAAAG, # 237 Exhibit AAAAAAAAAH, # 238 Exhibit AAAAAAAAAI, # 239 Exhibit AAAAAAAAAJ, # 240 Exhibit AAAAAAAAAK, # 241 Exhibit AAAAAAAAAL, # 242 Exhibit AAAAAAAAAM, # 243 Exhibit AAAAAAAAAN, # 244 Exhibit AAAAAAAAAO, # 245 Exhibit AAAAAAAAAP, # 246 Exhibit AAAAAAAAAQ, # 247 Exhibit AAAAAAAAAR, # 248 Exhibit AAAAAAAAAS, # 249 Exhibit AAAAAAAAAT, # 250 Exhibit AAAAAAAAAU, # 251 Exhibit AAAAAAAAAV, # 252 Exhibit HR019, # 253 Exhibit HR023b, # 254 Exhibit HR024, # 255 Exhibit HR031, # 256 Exhibit HR035, # 257 Exhibit M001 - PART 1, # 258 Exhibit M001 - PART 2, # 259 Exhibit M001 - PART 3, # 260 Exhibit M002, # 261 Exhibit M003, # 262 Exhibit M004)(O'Day, Daniel)
September 23, 2011 Featured Case TEXT ONLY ORDER granting 119 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responses to Motions for Summary Judgments. Responses due by 9/26/2011. Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 9/23/2011. (MMM4, ilcd)
September 22, 2011 119 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 107 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Claim Against Defendant Robin D. Beran, 110 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Claim Against Defendant Douglas R. Oberhelman, 108 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Claim Against Defendant James S. Buda, 111 Appendix,,, 104 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Defendants Caterpillar Inc. and Edward J. Rapp, 109 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Claim Against Defendant David B. Burritt, 106 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Claim Against Defendant Alice Barbour by Plaintiff Daniel J Schlicksup. Responses due by 10/11/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(O'Day, Daniel)
September 16, 2011 118 AFFIDAVIT re 117 MOTION to Compel by Daniel J Schlicksup. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L)(O'Day, Daniel)
September 16, 2011 117 MOTION to Compel by Plaintiff Daniel J Schlicksup. Responses due by 10/3/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(O'Day, Daniel)
September 9, 2011 116 Featured Case OPINION by U.S. Magistrate Judge Byron Cudmore: Motion to Quash Subpoenas 68 ALLOWED in part and DENIED in part as to PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP. See written order. Based upon this opinion and Judge Cudmore's previous Opinions 100 114 , the underlying Motion 68 is now completely resolved. (LB, ilcd)
August 22, 2011 115 +++ SEALED DOCUMENT - Exhibits reviewed in camera filed conventionally and maintained in the court file under seal. See 8/19/11 Opinion (doc. #114). (DK, ilcd) Modified on 9/9/2011 to add wording about 8/19/11 Opinion (DK, ilcd).
August 22, 2011 Featured Case TEXT ONLY ORDER granting 113 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motions for Summary Judgment. The Court recognizes the Plaintiffs obligation to respond to several Motions for Summary Judgment in the matter; however, the Court must also take into consideration the case schedule. As such, the Court does not give the full extension requested by the Plaintiff but grants the Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motions for Summary Judgment to the extent that it will extend the due date of the Plaintiff's Responses until September 23, 2011. Responses due by 9/23/2011 Replies due by 10/7/2011. Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 8/22/2011. (MMM4, ilcd)
August 19, 2011 114 Featured Case OPINION by U.S. Magistate Judge Byron Cudmore: Motion to Quash Subpoenas 68 ALLOWED in part and DENIED in part as to Ernst & Young LLP. See written order. Clerk is directed to keep Motion 68 pending as it relates to PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, which will be addressed in a separate opinion. (LB, ilcd)
August 18, 2011 113 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 107 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Claim Against Defendant Robin D. Beran, 110 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Claim Against Defendant Douglas R. Oberhelman, 108 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Claim Against Defendant James S. Buda, 111 Appendix,,, 104 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Defendants Caterpillar Inc. and Edward J. Rapp, 109 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Claim Against Defendant David B. Burritt, 106 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Claim Against Defendant Alice Barbour by Plaintiff Daniel J Schlicksup. Responses due by 9/6/2011 (O'Day, Daniel)
August 8, 2011 112 RESPONSE to Motion re 101 MOTION for Order Extending Time Ernst & Young LLP Has To Produce Responsive Information to Plaintiff filed by Plaintiff Daniel J Schlicksup. (O'Day, Daniel)
August 1, 2011 111 Appendix re 107 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Claim Against Defendant Robin D. Beran, 110 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Claim Against Defendant Douglas R. Oberhelman, 104 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Defendants Caterpillar Inc. and Edward J. Rapp, 106 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Claim Against Defendant Alice Barbour, 108 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Claim Against Defendant James S. Buda, 109 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Claim Against Defendant David B. Burritt by Caterpillar, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5a, # 6 Exhibit 5b, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15)(Turner, Joseph)
August 1, 2011 110 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Claim Against Defendant Douglas R. Oberhelman by Defendant Douglas R Oberhelman. Responses due by 8/25/2011 (Turner, Joseph)
August 1, 2011 109 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Claim Against Defendant David B. Burritt by Defendant David B Burritt. Responses due by 8/25/2011 (Turner, Joseph)
August 1, 2011 108 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Claim Against Defendant James S. Buda by Defendant James B Buda. Responses due by 8/25/2011 (Turner, Joseph)
August 1, 2011 107 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Claim Against Defendant Robin D. Beran by Defendant Robin D Beran. Responses due by 8/25/2011 (Turner, Joseph)
August 1, 2011 106 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Claim Against Defendant Alice Barbour by Defendant Alice Barbour. Responses due by 8/25/2011 (Turner, Joseph)
August 1, 2011 105 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Matthew R. Thompson on 08/03/11 (O'Day, Daniel)
August 1, 2011 104 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Defendants Caterpillar Inc. and Edward J. Rapp by Defendants Caterpillar, Inc., Edward J Rapp. Responses due by 8/25/2011 (Turner, Joseph)
July 22, 2011 103 +++ SEALED DOCUMENT - Additional Exhibits reviewed in camera and maintained in the court file under seal. See 7/13/11 Opinion.. (DK, ilcd)
July 21, 2011 Featured Case TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Byron Cudmore: Motion of Non-Party Ernst & Young LLP for an Extension of Time in Which to Produce Responsive Information to Plaintiff 101 ALLOWED. Extension granted to 8/5/2011. (LB, ilcd)
July 21, 2011 102 CERTIFICATE Of Compliance With The Court's May 24, 2011 Order Regarding Plaintiff's Subpoena Pricewaterhouse Coopers LLP. (Pearlman, Steven)
July 20, 2011 101 MOTION for Order Extending Time Ernst & Young LLP Has To Produce Responsive Information to Plaintiff by Interested Party Ernst & Young LLP. Responses due by 8/8/2011 (Tocco, David)
July 13, 2011 +++ SEALED DOCUMENT - Exhibits reviewed in camera filed conventionally and maintained in the court file under seal.. (DK, ilcd)
July 13, 2011 100 Featured Case OPINION by U.S. Magistrate Judge Byron Cudmore: Defendants' Motion to Quash Plaintiff's Subpoena to Howrey, LLP 64 ALLOWED IN PART. See written order. Original documents reviewed in camera are directed to be filed in hard copy format under SEAL "Courts eyes only" with the Clerk. (LB, ilcd)
July 5, 2011 Featured Case TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Byron Cudmore: Before the Court is non-party Ernst & Young's (E&Y) Motion 94 and Plaintiff's response 99 . Based upon Plaintiff's response 99 , E&Y is not required to search all workstation hard drives, but is required to search the workstation hard drives of Tom Lawrence and Bob Der. Bates numbering is not required per Plaintiff's response to save costs. As limited, E&Y is to bear the cost of production. E&Y's Motion 94 is therefore ALLOWED in part and DENIED in part. E&Y to produce the ordered documents by 7/22/2011. Entered by Judge Cudmore on 7/5/2011. (LB, ilcd)
July 1, 2011 99 Response by Daniel J Schlicksup. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Subpoena)(O'Day, Daniel)
July 1, 2011 Featured Case TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Byron Cudmore: Defendant Caterpillar, Inc.'s Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Privilege Log and Corresponding Documents Plaintiff Requests from Pricewaterhousecoopers for in camera Review 98 ALLOWED. The Court extends the date by which Caterpillar must produce a privilege log and documents to the Court for in camera inspection by 21 days to 7/21/2011. (LB, ilcd)
June 30, 2011 98 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion For Extension Of Time To Submit Privilege Log And Corresponding Documents Plaintiff Requests From PricewaterhouseCoopers For In Camera Review by Defendants Alice Barbour, Robin D Beran, James B Buda, David B Burritt, Caterpillar, Inc., Douglas R Oberhelman, Edward J Rapp. Responses due by 7/18/2011 (Pearlman, Steven)
June 29, 2011 97 CERTIFICATE (DEFENDANT CATERPILLAR INC.S CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH THE COURTS MAY 24, 2011 ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS SUBPOENA TO ERNST & YOUNG LLP). (Clark, Kathryn)
June 29, 2011 96 CERTIFICATE (DEFENDANT CATERPILLAR INC.S CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH THE COURTS MAY 24, 2011 ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS SUBPOENA TO HOWREY LLP). (Clark, Kathryn)
June 28, 2011 Featured Case TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Byron Cudmore: Non-Party Pricewaterhousecoopers, LLP's Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time 95 ALLOWED. PWC allowed an additional 21 days beyond 6/30/2011 in which to comply with Plaintiff's document subpoena. (Miscellaneous Deadline set 7/21/2011) (LB, ilcd)
June 27, 2011 95 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time by Respondent PricewaterhouseCoopers, LLP. Responses due by 7/14/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Nomellini, Mark)
June 23, 2011 94 MOTION by non-party Ernst & Young LLP to modify this Court's Order 93 of 5/24/11. Plaintiff to file written responses due by 7/1/2011 (FDT, ilcd)
June 23, 2011 Featured Case TEXT ONLY ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Byron G. Cudmore on 6/23/11:Correspondence from counsel for non-party Ernst & Young LLP reviewed. The Clerk is directed to e-file same and to caption the filing as motion by non-party Ernst & Young LLP to modify this Courts Order 93 of 5/24/2011. Plaintiff to file written response by 7/1/2011. Clerk to list Ernst & Young LLP as interested non-party and counsel as David J. Tocco of Vorys, Sater, Seymour and Pease, LLP, 1375 East Ninth Street, Cleveland, Ohio.(FDT, ilcd)
May 24, 2011 93 Featured Case ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Byron G. Cudmore on 5/24/11. 1) By June 30, 2011, Howrey, LLP, is directed to produce to Plaintiff the documents requested in category one of Plaintiff's subpoena, with the exception of documents withheld or redacted on the basis of the attorney-client privilege orthe work-product doctrine, as identified by Caterpillar. 2) By June 30, 2011, Ernst and Young, LLP, is directed to produce to Plaintiff the documents requested in Plaintiff's subpoena, with the exception of documents withheld or redacted on the basis of the attorney-client privilege orwork-product doctrine, as identified by Caterpillar. 3) By June 30, 2011, PricewaterhouseCoopers, LLP, is directed to produce to Plaintiff the documents requested in Plaintiff's subpoena, with the exception of documents withheld or redacted on the basis of the attorney-client privilege or work-product doctrine, as identified by Caterpillar. 4) By June 30, 2011, Caterpillar is directed to: a) file in this Court a separate, detailed privilege log setting forth the documents withheld or redacted for each subpoena; b) to file under seal the documents identified on each privilege log for the court's in camera inspection; and, (c) to file under seal any engagement letter between Caterpillar, Inc., and Howrey, E&Y or PwC regarding the alleged taping, Global Value Enhancement project, or Bermuda Tax Structure project. If no engagement letters exist, Caterpillar is directed to submit an averment to that effect. 5) The clerk of court is directed to send a copy of this order to Howrey,LLP, Ernst & Young, LLP, and PricewaterhouseCoopers, LLP, at the addresses listed in the subpoenas (d/e 65-1, p. 2; d/e 69-1, pp. 2, 5). 6) The Court reserves ruling on the pending motions to quash until it receives and digests the information set forth in paragraph (4) above. If the Court does not receive the information, the motions will be summarily denied and production ordered. SEE FULL ORDER. cc: Howrey, LLP, Ernst & Young, LLP and PricewaterhouseCoopers, LLP. (FDT, ilcd)
May 18, 2011 Featured Case TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Byron Cudmore: Before the Court is Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Deposition in Peoria 90 and Non-Party PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP's Response 91 . Plaintiff's Motion 90 is DENIED. The Court has discretion herein and directs that the deposition of Mr. Jim Bowers (a non-party) be held in Chicago, Illinois, at an agreed upon location and on an agreed upon date. The Court concludes that under these facts, and because Mr. Bowers is not a party, the convenience of the non-party witness is paramount. (LB, ilcd)
May 16, 2011 92 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Mark J Nomellini on behalf of PricewaterhouseCoopers, LLP (Nomellini, Mark)
May 13, 2011 91 RESPONSE to Motion re 90 First MOTION to Compel Deposition in Peoria filed by Respondent PricewaterhouseCoopers, LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Nomellini, Mark)
April 26, 2011 90 First MOTION to Compel Deposition in Peoria by Plaintiff Daniel J Schlicksup. Responses due by 5/13/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(O'Day, Daniel)
April 20, 2011 89 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Janie Copeland on 05/05/11 (O'Day, Daniel)
April 20, 2011 88 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Ron Jensen on 05/12/11 (O'Day, Daniel) Modified on 4/20/2011 to fix deponent(SF, ilcd).
April 15, 2011 Featured Case TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Byron Cudmore: Status Report 87 reviewed and Plaintiff's Motion for Additional Depositions 76 re-reviewed. Court grants Plaintiff's Motion 76 and ALLOWS an additional ten (10) depositions per side. These additional depositions are the agreed upon depositions as listed in Status Report 87 , or as otherwise agreed between the parties, as fact discovery closed 3/15/2011. (LB, ilcd)
April 15, 2011 87 STATUS REPORT by Daniel J Schlicksup. (O'Day, Daniel)
April 8, 2011 86 REPLY to Response to Motion re 68 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas (AMENDED) filed by Defendants Alice Barbour, Robin D Beran, James B Buda, David B Burritt, Caterpillar, Inc., Douglas R Oberhelman, Edward J Rapp. (Pearlman, Steven)
April 8, 2011 85 REPLY to Response to Motion re 64 MOTION to Quash Subpoena To Howrey LLP filed by Defendants Alice Barbour, Robin D Beran, James B Buda, David B Burritt, Caterpillar, Inc., Douglas R Oberhelman, Edward J Rapp. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Pearlman, Steven)
April 4, 2011 Featured Case TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Byron Cudmore: Counsel to meet and confer on the issues raised in Plaintiff's Motion for Additional Depositions 76 and file a status report by 4/15/2011. (LB, ilcd)
March 31, 2011 84 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Ron Jensen on 04/13/11 (O'Day, Daniel)
March 31, 2011 83 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Dave Burritt on 04/20/11 (O'Day, Daniel)
March 31, 2011 82 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jim Bowers on 04/26/11 (O'Day, Daniel)
March 31, 2011 Featured Case TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Byron Cudmore: Defendants' Agreed Motion for Extension of Expert Discovery Deadlines 81 ALLOWED. Deadline for Plaintiff to disclose expert witnesses extended to 5/10/2011; Deadline for Defendants to disclose expert witnesses extended to 5/31/2011; Deadline for completion of expert discovery extended to 7/15/2011. All other deadlines remain in effect. (LB, ilcd)
March 30, 2011 81 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Defendants' Agreed Motion For Extension Of Expert Discovery Deadlines) by Defendants Alice Barbour, Robin D Beran, James B Buda, David B Burritt, Caterpillar, Inc., Douglas R Oberhelman, Edward J Rapp. Responses due by 4/18/2011 (Clark, Kathryn)
March 29, 2011 Featured Case TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Byron Cudmore: Defendants directed to file replies to Plaintiff's Responses in Opposition 79 80 by 4/8/2011. Replies limited to five pages in length. (LB, ilcd)
March 24, 2011 80 RESPONSE to Motion re 68 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas (AMENDED) filed by Plaintiff Daniel J Schlicksup. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Selected Answers and Objections to Requests for Admission, # 2 Exhibit Selected Answers and Objections to Requests for Admission, # 3 Exhibit Selected Answers and Objections to Requests for Admission, # 4 Exhibit Invoice, # 5 Exhibit Selected portions of Deposition Transcripts)(O'Day, Daniel)
March 24, 2011 79 RESPONSE to Motion re 64 MOTION to Quash Subpoena To Howrey LLP filed by Plaintiff Daniel J Schlicksup. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Select Portions of Deposition Transcript)(O'Day, Daniel)
March 21, 2011 78 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Teri Peripoint on 03-23-11 (O'Day, Daniel)
March 21, 2011 77 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Janie Copeland on 03-23-11 (O'Day, Daniel)
March 15, 2011 76 MOTION for Additional Depositions by Plaintiff Daniel J Schlicksup. Responses due by 4/1/2011 (O'Day, Daniel)
March 14, 2011 75 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Ed Rapp on 05/04/11 (O'Day, Daniel)
March 14, 2011 74 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jim Buda on 04/28/11 (O'Day, Daniel)
March 14, 2011 73 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Dave Burritt on 04/15/11 (O'Day, Daniel)
March 14, 2011 72 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Ron Jenson on 04/13/11 (O'Day, Daniel)
March 14, 2011 71 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Teri Peripoint on 03/24/11 (O'Day, Daniel)
March 14, 2011 70 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Janie Copeland on 03/24/11 (O'Day, Daniel)
March 8, 2011 Featured Case TEXT ONLY ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Byron G. Cudmore on 3/8/11. Defendant Caterpillar, Inc.'s Memorandum 67 e-filed incorrectly as Motion to Quash is STRICKEN. It appears to be a duplicate (without exhibits) of Defendant Caterpillar, Inc.s Memorandum 69 .(FDT, ilcd)
March 7, 2011 69 MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF ITS re 68 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas (AMENDED) by Alice Barbour, Robin D Beran, James B Buda, David B Burritt, Caterpillar, Inc., Douglas R Oberhelman, Edward J Rapp. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Pearlman, Steven)
March 7, 2011 68 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas (AMENDED) by Defendants Alice Barbour, Robin D Beran, James B Buda, David B Burritt, Caterpillar, Inc., Douglas R Oberhelman, Edward J Rapp. Responses due by 3/24/2011 (Pearlman, Steven)
March 7, 2011 67 DOCUMENT STRICKEN PURSUANT TO 3/8/11 TEXT ORDER - MOTION to Quash Subpoenas to by Defendants Alice Barbour, Robin D Beran, James B Buda, David B Burritt, Caterpillar, Inc., Douglas R Oberhelman, Edward J Rapp. Responses due by 3/24/2011 (Pearlman, Steven) Modified on 3/8/2011 (FDT, ilcd).
March 7, 2011 66 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Mike Samp on 03/10/11 (O'Day, Daniel)
March 7, 2011 65 MEMORANDUM Of Law In Support re 64 MOTION to Quash Subpoena To Howrey LLP by Alice Barbour, Robin D Beran, James B Buda, David B Burritt, Caterpillar, Inc., Douglas R Oberhelman, Edward J Rapp. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Pearlman, Steven)
March 7, 2011 64 MOTION to Quash Subpoena To Howrey LLP by Defendants Alice Barbour, Robin D Beran, James B Buda, David B Burritt, Caterpillar, Inc., Douglas R Oberhelman, Edward J Rapp. Responses due by 3/24/2011 (Pearlman, Steven)
March 7, 2011 63 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Robin Beran on 03/15/11 (O'Day, Daniel)
March 7, 2011 62 NOTICE to Take Deposition of John Heller on 03/14/11 (O'Day, Daniel)
March 7, 2011 61 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Rod Perkins on 03/10/11 (O'Day, Daniel)
March 7, 2011 60 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jim Bowers on 03/14/11 (O'Day, Daniel)
March 7, 2011 59 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Mike Samp on 03/10/11 (O'Day, Daniel)
February 28, 2011 58 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by David J Rowland on behalf of Alice Barbour, Robin D Beran, James B Buda, David B Burritt, Caterpillar, Inc., Douglas R Oberhelman, Edward J Rapp (Rowland, David)
February 25, 2011 57 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER entered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Byron G. Cudmore on 2/25/2011. (LB, ilcd)
February 25, 2011 Featured Case TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Byron Cudmore: Agreed Motion for Entry of a Protective Order 56 ALLOWED for good cause. Written order to follow. (LB, ilcd)
February 24, 2011 56 First MOTION for Protective Order by Plaintiff Daniel J Schlicksup. Responses due by 3/14/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Agreed Proposed Protective Order)(O'Day, Daniel)
February 18, 2011 55 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Nancy Snowden on 03/03/11 (O'Day, Daniel)
February 18, 2011 54 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Giles Parsons on 03/03/11 (O'Day, Daniel)
February 18, 2011 53 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Sally Stiles on 02/24/11 (O'Day, Daniel)
February 18, 2011 52 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Bill Springer on 02/24/11 (O'Day, Daniel)
February 18, 2011 51 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Alice Barbour on 02/22/11 (O'Day, Daniel)
January 19, 2011 50 Featured Case ORDER entered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Byron G. Cudmore: Defendants' Motion for Entry of a Protective Order 46 is DENIED. See written order. (LB, ilcd)
December 23, 2010 Featured Case TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Byron Cudmore: Joint Motion for Extension of Time 49 ALLOWED in that fact discovery deadline is extended to 3/15/2011. All other deadlines remain in effect. (LB, ilcd)
December 22, 2010 49 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Plaintiff Daniel J Schlicksup. Responses due by 1/10/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(O'Day, Daniel)
December 17, 2010 48 REPLY to Response to Motion re 46 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Defendants Alice Barbour, Robin D Beran, James B Buda, David B Burritt, Caterpillar, Inc., Douglas R Oberhelman, Edward J Rapp. (Turner, Joseph)
December 9, 2010 Featured Case TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Byron Cudmore: Defendants to file reply to Plaintiff's Response 47 to Motion for Protective Order 46 by 12/17/2010. (LB, ilcd)
December 8, 2010 47 RESPONSE to Motion re 46 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiff Daniel J Schlicksup. (O'Day, Daniel)
December 6, 2010 46 MOTION for Protective Order by Defendants Alice Barbour, Robin D Beran, James B Buda, David B Burritt, Caterpillar, Inc., Douglas R Oberhelman, Edward J Rapp. Responses due by 12/23/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Pearlman, Steven)
October 12, 2010 Featured Case TEXT ONLY ORDER denying 45 Plaintiff's Appeal of Magistrate Decision to District Court. The Magistrate Judge amends the parties' scheduling order after consultation with the District Court. Magistrate Judge Cudmore did that in this case and the District Court does not find there to be any impropriety in the Amended Scheduling Order entered on 9/20/2010. The Amended Scheduling Order is neither clearly erroneous nor contrary to law. Plaintiff's appeal is accordingly DENIED. Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 10/12/2010. (MMM1, ilcd)
October 4, 2010 45 Featured Case APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by Daniel J Schlicksup (O'Day, Daniel)
September 17, 2010 Featured Case TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Byron Cudmore: The Court has reviewed Defendants' Motion to Amend Scheduling Order 43 and Plaintiff's Partial Opposition / Response 45 . Defendants' Motion to Amend Scheduling Order 43 ALLOWED IN PART. Scheduling deadlines extended as follows: All motions to join other parties and to amend the pleadings to be filed by 11/15/2010; any necessary status report concerning electronically stored information to be filed by 11/12/2010; Fact discovery closes 1/15/2011; Plaintiff's expert disclosure due by 2/1/2011; Defendants' expert disclosure due by 4/1/2011; Expert discovery closes 6/1/2011; Dispositive motions due by 8/1/2011. Each party to respond to any outstanding discovery requests on or before 9/30/2010. Maximum of 25 depositions allowed at this time. Final pretrial conference set 12/3/2010 at 2:00 p.m. CANCELLED and reset 11/17/2011 at 11:00 a.m. before U.S. District Judge Michael Mihm; Bench trial set 1/18/2011 CANCELLED and reset 1/16/2012 at 9:00 a.m. before Judge Mihm. Entered by Judge Cudmore on 9/17/2010. (LB, ilcd)
September 16, 2010 44 RESPONSE to Motion re 43 MOTION to Amend/Correct 17 Scheduling Order,,, filed by Plaintiff Daniel J Schlicksup. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Outline of what Plaintiff views as matters in dispute)(O'Day, Daniel)
August 30, 2010 43 MOTION to Amend/Correct 17 Scheduling Order,,, by Defendants Alice Barbour, Robin D Beran, James B Buda, David B Burritt, Caterpillar, Inc., Douglas R Oberhelman, Edward J Rapp. Responses due by 9/16/2010 (Turner, Joseph)
July 13, 2010 42 Featured Case ORDER entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 7/13/10. Plaintiff is able to present sufficient evidence to create a material issue under 18 U.S.C. § 1514(A) and 740 ILCS 174/20. Therefore, for the reasons set forth, Caterpillar's 28 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. SEE FULL ORDER. (FDT, ilcd)
July 9, 2010 Featured Case TEXT ONLY ORDER denying 40 Plaintiff's Motion to Supplement Record for Purposes of Pending Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's motion to supplement is untimely and unfairly prejudicial to Defendant. Defendant would otherwise have to be given additional time to conduct further discovery in order to respond to Plaintiff's newest assertions. It it simply too late for Plaintiff to supplement the record for purposes of his motion for summary judgment, as it is currently under consideration. Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 7/9/2010. (MMM1, ilcd)
July 8, 2010 41 RESPONSE to Motion re 40 MOTION to Supplement Record for Purposes of Pending Motion for Summary Jdugment filed by Defendants Alice Barbour, Robin D Beran, James B Buda, David B Burritt, Caterpillar, Inc., Douglas R Oberhelman, Edward J Rapp. (Pearlman, Steven)
July 2, 2010 Featured Case TEXT ONLY ORDER In order to expedite ruling on Plaintiff's Motion to Supplement Record for Purposes of Pending Motion for Summary Judgment, Defendants are directed to filed their Response, if any, by 7/8/2010. Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 7/2/2010. (MMM1, ilcd)
June 23, 2010 40 MOTION to Supplement Record for Purposes of Pending Motion for Summary Jdugment by Plaintiff Daniel J Schlicksup. Responses due by 7/12/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(O'Day, Daniel)
January 19, 2010 39 REPLY to Response to Motion re 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendants Alice Barbour, Robin D Beran, James B Buda, David B Burritt, Caterpillar, Inc., Douglas R Oberhelman, Edward J Rapp. (Clark, Kathryn)
January 6, 2010 Featured Case TEXT ONLY ORDER granting 38 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Replies due by 1/19/2010. No further extensions of this deadline will be permitted. Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 01/06/2010. (MMM2, ilcd)
January 5, 2010 38 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Brief in Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment (UNOPPOSED) by Defendants Alice Barbour, Robin D Beran, James B Buda, David B Burritt, Caterpillar, Inc., Douglas R Oberhelman, Edward J Rapp. Responses due by 1/22/2010 (Clark, Kathryn)
December 28, 2009 Featured Case TEXT ONLY ORDER granting 37 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Replies due by 1/11/2010. Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 12/28/09. (MMM2, ilcd)
December 22, 2009 37 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Brief In Support Of Their Motion For Summary Judgment (UNOPPOSED) by Defendants Alice Barbour, Robin D Beran, James B Buda, David B Burritt, Caterpillar, Inc., Douglas R Oberhelman, Edward J Rapp. Responses due by 1/8/2010 (Clark, Kathryn)
December 17, 2009 36 RESPONSE to Motion re 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Request for Oral Argument filed by Plaintiff Daniel J Schlicksup. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4 part 1, # 5 Exhibit 4 part 2, # 6 Exhibit 4 part 3, # 7 Exhibit 5)(O'Day, Daniel)
December 16, 2009 Featured Case TEXT ONLY ORDER STRIKING/VACATING DOCUMENT: 34 Response to Motion filed by Daniel J Schlicksup is STRICKEN AND SEALED as it contains personal identifiers. Counsel is directed to refile this document with the proper redactions applied. Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 12/16/09. (FDT, ilcd)
December 14, 2009 35 AFFIDAVIT re 34 Response to Motion, of Daniel Joseph Schlicksup by Daniel J Schlicksup. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit HR019, # 2 Exhibit HR023b, # 3 Exhibit HR024, # 4 Exhibit HR031, # 5 Exhibit HR035, # 6 Exhibit M001 part 1, # 7 Exhibit M001 part 2, # 8 Exhibit M001 part 3, # 9 Exhibit P-Ex-AA, # 10 Exhibit P-Ex-AAA, # 11 Exhibit P-Ex-AAB, # 12 Exhibit P-Ex-AAC, # 13 Exhibit P-Ex-AAE, # 14 Exhibit P-Ex-AAF, # 15 Exhibit P-Ex-AAG, # 16 Exhibit P-Ex-AAH, # 17 Exhibit P-Ex-AAI, # 18 Exhibit P-Ex-AAJ, # 19 Exhibit P-Ex-AAK, # 20 Exhibit P-Ex-AAL, # 21 Exhibit P-Ex-AAM, # 22 Exhibit P-Ex-AAN, # 23 Exhibit P-Ex-AAO, # 24 Exhibit P-Ex-AAP, # 25 Exhibit P-Ex-AAQ, # 26 Exhibit P-Ex-AAR, # 27 Exhibit P-Ex-AAS, # 28 Exhibit P-Ex-AAT, # 29 Exhibit P-Ex-AAU, # 30 Exhibit P-Ex-AAV, # 31 Exhibit P-Ex-AAX, # 32 Exhibit P-Ex-AAY, # 33 Exhibit P-Ex-AAZ, # 34 Exhibit P-Ex-AB, # 35 Exhibit P-Ex-AC, # 36 Exhibit P-Ex-AD, # 37 Exhibit P-Ex-AE, # 38 Exhibit P-Ex-AF, # 39 Exhibit P-Ex-AG, # 40 Exhibit P-Ex-AH, # 41 Exhibit P-Ex-AI, # 42 Exhibit P-Ex-AJ, # 43 Exhibit P-Ex-AK, # 44 Exhibit P-Ex-AL, # 45 Exhibit P-Ex-AM, # 46 Exhibit P-Ex-AN, # 47 Exhibit P-Ex-AO, # 48 Exhibit P-Ex-AP, # 49 Exhibit P-Ex-AQ, # 50 Exhibit P-Ex-AR, # 51 Exhibit P-Ex-AS, # 52 Exhibit P-Ex-AT, # 53 Exhibit P-Ex-AU, # 54 Exhibit P-Ex-AV, # 55 Exhibit P-Ex-AW, # 56 Exhibit P-Ex-AX, # 57 Exhibit P-Ex-AY, # 58 Exhibit P-Ex-AZ, # 59 Exhibit P-Ex-K, # 60 Exhibit P-Ex-L, # 61 Exhibit P-Ex-M, # 62 Exhibit P-Ex-N, # 63 Exhibit P-Ex-O, # 64 Exhibit P-Ex-P, # 65 Exhibit P-Ex-Q, # 66 Exhibit P-Ex-R, # 67 Exhibit P-Ex-S, # 68 Exhibit P-Ex-T, # 69 Exhibit P-Ex-U, # 70 Exhibit P-Ex-V, # 71 Exhibit P-Ex-W, # 72 Exhibit P-Ex-X, # 73 Exhibit P-Ex-Y, # 74 Exhibit P-Ex-Z)(O'Day, Daniel)
December 14, 2009 34 EDIT BY CLERK: DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER TEXT ORDER OF 12/16/09: RESPONSE to Motion re 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Request for Oral Argument filed by Plaintiff Daniel J Schlicksup. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4 part 1, # 5 Exhibit 4 part 2, # 6 Exhibit 4 part 3, # 7 Exhibit 5)(O'Day, Daniel) Modified on 12/21/2009 (HK, ilcd).
November 30, 2009 Featured Case TEXT ONLY ORDER granting 33 Motion to Stay Discovery, except as may be specifically requested and ordered pursuant to Rule 56(f), until the pending Motion for Summary Judgment is resolved.. Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 11/30/9. (MMM2, ilcd)
November 25, 2009 33 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending a Ruling on Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendants Alice Barbour, Robin D Beran, James B Buda, David B Burritt, Caterpillar, Inc., Douglas R Oberhelman, Edward J Rapp. Responses due by 12/14/2009 (Clark, Kathryn)
November 20, 2009 Featured Case TEST ONLY ORDER granting 32 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 12/14/2009. Replies due by 12/28/2009. Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 11/20/09. (MMM2, ilcd)
November 19, 2009 32 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Daniel J Schlicksup. Responses due by 12/7/2009 (O'Day, Daniel)
November 12, 2009 Featured Case TEXT ONLY ORDER noting that counsel has recently filed discovery in this case. The Court reminds counsel that discovery is not to be filed with the Court unless attached in support of a motion seeking relief. Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 11/12/09. (MMM2, ilcd)
November 12, 2009 31 NOTICE of Filing (O'Day, Daniel)
November 12, 2009 30 NOTICE of Discovery (O'Day, Daniel)
November 4, 2009 29 Appendix re 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Alice Barbour, Robin D Beran, James B Buda, David B Burritt, Caterpillar, Inc., Douglas R Oberhelman, Edward J Rapp. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Clark, Kathryn)
November 4, 2009 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendants Alice Barbour, Robin D Beran, James B Buda, David B Burritt, Caterpillar, Inc., Douglas R Oberhelman, Edward J Rapp. Responses due by 11/30/2009 (Clark, Kathryn)
November 2, 2009 27 NOTICE of Compliance with Rule 26 Disclosures (O'Day, Daniel)
October 29, 2009 26 CERTIFICATE Defendant Caterpillar Inc.'s Corporate Disclosure Statement. (Clark, Kathryn)
October 9, 2009 25 ANSWER to Complaint Amendment by Defendant Douglas R Oberhelman.(Clark, Kathryn)
October 9, 2009 24 ANSWER to Complaint Amendment by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc..(Clark, Kathryn)
October 9, 2009 23 ANSWER to Complaint Amendment by Defendant David B Burritt.(Clark, Kathryn)
October 9, 2009 22 ANSWER to Complaint Amendment by Defendant James B Buda.(Clark, Kathryn)
October 9, 2009 21 ANSWER to Complaint Amendment by Defendant Robin D Beran.(Clark, Kathryn)
October 9, 2009 20 ANSWER to Complaint Amendment by Defendant Alice Barbour.(Clark, Kathryn)
October 9, 2009 19 ANSWER to Complaint Amendment by Defendant Edward J Rapp.(Clark, Kathryn)
September 23, 2009 18 NOTICE of Filing Subpoena in a Civil Case and Affidavit of Service (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(O'Day, Daniel)
September 16, 2009 17 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER: Attorneys Daniel G. O'Day and Joseph S. Turner present by telephone for Rule 16 conference; Same held at 10:00 AM on 9/16/2009; SCHEDULING TIME LIMITS ORDERED: Amended Pleadings due by 12/1/2009. Discovery due by 5/1/2010. Defendant`s Expert Disclosure due by 4/1/2010. Plaintiff`s Expert Disclosure due by 2/1/2010. Expert Discovery due by 7/1/2010. Initial Disclosures due by 11/2/2009. Joinder of Parties due by 12/1/2009. Dispositive Motions due by 9/1/2010. Final Pretrial Conference set 12/3/2010 at 2:00 PM before U.S. District Judge Michael M. Mihm. Bench Trial set 1/18/2011 at 8:30 AM before Judge Mihm. See written order entered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Byron G. Cudmore on 9/16/09. (Attachments: # 1 Courtroom Technology Brochure, # 2 Mediation Memorandum) (LB, ilcd)
September 16, 2009 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Byron G. Cudmore: Scheduling Conference held on 9/16/2009. Written Scheduling Order to follow. (LB, ilcd)
September 16, 2009 16 Amendment to 1 Complaint by Daniel J Schlicksup. (ME, ilcd)
September 16, 2009 Featured Case TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Byron Cudmore. Plaintiff's Motion to File Amendment to Complaint 14 allowed without objection by the Defendants. Clerk directed to file Plaintiff's Amendment to Complaint [14-2] instanter. Defendants to answer or otherwise plead to new counts by 10/9/2009. Entered on 9/16/09. (ME, ilcd)
September 14, 2009 15 DISCOVERY PLAN - PROPOSED by Daniel J Schlicksup. (O'Day, Daniel)
August 25, 2009 14 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Daniel J Schlicksup. Responses due by 9/11/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(O'Day, Daniel)
August 12, 2009 REMARK: FIRST LETTER regarding ECF compliance sent to Plaintiff's counsel, David V. Dorris, by Magistrate Judge Cudmore on 8/12/2009. (LB, ilcd)
August 12, 2009 NOTICE OF HEARING: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for Wednesday, 9/16/2009, at 10:00 AM by telephone (court will place call) before Magistrate Judge Byron G. Cudmore. Attorneys are directed to comply with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) by meeting as soon as practicable, and in any event at least fourteen (14) days prior to the scheduling conference, and are to submit a proposed discovery plan in writing to the Court on or before 9/14/2009. Such a plan must include, at a minimum, those items listed in CDIL-LR 26.2(3), Rule 16(b), Rule 26(f), and CDIL-LR 16.2(E) with proposed deadlines. The parties are directed to specifically address the provisions, if any, for discovery or disclosure of electronically stored information, and to discuss agreements, if any, the parties reach for asserting claims of privilege or of protection as trial preparation material, after inadvertent production. Any plan filed shall specifically address the need, or lack thereof, concerning discovery of electronically stored information. If a discovery plan is not submitted as required, the scheduling hearing will not be held and costs may be assessed. Lead counsel or other counsel of record with knowledge of the case should be available to participate in the Rule 16 scheduling hearing. (LB, ilcd)
August 11, 2009 13 David B. Burritt's ANSWER to 1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Defendant David B Burritt.(Turner, Joseph)
August 11, 2009 12 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Steven J Pearlman on behalf of all defendants (Pearlman, Steven)
August 11, 2009 11 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Kathryn S Clark on behalf of all defendants (Clark, Kathryn)
August 11, 2009 10 Edward J. Rapp's ANSWER to 1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Defendant Edward J Rapp.(Turner, Joseph)
August 11, 2009 9 Douglas R. Oberhelman's ANSWER to 1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Defendant Douglas R Oberhelman.(Turner, Joseph)
August 11, 2009 8 James B. Buda's ANSWER to 1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Defendant James B Buda.(Turner, Joseph)
August 11, 2009 7 Robin D. Beran's ANSWER to 1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Defendant Robin D Beran.(Turner, Joseph)
August 11, 2009 6 Alice Barbour's ANSWER to 1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Defendant Alice Barbour.(Turner, Joseph)
August 11, 2009 5 Caterpillar Inc.'s ANSWER to 1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc..(Turner, Joseph)
August 11, 2009 4 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Joseph S Turner on behalf of all defendants (Turner, Joseph)
June 12, 2009 3 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Caterpillar, Inc., Robin D. Beran, Douglas R. Oberhelm, Edward J. Rapp, James B. Buda, David B. Burritt, and Alice Barbour on 6/12/09. (FDT, ilcd)
June 12, 2009 Featured Case TEXT ONLY ORDER Entered by Magistrate Judge Byron G. Cudmore on 6/12/09 STRIKING/VACATING DOCUMENTS: 2 Requests for Waivers of Service and Notices of Lawsuit filed by Daniel J. Schlicksup are STRICKEN AND SEALED as they were incorrectly dated. Counsel is directed to refile these Requests for Waivers of Service and Notices of Lawsuit with the correct date. (FDT, ilcd)
June 12, 2009 2 EDIT BY CLERK: DOCUMENTS STRICKEN PURSUANT TO 6/12/09 TEXT ORDER. REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Caterpillar, Inc., David B. Burritt, Alice Barbour, Robin D. Beran, James B. Buda, Douglas R. Oberhelman, and Edward J. Rapp on 6/12/09. (FDT, ilcd) Modified on 6/12/2009 (FDT, ilcd).
June 12, 2009 1 COMPLAINT against all defendants filed by Daniel J Schlicksup. Filing fee in the amount of $350.00 paid - receipt #14626004175.(FDT, ilcd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/12/2009: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (FDT, ilcd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schlicksup v. Caterpillar, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel J Schlicksup
Represented By: Daniel G O'Day
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caterpillar, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David B Burritt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alice Barbour
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin D Beran
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James B Buda
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas R Oberhelman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward J Rapp
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]