Repking v. McKennedy

Defendant: David McKennedy
Plaintiff: William T Repking
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv02034
Filed: February 3, 2012
 
Court: Illinois Central District Court
Office: Urbana Office
County: Montgomery
Referring Judge: Byron G. Cudmore
Presiding Judge: Richard Mills
 
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 18, 2013 49 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION (See Written Opinion): Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment (d/e 40 ) is ALLOWED, and Defendant's Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment (d/e 42 ) is DENIED as moot. The Court enters partial summary judgment in favor of Plaintiff William T. Repking and against Defendant David A. McKennedy on the issues of McKennedy's negligence and whether McKennedy's negligence was the proximate cause of the injurious accident, as alleged in C ount I of the Complaint. The trial on Count I will be limited to damages in accordance with this Opinion. Telephone conference to discuss scheduling and to discuss a referral for Court-sponsored mediation set Wednesday, November 6, 2013, at 2:00 p.m. (Court will place call.) Entered by Magistrate Judge Byron G. Cudmore on 10182013. (VM, ilcd)
October 24, 2013 50 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION by U.S. Magistrate Judge Byron Cudmore: Defendant's First Motion in Limine to Bar Evidence of the Defendant's Use of Drugs or Mental Condition at Trial 37 ALLOWED; Defendant's Third Motion in Limine 39 ALLOWED; Defendant's Second Motion in Limine 38 ALLOWED in part and DENIED in part. See written order. (LB, ilcd)
May 6, 2014 61 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint 52 is DENIED. See written order. (LB, ilcd)
May 22, 2014 64 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins: Defendant David McKennedy's Fourth Motion in Limine 51 is DENIED. See written order. (LB, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Repking v. McKennedy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David McKennedy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William T Repking
Represented By: Aaron D Lauter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]