Stuller et al v. USA

Plaintiff: Estate of Harold Stuller, deceased, Wilma Stuller and L.S.A., Inc.
Defendant: The United States of America and its Agency, Secretary, Treasury Department, Internal Revenue Service
Case Number: 3:2011cv03080
Filed: March 23, 2011
Court: Illinois Central District Court
Office: Springfield Office
County: Sangamon
Referring Judge: Byron G. Cudmore
Presiding Judge: Richard Mills
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 28, 2012 24 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION by U.S. Magistrate Judge Byron Cudmore: Plaintiffs' Motion to Determine the Sufficiency of an Objection to Plaintiffs' Request for Admission (filed as motion to compel) 21 DENIED. See written order. (LB, ilcd)
March 27, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION (See Written Opinion): The Motion in Limine of Defendant United States of America to Quash the Subpoena Issued to IRS Revenue Agent Mark Wade [d/e 29 ] is DENIED. The Motion in Limine of Defendant United States of America to Preclude Mack Motes from Testifying as an Expert on the Issue of whether the Plaintiffs Carried on their Horse-Breeding Operation with the Intent of Earning a Profit or, in the alternative, to Allow Voir Dire with the opportunity to Renew this Motion [d/e [30 ]] is hereby Held in Abeyance, as provided in this Order. The Motion in Limine of Defendant United States of America to Exclude Evidence Regarding the Plaintiff's Expectation that the Property at issue would increase in value under 26 C.F.R. § 1.183-1(d) [d/e 31 is DENIED, as provided in this Order. Entered by Judge Richard Mills on 3/27/2013. (VM, ilcd)
July 10, 2014 57 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION (See Written Opinion): The Motion of Defendant United States of America to Exclude any Expert Testimony from Mack Motes on the issue of whether the Plaintiffs carried on their Horse-Breeding Operation with the Intent of Earning a Profit [d/e 30 ] is ALLOWED. The Parties' other evidentiary Objections have been addressed as provided in this Order. Entered by Judge Richard Mills on 7/10/2014. (VM, ilcd)
July 24, 2014 58 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION: The Clerk will enter Judgment in favor of Defendant UnitedStates of America. Pursuant to the Parties' Stipulation as reflected in the Final Pretrial Order, the Plaintiffs are entitled to a refund of the late payment penalty assessed against them in the amount of $16,454.69, pursuant to 26 U.S.C. § 6651(a)(2) for the tax year 2003, plus statutory interest. Entered by Judge Richard Mills on 7/22/2014. (ME, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stuller et al v. USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Harold Stuller, deceased
Represented By: David R Reid
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilma Stuller
Represented By: David R Reid
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: David R Reid
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States of America and its Agency, Secretary, Treasury Department, Internal Revenue Service
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]