AK et al v. Hamos et al

Defendant: Julie Hamos, THE ILLINOIS MENTAL HEALTH COLLABORATIVE FOR ACCESS AND CHOICE and Michelle R.B. Saddler
Plaintiff: AK, PG, ML, AF, BA, TK and TW
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv03020
Filed: January 30, 2013
 
Court: Illinois Central District Court
Office: Springfield Office
County: Sangamon
Referring Judge: Byron G. Cudmore
Presiding Judge: Sue E. Myerscough
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
February 28, 2013 16 Featured Case OPINION (See Written Opinion): The preliminary injunction hearing scheduled regarding Plaintiff P.G. in A.K. et al. v. Hamos et al., No. 13-3020 set for March 4, 2013 at 3:00 p.m. is VACATED and RESET to March 20, 2013 at 9:00 a.m. Entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 02/27/2013. (VM, ilcd)
January 24, 2014 45 Featured Case OPINION: For the reasons stated, the Collaborative's Motion to Dismiss (d/e 41 ) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN THE PART. The claims against the Collaborative brought by Plaintiffs A.K., by and through his mother, S.K; M.L., by and through his mother, V.L.; T.K., by and through her mother, L.S.; T.W., by and through her mother, M.R., A.F., by and through her parents S.F. and M.F.; B.A., by and through her legal guardian, J.A.; and Sa.F., by and through her mother J.F., are DISMISSE D for failure to state a claim. Plaintiffs P.G., by and through his mother, K.G., and C.S. have, for purposes of the Motion to Dismiss, adequately demonstrated that they have standing to bring their claims against the Collaborative. The Collaborative shall file an Answer to the Second Amended Complaint on or before February 7, 2014. Entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 13-3020. (VM, ilcd)
April 21, 2014 65 Featured Case OPINION (See Written Opinion): For the reasons stated, Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or Transfer Case to Northern District of Illinois (d/e 56 ) is DENIED. The Court, sua sponte, STAYS this cause of action pending a determination in N.B. v. Hamos of whether the Department's system violates the EPSDT provisions and the integration mandate of the ADA and Rehabilitation Act. All pending deadlines are vacated. Entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 4/21/2014. (VM, ilcd)
January 31, 2013 6 Featured Case OPINION (See Written Opinion). Entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 1/31/2013. (VM, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: AK et al v. Hamos et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Hamos
Represented By: Deborah L Barnes
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE ILLINOIS MENTAL HEALTH COLLABORATIVE FOR ACCESS AND CHOICE
Represented By: J Matthew Anderson
Represented By: John E Thies
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle R.B. Saddler
Represented By: Deborah L Barnes
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AK
Represented By: Michelle N Schneiderheinze
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PG
Represented By: Michelle N Schneiderheinze
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ML
Represented By: Michelle N Schneiderheinze
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AF
Represented By: Michelle N Schneiderheinze
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BA
Represented By: Michelle N Schneiderheinze
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TK
Represented By: Michelle N Schneiderheinze
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TW
Represented By: Michelle N Schneiderheinze
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]