Clark v. Moline Public Library et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Mary B Clark
Defendant: Moline Public Library, Leslie Kee and City of Moline
 
Case Number: 4:2009cv04054
Filed: July 27, 2009
 
Court: Illinois Central District Court
Office: Rock Island Office
County: Rock Island
Referring Judge: John A. Gorman
Presiding Judge: Michael M. Mihm
 
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 2, 2010 31 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Mary B Clark. (TK, ilcd)
August 2, 2010 Featured Case TEXT ONLY ORDER by Magistrate Judge John A. Gorman granting 30 Motion to Dismiss City of Moline. Clerk is directed to file the stipulation attached to Motion #30 and terminate the case. Status conference set on 8/6/10 is cancelled. Entered on 8/2/10. (WW, ilcd)
July 30, 2010 30 MOTION to Dismiss CITY OF MOLINE BY STIPULATION by Defendant City of Moline. Responses due by 8/16/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Pacino, Evelyn)
July 29, 2010 Featured Case TEXT ORDER Entered by Magistrate Judge John A. Gorman on 7/29/10granting 29 Motion to Dismiss. Clerk to show defendant Kee as terminated from the case on 7/29/10. (TK, ilcd)
July 28, 2010 29 MOTION to Dismiss LESLIE KEE BY STIPULATION by Defendant Leslie Kee. Responses due by 8/16/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Pacino, Evelyn)
July 9, 2010 Featured Case TEXT ONLY ORDER by Magistrate Judge John A. Gorman: Status Conference set for Friday, 8/6/2010 at 10:30 AM by telephone from Peoria (court will place call) before Magistrate Judge John A. Gorman. Entered on 7/9/10. (WW, ilcd)
June 21, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John A. Gorman: Parties present via phone by atty O'Brien with Plaintiff Mary Clark and atty Pacino for Status Conference on 6/21/2010. Same held. Parties continue to discuss settlement. (TK, ilcd)
June 9, 2010 NOTICE of Hearing: Per request of the parties, a Status Conference is set for 6/21/2010 at 11:30 AM by telephone from Peoria (court will place call) before Magistrate Judge John A. Gorman. The conference is to discuss the status of the settlement.(WW, ilcd)
May 14, 2010 Featured Case TEXT ORDER Entered by Magistrate Judge John A. Gorman on 5/14/10. The Court is granting Oral Motion for Settlement Order. (DK, ilcd)
May 14, 2010 28 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge John A. Gorman following report of settlement. This case has been reported settled by the parties. The parties are hereby directed to file with the court, within thirty-five (35) days of the date of this order (Settlement Papers due by 6/18/2010), a stipulation of dismissal or other appropriate pleading. Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). All timetables and scheduled hearings in this case are cancelled until further notice. Entered on 5/14/10. (WW, ilcd)
May 14, 2010 Oral MOTION for Order following report of settlement by Plaintiff Mary B Clark. (WW, ilcd)
April 8, 2010 Featured Case TEXT ONLY ORDER by Magistrate Judge John A. Gorman granting Oral Motion to Continue. The Settlement Conference set for 4/15/2010 is CANCELLED and RESET to 5/17/2010 at 1:30 PM in chambers IN PEORIA before Magistrate Judge John A. Gorman. Persons with settlement authority to be present in person. Parties to submit directly to chambers a settlement statement stating their position in regard to settlement by 5/12/10. This shall include history of offers and demands along with a brief statement of position on facts and legal issues. Do not file this statement with the clerk office or exchange with opposing parties. Parties have leave of court to fax the statement directly to chambers at 309-671-7141. Entered on 4/8/10. (WW, ilcd)
April 8, 2010 ORAL MOTION to Continue the scheduled settlement conference by Defendants City of Moline, Leslie Kee. (WW, ilcd)
March 16, 2010 Featured Case TEXT ONLY ORDER by Magistrate Judge John A. Gorman: Settlement Conference set for 4/15/2010 at 1:30 PM in chambers IN PEORIA before Magistrate Judge John A. Gorman. Persons with settlement authority to be present in person. Parties to submit directly to chambers a settlement statement stating their position in regard to settlement by 4/12/10. This shall include history of offers and demands along with a brief statement of position on facts and legal issues. Do not file this statement with the clerk office or exchange with opposing parties. Parties have leave of court to fax the statement directly to chambers at 309-671-7141.. Entered on 3/16/10. (WW, ilcd)
March 10, 2010 27 NOTICE OF FILING DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (Pacino, Evelyn)
March 10, 2010 26 ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES to Complaint First Amended by City of Moline, Leslie Kee.(Pacino, Evelyn) Modified on 3/11/2010 to add "affirmative defenses" to title (DK, ilcd).
February 22, 2010 25 Featured Case "CLAWBACK" ORDER Regarding Electronically Stored Information Entered by Magistrate Judge John A. Gorman on 2/22/10. (DK, ilcd)
February 17, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John A. Gorman. Parties present via phone with Attys O'Brien and Pacino for Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held on 2/17/2010. The Court approves the discovery plan as submitted and sets the following dates: Discovery due by 9/17/2010. Dispositive Motions due by 10/22/2010. Case is set for Final Pretrial Conference on Wed., 2/16/2011 at 02:00 PM in person in Rock Island Courtroom before Magistrate Judge John A. Gorman. Jury Trial is set for Monday, 3/21/2011 at 09:00 AM in Rock Island Courtroom before Magistrate Judge John A. Gorman. (DK, ilcd)
February 15, 2010 24 NOTICE OF FILING "CLAWBACK" AGREEMENT REGARDING ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION (Pacino, Evelyn)
February 15, 2010 23 NOTICE "CLAWBACK" AGREEMENT REGARDING ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION (Pacino, Evelyn)
February 9, 2010 22 AMENDED COMPLAINT against City of Moline, Leslie Kee, Moline Public Library, filed by Mary B Clark.(O'Brien, Dorothy)
January 29, 2010 21 Featured Case ORDER Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 1/29/10: CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Magistrate Judge John A. Gorman. (DK, ilcd)
January 27, 2010 20 DISCOVERY PLAN - PROPOSED by City of Moline, Leslie Kee, Moline Public Library. (Pacino, Evelyn)
January 26, 2010 19 Featured Case ORDER Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 1/26/10. The Court is granting in part and denying in part 11 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. The Moline Public Library are Board are terminated as defendants in this matter. Where she has been granted leave to do so, Clark shall file an amended complaint curing the identified deficiencies if she is able to do so in good faith within 14 days from the date of this Order. Amended Pleadings due by 2/9/2010. (DK, ilcd)
December 28, 2009 18 Featured Case ORDER Entered by Magistrate Judge John A. Gorman on 12/28/2009 setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference. This case is set for a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for Wednesday, 2/17/2010 at 11:15 AM in person in chambers in Rock Island before Magistrate Judge John A. Gorman. If an agreed Discovery Plan pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(f)(3) is filed on or before February 15, 2010, the Court will AUTOMATICALLY convert the conference to a telephone conference without further order or notice to the parties. The Court will set up the call. (TP, ilcd)
October 20, 2009 Featured Case TEXT ONLY ORDER by Judge Michael M. Mihm clarifying Protective Order 17 entered on 10/16/09. In the event that parties find it necessary to file confidential documents under seal under paragraph 6 of the Protective Order, parties shall follow Section IIIA of the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing (Civil). Entered on 10/20/09. (WW, ilcd)
October 16, 2009 17 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 10/16/2009. (TP, ilcd)
October 8, 2009 16 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Plaintiff Mary B Clark, Defendants Moline Public Library, Leslie Kee, City of Moline. Responses due by 10/26/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Protective Order)(O'Brien, Dorothy)
September 28, 2009 15 NOTICE OF FILING DEFENDANTS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS (Pacino, Evelyn)
September 28, 2009 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re 11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendants Moline Public Library, Leslie Kee, City of Moline. (Pacino, Evelyn)
September 14, 2009 13 RESPONSE to Motion re 11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Mary B Clark. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Plaintiff's Illinois Dept. of Human Rights Charge)(O'Brien, Dorothy)
August 28, 2009 12 NOTICE re 11 MOTION to Dismiss (Sanguinetti, Evelyn)
August 28, 2009 11 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant City of Moline. Responses due by 9/14/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Sanguinetti, Evelyn)
August 28, 2009 10 Featured Case ORDER Entered by Magistrate Judge John A. Gorman on 08/28/2009 granting 7 Motion to Quash. The subpoena issued by this Court is invalid. This Court has no jurisdiction over records in Michigan. See Fed.R.Civ.P. 45(b)(2)(subpoena for records to be issued from the court for the district where the production or inspection is to be made). Although Plaintiff's response to this motion indicates her intention to issue a new subpoena from Michigan, that does not resolve the jurisdictional issue. Any dispute about a subpoena issued by a court in Michigan must be resolved by the issuing court, namely the Michigan court. Fed.R.Civ.P. 45(c)(2)A)(ii). (TP, ilcd)
August 24, 2009 9 RESPONSE to Motion re 7 MOTION to Quash Subpoena filed by Plaintiff Mary B Clark. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Jennifer Mooney Bauer)(O'Brien, Dorothy)
August 19, 2009 Featured Case CORRECTING TEXT ORDER Entered by Magistrate Judge John A. Gorman on 8/19/09. It has come to the Court's attention, that Atty Evelyn Pacino is in fact, Evelyn Pacino Sanguinetti. Therefore, the previous Order entered on 8/19/09 is VACATED and the Motion to Quash is reinstated.(DK, ilcd)
August 19, 2009 Featured Case TEXT ORDER Entered by Magistrate Judge John A. Gorman on 8/19/09. The Court is striking 7 Motion to Quash as it was e-filed by an attorney that has not entered an appearance in this case. Also, pursuant to the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Filing of this Court, the attorney that has signed the document must be the attorney that e-files the document using their court login and password. In this case, Atty Pacino signed the document and e-filed it using Atty Sanguinetti's login and password. Defendant has leave to re-file the Motion to Quash.(DK, ilcd)
August 18, 2009 8 NOTICE OF FILING MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA (Sanguinetti, Evelyn)
August 18, 2009 7 MOTION to Quash Subpoena by Defendants Moline Public Library, Leslie Kee, City of Moline. Responses due by 9/4/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Complaint, # 2 Exhibit Subpoena to Baldwin Library, # 3 Exhibit Counsel e-mails, # 4 Exhibit Map Quest directions)(Sanguinetti, Evelyn) Modified on 8/19/2009 (DK, ilcd) to re-instate the Motion to Quash pursuant to Text Order of 8/19/09.
July 31, 2009 6 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Evelyn Pacino Sanguinetti on behalf of Moline Public Library, Leslie Kee, City of Moline (Sanguinetti, Evelyn)
July 28, 2009 5 Summons Issued as to City of Moline and returned to Plaintiff's attorney for service. (DK, ilcd)
July 27, 2009 4 Summons Issued as to Moline Public Library Board of Trustees. (DK, ilcd)
July 27, 2009 3 Summons Issued as to Leslie Kee. (DK, ilcd)
July 27, 2009 2 Summons Issued as to Moline Public Library. (DK, ilcd)
July 27, 2009 1 COMPLAINT against Moline Public Library, Leslie Kee, City of Moline (Filing fee $ 350.00, Receipt # 44626000358) filed by Mary B Clark. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DK, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Clark v. Moline Public Library et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary B Clark
Represented By: Dorothy A O'Brien
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moline Public Library
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie Kee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Moline
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]