McDaniel et al v. QWest Communications Corporation et al Featured Case

 
Case Number: 1:2005cv01008
Filed: February 18, 2005
 
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
Presiding Judge: Rebecca R. Pallmeyer
 
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 6, 2012 409 TRANSMITTED to the USCA for the 7th Circuit supplemental record on appeal 393 (USCA no. 12-3036) consisting of one volume transcript. (kj, )
November 1, 2012 408 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 8/15/12 before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Court Reporter Contact Information: FRANCES WARD (312)435-5561 or frances_ward@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter FRANCES WARD (312)435-5561 before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter FRANCES WARD (312)435-5561 or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 11/23/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/3/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/30/2013. (Ward, Frances)
September 25, 2012 407 USCA RECEIVED on 9/25/12 the long record regarding notice of appeal 393 (dj, )
September 25, 2012 406 TRANSMITTED to the USCA for the 7th Circuit the long record on appeal 393 (USCA no. 12-3036). (gel, )
September 13, 2012 405 CERTIFICATE of Service and Notice of Filing by Arthur T. Susman on behalf of Susman Group regarding 7th circuit transcript information sheet 404 (Susman, Arthur)
September 13, 2012 404 SEVENTH CIRCUIT transcript information sheet by Susman Group (Susman, Arthur)
September 12, 2012 403 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 8/2/12 before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Court Reporter Contact Information: FRANCES WARD (312)435-5561 or frances_ward@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter FRANCES WARD (312)435-5561 before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter FRANCES WARD (312)435-5561or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 10/3/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/15/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/11/2012. (Ward, Frances)
September 12, 2012 402 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 7/30/12 before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Court Reporter Contact Information: FRANCES WARD (312)435-5561 or frances_ward@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter FRANCES WARD (312)435-5561 before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter FRANCES WARD (312)435-5561 or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 10/3/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/15/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/11/2012. (Ward, Frances)
September 7, 2012 401 Featured Case ORDER from U.S.C.A. for the Seventh Circuit Case number 12-3036; District court Number 05-cv-1008; IT IS ORDERED that appellants file a complete statement of jurisdiction that includes the citizenship of all members of all limited liability companies. Appellants must also provide the state(s) of incorporation and principal place of business of all corporate parties, including the corporate plaintiffs. The statement is due on or before September 14, 2012. (kj, )
September 5, 2012 400 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT of receipt of short record on appeal regarding notice of appeal 393 ; USCA Case No. 12-3036. (kj, )
September 5, 2012 399 Notice of Case Opening from 7th Circuit. (kj, )
September 5, 2012 398 TRANSMITTED to the 7th Circuit the short record on notice of appeal 393 . Notified counsel (gel, )
September 5, 2012 397 NOTICE of Appeal Due letter sent to counsel of record. (gel, )
August 31, 2012 396 NOTICE by Susman Group re docketing statement 395 and Certificate of Service (Susman, Arthur)
August 31, 2012 395 DOCKETING Statement by Susman Group regarding notice of appeal 393 (Susman, Arthur)
August 31, 2012 394 NOTICE by Susman Group re notice of appeal 393 and Certificate of Service (Susman, Arthur)
August 31, 2012 393 NOTICE of appeal by Susman Group regarding orders 392 , 391 , 380 , 379 , 381 Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0752-7507401. (Susman, Arthur)
August 15, 2012 392 Featured Case ORDER Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 8/15/2012. (ph, )
August 15, 2012 391 MINUTE entry before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Motion hearing held. Lead Settlement Class Counsel's motion for an order enforcing arbitration award and permitting disbursement of all escrow funds 382 granted. The Court concludes that it is appropriate to order the disbursement of all the escrowed attorneys' fees and expenses to all the parties, without prejudice to Mr. Susman's right to seek arbitration. Enter Order. (For further detail see separate order.) [For further detail see separate order(s).] Mailed notice (ph, )
August 14, 2012 390 MINUTE entry before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Motion hearing held. Lead settlement class counsel's motion for an order enforcing arbitration award and permitting disbursement of all escrow funds 382 entered and continued to 8/15/2012 at 8:45 AM. Mailed notice (etv, )
August 13, 2012 389 NOTICE by Diane J Snyder, Randy C Snyder, Robert J Snyder re declaration 388 (Cunniff, Kenneth)
August 13, 2012 388 DECLARATION of William T. Gotfryd (Second) in Support of Motion for an Order Enforcing Arbitration Award and Permitting Disbursement of Escrow Funds (Cunniff, Kenneth)
August 13, 2012 387 NOTICE by Diane J Snyder, Randy C Snyder, Robert J Snyder re reply, 386 (Cunniff, Kenneth)
August 13, 2012 386 REPLY by Plaintiffs Diane J Snyder, Diane J Snyder, Randy C Snyder, Randy C Snyder, Robert J Snyder in Support of Lead Settlement Class Counsel's Motion for an Order Enforcing Arbitration Award and Permitting Disbursement of Escrow Funds (Cunniff, Kenneth)
August 13, 2012 385 NOTICE by Diane J Snyder, Randy C Snyder re Response, 384 and Certificate of Service (Susman, Arthur)
August 13, 2012 384 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Diane J Snyder, Randy C Snyder to motion for order 382 Susman Group's Response to Lead Settlement Class Counsel's Motion for an Order Enforcing Arbitration Award and Permitting Disbursement of All Escrow Funds (Susman, Arthur)
August 9, 2012 383 NOTICE of Motion by Kenneth L. Cunniff for presentment of motion for order 382 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 8/14/2012 at 08:45 AM. (Cunniff, Kenneth)
August 9, 2012 382 MOTION by Plaintiffs Diane J Snyder, Diane J Snyder, Randy C Snyder for order Enforcing Arbitration Award and Permitting Disbursement of all Escrow Funds (Cunniff, Kenneth)
August 2, 2012 381 Featured Case ORDER Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 8/2/2012.(kj, )
August 2, 2012 380 MINUTE entry before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: The Court here by orders: All Settlement Class Counsel are bound by the July 6, 2012 Agreement to Arbitrate the Allocation of Attorneys' Fees and Costs Awarded in the Fiber-Optic-Cable Right-of-Way Litigation; Garretson Firm Resolution Group, Inc., shall make a partial release from the Illinois Fiber Optic Counsel Qualified Settlement Fund; and the Susman Group and Mr. Gotfryd may file a motion requesting an allocation under the Agreement to Arbitrate. Until then, the fees allocated to the Susman Group and Mr. Gotfryd will continue to be held in escrow. Enter Order. (For further detail see separate order.) Mailed notice. (kj, )
August 2, 2012 379 MINUTE entry before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Motion hearing held. Having considered the parties' written and oral submissions, the court concludes that Attorney Arthur Susman is bound by the agreement set forth in written form on July 6, 2012, including the arbitration provisions of that agreement. As the court has determined that Mr. Susman is bound by the parties' written agreement, the court concludes, further, that any remaining disputes concerning fees and costs will be referred to the arbitrators. (For further details see minute order.) Mr. Godfryd's motion to vacate 357 is deemed withdrawn. Motions for disbursement of funds [360, 362] are granted. Mailed notice (etv, )
August 2, 2012 378 NOTICE by Don Wayne McDaniel re other, 377 (Susman, Arthur)
August 2, 2012 377 E-mails Submitted by Respondents Susman, Watkins and Wylie in Response to Certain Settlement Class Counsel's Motion for An Order Enforcing Arbitration Award and Permitting Disbursement of Escrow Funds by Don Wayne McDaniel (Attachments: # 1 Attachment)(Susman, Arthur)
August 2, 2012 376 DECLARATION of Daniel Millea regarding motion for disbursement of funds 360 (Kauffman, Kathleen)
August 1, 2012 375 NOTICE by Brent Bauer, James Becherer, Judy Boren, Wayne Smith, Tri-County Feed Mill, Inc., Willaredt Acres, Inc. re memorandum in support of motion 374 (Kauffman, Kathleen)
August 1, 2012 374 MEMORANDUM by Brent Bauer, James Becherer, Judy Boren, Wayne Smith, Tri-County Feed Mill, Inc., Willaredt Acres, Inc. in support of motion for disbursement of funds 360 (Kauffman, Kathleen)
August 1, 2012 373 DECLARATION of Nels Ackerson regarding motion for disbursement of funds 360 (Kauffman, Kathleen)
August 1, 2012 372 NOTICE by Diane J Snyder, Randy C Snyder, Robert J Snyder re supplement 371 Submission (Cunniff, Kenneth)
August 1, 2012 371 SUPPLEMENT to Submission of Lead Settlement Class Counsel, William T. Gotfryd, Esq. in Support of Motion for an Order Enforcing Arbitration Award and Permitting Disbursement of Escrow Funds (Cunniff, Kenneth)
August 1, 2012 370 NOTICE by Diane J Snyder, Randy C Snyder, Robert J Snyder re declaration 369 (Cunniff, Kenneth)
August 1, 2012 369 DECLARATION of William T. Gotfryd Lead Settlement Class Counsel in Support of Motion for an Order Enforcing Arbitration Award and Permitting Disbursement of Escrow Funds (Cunniff, Kenneth)
August 1, 2012 368 DECLARATION of Irwin Levin regarding motion for disbursement of funds 360 (Kauffman, Kathleen)
August 1, 2012 367 DECLARATION of Kathleen Kauffman regarding motion for disbursement of funds 360 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Kauffman, Kathleen)
July 30, 2012 366 MINUTE entry before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Motion hearing held. Certain settlement class counsel's motion for an order enforcing arbitration award and permitting disbursement of escrow funds 360 entered and continued. Settlement class counsel, William T. Gotfryd, Esq., has leave to join in that motion 362 . Motion hearing set for 8/2/2012 at 9:30 AM, at which time the court understands the parties will supplement their submissions to provide evidence that Mr. Susman agreed to be bound by certain arbitration provisions. Mailed notice (etv, )
July 30, 2012 365 SUPPLEMENT to motion for disbursement of funds 360 SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY (Kauffman, Kathleen)
July 23, 2012 364 NOTICE of Motion by Kathleen Clubb Kauffman for presentment of motion for disbursement of funds 360 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/30/2012 at 09:00 AM. (Kauffman, Kathleen)
July 23, 2012 363 NOTICE by Diane J Snyder, Randy C Snyder, Robert J Snyder re MOTION by Plaintiffs Diane J Snyder, Diane J Snyder, Randy C Snyder, Randy C Snyder, Robert J Snyder for order Enforcing Arbitration Award and Permitting Disbursement of Escrow Funds 362 (Cunniff, Kenneth)
July 23, 2012 362 MOTION by Plaintiffs Diane J Snyder, Diane J Snyder, Randy C Snyder, Randy C Snyder, Robert J Snyder for order Enforcing Arbitration Award and Permitting Disbursement of Escrow Funds (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Cunniff, Kenneth)
July 20, 2012 361 NOTICE of Motion by Kathleen Clubb Kauffman for presentment of motion for disbursement of funds 360 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/25/2012 at 08:45 AM. (Kauffman, Kathleen)
July 20, 2012 360 MOTION by Plaintiffs Brent Bauer, James Becherer, Judy Boren, Wayne Smith, Tri-County Feed Mill, Inc., Willaredt Acres, Inc. for disbursement of funds (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Kauffman, Kathleen)
May 8, 2012 359 MINUTE entry before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Majority arbitrating Counsel's motion to withdraw their motion for interim distribution of escrow funds (Doc. No. 354) 356 granted. Motion for interim distribution 354 is withdrawn. Motion by William T. Gotfryd, Esq. to vacate order enforcing arbitration award 357 is entered and continued generally. The court understands the Special Master is moving forward as quickly as is reasonably possible, and directs there be no court appearance on May 16, 2012. Mailed notice (etv, )
May 3, 2012 358 NOTICE of Motion by Kenneth L. Cunniff for presentment of motion to vacate 357 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/16/2012 at 08:45 AM. (Cunniff, Kenneth)
May 3, 2012 357 MOTION by Plaintiffs Diane J Snyder, Diane J Snyder, Randy C Snyder, Randy C Snyder to vacate Order Enforcing Arbitration Award (Cunniff, Kenneth)
May 3, 2012 356 MOTION by Plaintiffs Brent Bauer, James Becherer, Judy Boren, Wayne Smith, Tri-County Feed Mill, Inc., Willaredt Acres, Inc. to withdraw notice of motion 355 , motion for disbursement of funds, 354 (Kauffman, Kathleen)
April 30, 2012 355 NOTICE of Motion by Kathleen Clubb Kauffman for presentment of motion for disbursement of funds, 354 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/16/2012 at 08:45 AM. (Kauffman, Kathleen)
April 30, 2012 354 MOTION by Plaintiffs James Becherer, Judy Boren, Wayne Smith, Tri-County Feed Mill, Inc., Willaredt Acres, Inc. for disbursement of funds (interim distribution of fees deposited in escrow) (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kauffman, Kathleen)
April 25, 2012 353 MINUTE entry before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Motion for leave to appear pro hac vice 352 is granted. Mailed notice (ph, )
April 24, 2012 352 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-7081024. (Caugh, Eric)
April 20, 2012 351 MINUTE entry before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Opposing counsel's response 338 to the the Snyder Plaintiffs' "Motion regarding Escrow Agreements" satisfies the court that the Snyder Plaintiffs' motion should be denied, and there has been no reply. The motion 336 is denied without prejudice. Mailed notice (etv, )
April 4, 2012 350 Featured Case ORDER Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/4/2012.(kj, )
April 4, 2012 349 MINUTE entry before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Motion hearing held. Certain arbitrating counsel's joint motion for entry of judgment, as to arbitrating counsel only, on the final arbitration award, and for the court to adopt the fee-and-cost allocation in the final arbitration award as to the non-arbitrating counsel [ 342 ] granted. The court notes that no distribution of funds is being made at this time and that this order thus does not prejudice non-arbitrating counsel. Case is referred to Retired Judge Wayne Andersen for further proceedings. Enter Order. (For further detail see separate order.) Mailed notice. (kj, )
April 3, 2012 348 NOTICE by Diane J Snyder, Randy C Snyder re sur-reply 347 (Cunniff, Kenneth)
April 3, 2012 347 SUR-REPLY by Plaintiffs Diane J Snyder, Randy C Snyder (Cunniff, Kenneth)
April 3, 2012 346 REPLY by James Becherer, Judy Boren, Wayne Smith, Tri-County Feed Mill, Inc., Willaredt Acres, Inc. to response in opposition to motion, 344 , MOTION by Plaintiffs Brent Bauer, James Becherer, Judy Boren, Wayne Smith, Tri-County Feed Mill, Inc., Willaredt Acres, Inc. for judgment AS TO ARBITRATING COUNSEL ONLY, ON THE FINAL ARBITRATION AWARD, AND FOR THE COURT TO ADOPT THE FEE-AND-COST ALL 342 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kauffman, Kathleen)
April 2, 2012 345 NOTICE by Robert J Snyder re response in opposition to motion, 344 by Certain Plaintiffs' Counsel to Enforce Arbitration Award Against Non-Arbitrating Counsel (Cunniff, Kenneth)
April 2, 2012 344 RESPONSE by Diane J Snyder, Randy C Snyderin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs Brent Bauer, James Becherer, Judy Boren, Wayne Smith, Tri-County Feed Mill, Inc., Willaredt Acres, Inc. for judgment AS TO ARBITRATING COUNSEL ONLY, ON THE FINAL ARBITRATION AWARD, AND FOR THE COURT TO ADOPT THE FEE-AND-COST ALL 342 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Cunniff, Kenneth)
March 23, 2012 343 NOTICE of Motion by Kathleen Clubb Kauffman for presentment of motion for judgment, 342 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/4/2012 at 08:45 AM. (Kauffman, Kathleen)
March 23, 2012 342 MOTION by Plaintiffs Brent Bauer, James Becherer, Judy Boren, Wayne Smith, Tri-County Feed Mill, Inc., Willaredt Acres, Inc. for judgment AS TO ARBITRATING COUNSEL ONLY, ON THE FINAL ARBITRATION AWARD, AND FOR THE COURT TO ADOPT THE FEE-AND-COST ALLOCATION IN THE FINAL ARBITRATION AWARD AS TO THE NONARBITRATING COUNSEL (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Kauffman, Kathleen)
January 5, 2012 341 MINUTE entry before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Status hearing held on 1/5/2012. Motion regarding escrow agreement signatories 336 is entered and continued for hearing before the Honorable Wayne R. Andersen (Ret.) Special Master. (kj, )
January 5, 2012 340 Featured Case ORDER Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 1/5/2012. (kj, )
January 5, 2012 339 MINUTE entry before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: With the agreement of all parties, pursuant to Rules 23(h)(4) and 53(a)(1)(A) of the Federal rules of Civil Procedure, the court hereby appoints the Honorable Wayne R. Anderson (Ret.) ("Judge Andersen") for the purpose of assisting the court in allocating the attorneys' fees awarded in this action. Enter Order Appointing The Honorable Wayne R. Andersen (Ret.) Special Master. (For further detail see separate order.) Mailed notice. [For further detail see separate order(s).] (kj, )
January 5, 2012 338 RESPONSE by Brent Bauer, James Becherer, Judy Boren, Wayne Smith, Tri-County Feed Mill, Inc., Willaredt Acres, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs Diane J Snyder, Randy C SnyderRegarding Escrow Agreement Signatories 336 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Kauffman, Kathleen)
January 4, 2012 337 NOTICE of Motion by Arthur T. Susman for presentment of motion for Regarding Escrow Agreement Signatories 336 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 1/10/2012 at 08:45 AM. (Susman, Arthur)(Docket text modified by Clerk's Office.) Modified on 1/5/2012 (kj, ).
January 4, 2012 336 MOTION by Plaintiffs Diane J Snyder, Randy C SnyderRegarding Escrow Agreement Signatories (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Susman, Arthur)
December 29, 2011 335 NOTICE by Diane J Snyder, Randy C Snyder re status report 334 of Filing (Cunniff, Kenneth)
December 29, 2011 334 STATUS Report on Behalf of Lead Counsel for Settlement Class Regarding Status of Attorneys' Fees and Expense Mediation by Diane J Snyder, Randy C Snyder (Cunniff, Kenneth)
December 16, 2011 333 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Diane J Snyder, Randy C Snyder by Kenneth L. Cunniff AMENDED (Cunniff, Kenneth)
December 16, 2011 332 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Brent Bauer, James Becherer, Billing Memorial LLC, Judy Boren, John Butcher, E J Driskill, Mary Driskill, Flynn Ranch of Townsend Inc, Wendell C Hull, Don Wayne McDaniel, Daniel McKenzie, Patricia Ann Polston, Sabre Group LLC, Scott Sim, Todd Smith, Wayne Smith, Diane J Snyder, Randy C Snyder, Robert J Snyder, T.E. McKenna, Inc., Tri-County Feed Mill, Inc., Elizabeth Ware, Willaredt Acres, Inc. by Kenneth L. Cunniff (Cunniff, Kenneth)
December 16, 2011 331 STATUS Report of Fee Mediation by Brent Bauer, James Becherer, Judy Boren, Wayne Smith, Tri-County Feed Mill, Inc., Willaredt Acres, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Kauffman, Kathleen)
November 21, 2011 330 Featured Case ORDER. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 11/21/2011.(psm, )
November 21, 2011 329 MINUTE entry before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Settlement Class Counsel's joint motion for an order permitting limited disbursement of escrow funds 328 granted. Enter Order. (For further detail see separate order.) Mailed notice. (psm, )
November 18, 2011 328 MOTION by Plaintiffs Brent Bauer, James Becherer, Judy Boren, Wayne Smith, Tri-County Feed Mill, Inc., Willaredt Acres, Inc. for disbursement of funds (LIMITED DISBURSEMENT OF ESCROW FUNDS) (Attachments: # 1 PROPOSED ORDER)(Kauffman, Kathleen)
November 3, 2011 327 MINUTE entry before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Settlement Class Counsel's joint motion to reschedule November 4, 2011 status conference 326 granted. Status hearing set for 11/4/2011 is stricken and reset to 1/5/2012 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice (etv, )
November 1, 2011 326 MOTION by Plaintiffs Brent Bauer, James Becherer, Judy Boren, Wayne Smith, Tri-County Feed Mill, Inc., Willaredt Acres, Inc. to continue STATUS CONFERENCE CURRENTLY SCHEDULED FOR 11/04/11 (Kauffman, Kathleen)
October 28, 2011 325 Featured Case ORDER Approving Revised Form Of Exhibits. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 10/28/2011. (ph, )
October 28, 2011 324 EASEMENT DEED BY COURT ORDER In Settlement of Landowner Action. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 10/28/2011. (ph, )
October 28, 2011 323 MINUTE entry before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Joint motion to revise Easement Deed by court order and to approve revised form of exhibits 321 granted. Enter Easement Deed By Court Order In Settlement Of Landowner Action Order. Enter Order Approving Revised Form Of Exhibits. (For further detail see separate orders.) {For further detail see separate order(s).] Mailed notice (ph, )
October 27, 2011 322 Certificate of Service and NOTICE of Motion by William T. Gotfryd for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief,, 321 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 11/3/2011 at 08:45 AM. (Gotfryd, William)
October 27, 2011 321 MOTION by Plaintiffs Diane J Snyder, Randy C SnyderJoint Motion to Revise Easement Deed by Court Order and to Approve Revised Form of Exhibits (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit I, # 2 Exhibit J, # 3 Exhibit J-1, # 4 Text of Proposed Order Easement Deed by Court Order, # 5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Approving Revised Form of Exhibits, # 6 Exhibit I To Proposed Order Approving Revised Form of Exhibits, # 7 Exhibit J to Proposed Revised Form of Exhibits, # 8 Exhibit J-1 to Proposed Order Approving Revised Form of Exhibits)(Gotfryd, William)
October 4, 2011 320 MINUTE entry before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Motion to supplement 282 granted nunc pro tunc 7/27/2011. Mailed notice (etv, )
October 4, 2011 319 MINUTE entry before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Settlement class counsel's joint motion to reschedule October 14, 2011 status conference 318 granted. Status hearing set for 10/14/2011 is stricken and reset to 11/4/2011 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice (etv, )
October 3, 2011 318 MOTION by Plaintiffs Brent Bauer, James Becherer, Judy Boren, Wayne Smith, Tri-County Feed Mill, Inc., Willaredt Acres, Inc. to continue OCTOBER 14, 2011 STATUS CONFERENCE (Kauffman, Kathleen)
September 26, 2011 315 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 9/26/11 before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Court Reporter Contact Information: Michael P Snyder, Official Court Reporter (312) 435-5563 michael_snyder@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 10/17/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/27/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/27/2011. (Snyder, Michael)
September 26, 2011 314 MINUTE entry before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Motion hearing held. Settlement Class Counsel's motion to compel compliance with the courts fee-award order 309 granted. By close of business 9/28/2011, all counsel will exchange the statements necessary to initiate "phase one" of the process anticipated by this court's orders. The court will not dictate the terms or content of those disclosures, but expects they will, at a minimum, present a statement in reasonable detail of the number of hours worked and the efforts counsel expended, as well as an initial proposal concerning the share of the overall attorneys fees award that counsel believes is justified by those efforts. Mailed notice (etv, )
September 25, 2011 313 SUPPLEMENT to motion to compel, 309 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Kauffman, Kathleen)
September 23, 2011 312 CERTIFICATE of Service by Plaintiffs Diane J Snyder, Randy C Snyder regarding response in opposition to motion, 311 and Notice of Filing (Gotfryd, William)
September 23, 2011 311 RESPONSE by Diane J Snyder, Randy C Snyderin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs Brent Bauer, James Becherer, Judy Boren, Wayne Smith, Tri-County Feed Mill, Inc., Willaredt Acres, Inc. to compel COMPLIANCE WITH THE COURT'S FEE-AWARD ORDER 309 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Gotfryd, William)
September 22, 2011 317 MINUTE entry before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Joint motion to supplement order and judgment approving class-action settlement, certifying settlement class, and directing notice of final approval 305 granted. Enter Supplement To Order And Judgment Approving Class-Action Settlement, Certifying Settlement Class, And Directing Notice of Final Approval. (For further detail see separate orders.) [For further detail see separate order(s).] Mailed notice (ph, )
September 22, 2011 316 SUPPLEMENT TO ORDER and Judgment Approving Class-Action Settlement, Certifying Settlement Class, and Directing Notice of Final Approval. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 9/22/2011. (ph, )
September 20, 2011 310 SETTLEMENT CLASS COUNSEL'S NOTICE of Motion by Kathleen Clubb Kauffman for presentment of motion to compel, 309 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 9/26/2011 at 09:00 AM. (Kauffman, Kathleen)
September 20, 2011 309 MOTION by Plaintiffs Brent Bauer, James Becherer, Judy Boren, Wayne Smith, Tri-County Feed Mill, Inc., Willaredt Acres, Inc. to compel COMPLIANCE WITH THE COURT'S FEE-AWARD ORDER (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 5)(Kauffman, Kathleen)
September 9, 2011 308 SUPPLEMENT TO ORDER And Judgment Approving Class-Action Settlement, Certifying Settlement Class, And Directing Notice of Final Approval. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 9/9/2011. (ph, )
September 9, 2011 307 MINUTE entry before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Joint motion to supplement order and judgment approving class-action settlement, certifying settlement class, and directing notice of final approval 305 granted. Enter Supplement To Order And Judgment Approving Class-Action Settlement, Certifying Settlement Class, And Directing Notice of Final Approval. (For further detail see separate orders.) Mailed notice (ph, )
September 6, 2011 306 Certificate of Service and NOTICE of Motion by William T. Gotfryd for presentment of motion to supplement, 305 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 9/8/2011 at 10:00 AM. (Gotfryd, William)
September 6, 2011 305 MOTION by Plaintiffs Brent Bauer, James Becherer, Judy Boren, Sabre Group LLC, Scott Sim, Wayne Smith, Diane J Snyder, Randy C Snyder, T.E. McKenna, Inc., Tri-County Feed Mill, Inc., Willaredt Acres, Inc. to supplement Order and Judgment Approving Class-Action Settlement, Certifying Settlement Class, and Directing Notice of Final Approval (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit L)(Gotfryd, William)
August 29, 2011 304 Featured Case ORDER allowing non-compliant exclusion requests. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 8/29/2011. (ph, )
August 29, 2011 303 EASEMENT deed by court order in settlement of landowner action. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 8/29/2011. (ph, )
August 29, 2011 302 Featured Case ORDER. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 8/29/2011. (ph, )
August 29, 2011 301 Featured Case ORDER and judgment approving class-action settlement, certifying settlement class, and directing notice of final approval. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 8/29/2011. (ph, )
August 29, 2011 300 MINUTE entry before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: The attorneys' fees and expenses to be awarded by the court's order shall be deposited in the Fund, an escrow account established with the U.S. Bank in New York, New York. Enter Order. Enter Order Allowing Non-Compliance Exclusion Requests. Enter Easement Deed By Court Order In Settlement Of Landowner Action. Enter Order and Judgment Approving Class-Action Settlement, Certifying Settlement Class, And Directing Notice of Approval. (For further detail see separate orders.) [For further detail see separate order(s).] Mailed notice (ph, )
August 29, 2011 299 Featured Case ORDER awarding attorneys' fees and reimbursing expenses to settlement class counsel and approving payment of incentive awards to settlement class representatives. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 8/29/2011. (ph, )
August 29, 2011 298 MINUTE entry before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Enter Order Awarding Attorneys' Fees And Reimbursing Expenses To Settlement Class Counsel And Approving Payment Of Incentive Awards To Settlement Class Representatives. (For further detail see separate order.) [For further detail see separate order(s).] Mailed notice (ph, )
August 29, 2011 297 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 8/26/11 before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Court Reporter Contact Information: FRANCES WARD (312)435-5561 or frances_ward@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter FRANCES WARD (312)435-5561 before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter FRANCES WARD (312)435-5561 or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 9/19/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/29/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/28/2011. (Ward, Frances)
August 26, 2011 296 MINUTE entry before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Final Approval Hearing held on 4/8/2011. Motion for Final Approval and Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses ( 274 ) is granted. Objections are overruled, but the court understands that lead counsel will work with the objectors to address their concerns including, specifically, assisting objecting property owners to identify the person(s) to be contacted in the event of failure to maintain easement property. Motion for leave to file surreply in opposition to registry motion ( 290 ) granted. Motion to allow non-compliant exclusion requests ( 292 ) is granted. The court approves the sum of fees requested and directs that the money be deposited with the U.S. Bank of New York pursuant to the escrow agreement negotiated by Ms. Kauffman. Parties are expected to proceed pursuant to the arbitration/mediation agreement [signed by all but two attorneys involved in this case] concerning allocation of those fees. Should disputes remain after the conclusion of that process, the court anticipates appointment of Wayne R. Andersen as a Special Master pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 53 to make a report and recommendation concerning those disputes. Motion for payment of incentive awards to class representatives ( 278 ) is granted. Parties to submit draft orders memorializing these rulings. Status hearing set for 10/14/2011 at 10:00 AM. Mailed notice (etv, )
August 24, 2011 295 NOTICE by Sabre Group LLC, Scott Sim, Diane J Snyder, Randy C Snyder, T.E. McKenna, Inc. re response in opposition to motion, 294 NOF and COS (Gotfryd, William)
August 24, 2011 294 RESPONSE by Sabre Group LLC, Scott Sim, Diane J Snyder, Randy C Snyder, T.E. McKenna, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs Brent Bauer, James Becherer, Judy Boren, Wayne Smith, Tri-County Feed Mill, Inc., Willaredt Acres, Inc. for leave to file Surreply in Opposition to Registry Motion 290 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. 1 (1 pg. email), # 2 Exhibit Ex. 2 (1 pg. email), # 3 Exhibit Ex. 3 (2 pg. memorandum))(Gotfryd, William)
August 24, 2011 293 NOM and COS NOTICE of Motion by William T. Gotfryd for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief, 292 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 8/26/2011 at 10:00 AM. (Gotfryd, William)
August 24, 2011 292 MOTION by Plaintiffs Brent Bauer, James Becherer, Judy Boren, Sabre Group LLC, Scott Sim, Wayne Smith, Diane J Snyder, Randy C Snyder, T.E. McKenna, Inc., Tri-County Feed Mill, Inc., Willaredt Acres, Inc.Allow Non-Compliant Exclusion Requests outlined within document (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Gotfryd, William)
August 23, 2011 291 NOTICE of Motion by Kathleen Clubb Kauffman for presentment of motion for leave to file,, 290 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 8/26/2011 at 10:00 AM. (Kauffman, Kathleen)
August 23, 2011 290 MOTION by Plaintiffs Brent Bauer, James Becherer, Judy Boren, Wayne Smith, Tri-County Feed Mill, Inc., Willaredt Acres, Inc. for leave to file Surreply in Opposition to Registry Motion (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Surreply in Opposition to Registry Motion, # 2 Exhibit Ex. 1, # 3 Exhibit Ex. 2, # 4 Exhibit Ex. 3, # 5 Exhibit Ex. 4, # 6 Exhibit Ex. 5, # 7 Exhibit Ex. 6, # 8 Exhibit Ex. 7, # 9 Exhibit Ex. 8, # 10 Exhibit Ex. 9, # 11 Exhibit Ex. 10, # 12 Notice for Prsentment of Motion for Leave to File)(Kauffman, Kathleen)
August 15, 2011 289 NOTICE by Sabre Group LLC, Scott Sim, Diane J Snyder, Randy C Snyder, T.E. McKenna, Inc. re reply, 288 NOF and COS (Gotfryd, William)
August 15, 2011 288 REPLY by Plaintiffs Sabre Group LLC, Scott Sim, Diane J Snyder, Randy C Snyder, T.E. McKenna, Inc. to response in opposition to motion 284 In Support of Lead Counsel Motion for Award and Direct Deposit (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit)(Gotfryd, William)
August 11, 2011 287 NOTICE by Brent Bauer, James Becherer, Judy Boren, Sabre Group LLC, Scott Sim, Wayne Smith, Diane J Snyder, Randy C Snyder, T.E. McKenna, Inc., Tri-County Feed Mill, Inc., Willaredt Acres, Inc. re other, 286 NOF and COS (Gotfryd, William)
August 11, 2011 286 Supplemental Report on Settlement Class Communicatons by Brent Bauer, James Becherer, Judy Boren, Sabre Group LLC, Scott Sim, Wayne Smith, Diane J Snyder, Randy C Snyder, T.E. McKenna, Inc., Tri-County Feed Mill, Inc., Willaredt Acres, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex A, # 2 Exhibit Ex B)(Gotfryd, William)
August 9, 2011 285 RESPONSE by Defendant Sprint Coummunications Company LP to motion for attorney fees 274 (Waris, Richard)
August 5, 2011 284 RESPONSE by Brent Bauer, James Becherer, Judy Boren, Wayne Smith, Tri-County Feed Mill, Inc., Willaredt Acres, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs Diane J Snyder, Randy C Snyder for attorney fees 274 (Kauffman, Kathleen)
July 28, 2011 283 NOTICE of Correction regarding document no. 282. (kj, )
July 27, 2011 MOTION by Plaintiffs Diane J Snyder, Randy C Snyder for order. [Omitted relief from docket entry 274.) (kj, )
July 27, 2011 282 MEMORANDUM by Plaintiffs Brent Bauer, James Becherer, Judy Boren, Wayne Smith, Tri-County Feed Mill, Inc., Willaredt Acres, Inc. in furhter support ofMotion for Final Approval and For Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Dan Millea (Attachment A), # 2 Declaration of Irwin B. Levin (Attachment B))(Kauffman, Kathleen)(Docket text modified by Clerk's Office.) Modified on 7/28/2011 (kj, ).
July 27, 2011 281 NOTICE by Brent Bauer, James Becherer, Judy Boren, Sabre Group LLC, Scott Sim, Wayne Smith, Diane J Snyder, Randy C Snyder, T.E. McKenna, Inc., Tri-County Feed Mill, Inc., Willaredt Acres, Inc. re memorandum, 280 (Gotfryd, William)
July 27, 2011 280 MEMORANDUM by Brent Bauer, James Becherer, Judy Boren, Sabre Group LLC, Scott Sim, Wayne Smith, Diane J Snyder, Randy C Snyder, T.E. McKenna, Inc., Tri-County Feed Mill, Inc., Willaredt Acres, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Gotfryd, William)
July 27, 2011 279 NOTICE of Motion by William T. Gotfryd for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief, 278 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 8/26/2011 at 10:00 AM. (Gotfryd, William)
July 27, 2011 278 MOTION by Plaintiffs Brent Bauer, James Becherer, Judy Boren, Sabre Group LLC, Scott Sim, Wayne Smith, Diane J Snyder, Randy C Snyder, T.E. McKenna, Inc., Tri-County Feed Mill, Inc., Willaredt Acres, Inc.Payment of Incentive Awards to Settlement Class Representatives (Gotfryd, William)
July 27, 2011 277 NOTICE by Diane J Snyder, Randy C Snyder re memorandum in support of motion 276 for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses (Gotfryd, William)
July 27, 2011 276 MEMORANDUM by Diane J Snyder, Randy C Snyder in support of motion for attorney fees 274 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Gotfryd, William)
July 27, 2011 275 NOTICE of Motion by William T. Gotfryd for presentment of motion for attorney fees 274 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 8/26/2011 at 10:00 AM. (Gotfryd, William)
July 27, 2011 274 MOTION by Plaintiffs Diane J Snyder, Randy C Snyder for attorney fees and order.(Gotfryd, William)[Docket text modified by Clerk's Office.) Modified on 7/28/2011 (kj, ).
July 8, 2011 273 MINUTE entry before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Counsel are directed to respond to the letter from Linda and Mary Helen Leasman. Mailed notice (etv, )
July 5, 2011 272 LETTER from Linda Leasman and Mary Helen Leasman dated June 28, 2011. (kj, )
May 31, 2011 271 MINUTE entry before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Counsel are directed promptly to respond to Mr. Andruskevitch. Mailed notice (etv, )
May 26, 2011 270 LETTER from Victor L. Andruskevitch. (kj, )
May 19, 2011 269 MINUTE entry before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Motion hearing held. Motion by settlement class Plaintiffs for order approving substitution of publications for notice program 267 granted. Publication order is amended to reflect that publication will be made in Newsweek and USA Weekend in lieu of Reader's Digest and American Profile. Mailed notice (etv, )
May 16, 2011 268 NOTICE of Motion by William T. Gotfryd for presentment of motion For Order Approving Subst. of Publications 267 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/19/2011 at 08:45 AM. (Gotfryd, William) (Docket text modified by Clerk's Office. Modified on 5/17/2011 (kj, ).
May 16, 2011 267 MOTION by Plaintiffs Diane J Snyder, Randy C SnyderMotion by Stlmnt Class Pntfs for Order Approving Subsitution of Publications for Notice Program (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A: K Kinsella Declaration)(Gotfryd, William)
April 21, 2011 266 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Qwest Communications Company, LLC Defendant Qwest's Supplemental Corporate Disclosure (Duff, Kevin)
April 13, 2011 265 Featured Case ORDER Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/13/2011. (kj, )
April 13, 2011 264 MINUTE entry before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Enter Plaintiffs' Proposed Order Preliminarily Approving Class-Action Settlement, Certifying A Settlement Class, And directing Notice. Mailed notice. (kj, )
April 8, 2011 263 MINUTE entry before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Motion for leave to appear pro hac vice 258 granted. Mailed notice (ph, )
April 8, 2011 262 MINUTE entry before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Motion hearing held. Plaintiffs' motion for certification of settlement class, preliminary approval of class action settlement and approval of form and manner of notice 233 granted. Motions for summary judgment [187, 190] are deemed withdrawn without prejudice. Final Approval Hearing set for 8/26/2011 at 10:00 AM. Mailed notice (etv, )
April 8, 2011 261 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 02/04/11 before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Court Reporter Contact Information: Colleen Conway@312.435.5594 or colleen_conway@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 4/29/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/9/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2011. (Conway, Colleen)
April 7, 2011 260 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Wayne Smith by Edward Arthur Berman (Berman, Edward)
April 7, 2011 259 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Wayne Smith by Terrence Buehler (Buehler, Terrence)
April 7, 2011 258 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-5876835. (Gilchrist, Scott)
April 6, 2011 257 NOTICE by Kevin Buckley Duff of Change of Address or Firm Name (Duff, Kevin)
April 1, 2011 256 NOTICE by Sabre Group LLC, Scott Sim, Diane J Snyder, Randy C Snyder, T.E. McKenna, Inc. RESPONSE BY MOVING PLAINTIFFS TO INTERVENOR-PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR CERTIFICATION OF SETTLEMENT CLASS, PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT, AND APPROVAL OF FORM AND MANNER OF NOTICE (Gotfryd, William)
April 1, 2011 255 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Sabre Group LLC, Scott Sim, Diane J Snyder, Randy C Snyder, T.E. McKenna, Inc. to memorandum, 253 (Gotfryd, William)
March 30, 2011 254 MINUTE entry before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Plaintiffs' agreed motion to file corrected Plaintiffs' memorandum of law in support of motion for certification of settlement class, preliminary approval of class action settlement, and approval of form and manner of notice 248 granted. Mailed notice (etv, )
March 30, 2011 253 MEMORANDUM notice of filing, 251 by Brent Bauer, James Becherer, Judy Boren, Wayne Smith, Tri-County Feed Mill, Inc., Willaredt Acres, Inc. IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR CERTIFICATION OF SETTLEMENT CLASS, PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS-ACTION SETTLEMENT, AND APPROVAL OF FORM AND MANNER OF NOTICE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Kauffman, Kathleen)
March 28, 2011 252 MINUTE entry before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Motion for leave to appear pro hac vice 247 granted. Mailed notice. (kj, )
March 28, 2011 251 NOTICE by Brent Bauer, James Becherer, Judy Boren, Wayne Smith, Tri-County Feed Mill, Inc., Willaredt Acres, Inc. Notice of Filing of Declaration of Katherine Kinsella on Notice Program (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Katherine Kinsella)(Kauffman, Kathleen)
March 25, 2011 250 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of Motion for Certification of Settlement Class, Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, and Approval of Form and Manner of Notice by Sabre Group LLC, Scott Sim d/b/a S&T Automotive Corp., Diane J Snyder, Randy C Snyder, T.E. McKenna, Inc. (Gotfryd, William) (Docket text modified by Clerk's Office.) Modified on 3/28/2011 (kj, ).
March 25, 2011 249 Certificate of Service and NOTICE of Motion by William T. Gotfryd for presentment of motion for leave to file, 248 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/31/2011 at 08:45 AM. (Gotfryd, William)
March 25, 2011 248 MOTION by Plaintiffs Sabre Group LLC, Scott Sim d/b/a S&T Automotive Corp., Diane J Snyder, Randy C Snyder, T.E. McKenna, Inc. for leave to file Corrected Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Certification of Settlement Class, Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, and Approval of Form and Manner of Notice (Gotfryd, William)
March 25, 2011 247 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-5835113. (Jones, Joseph)
March 23, 2011 246 NOTICE by Sabre Group LLC, Scott Sim d/b/a S&T Automotive Corp., Diane J Snyder, Randy C Snyder, T.E. McKenna, Inc. re other 245 and Certificate of Service (Gotfryd, William)
March 23, 2011 245 Plaintiffs' Correction of Docket Entry for Filing of Memorandum in Support of Settlement by Sabre Group LLC, Scott Sim d/b/a S&T Automotive Corp., Diane J Snyder, Randy C Snyder, T.E. McKenna, Inc. (Gotfryd, William)
March 22, 2011 244 Correction of Docket Entry by Brent Bauer, James Becherer, Judy Boren, Wayne Smith, Tri-County Feed Mill, Inc., Willaredt Acres, Inc. (Kauffman, Kathleen)
March 18, 2011 243 MEMORANDUM by Brent Bauer, James Becherer, Billing Memorial LLC, Judy Boren, John Butcher, E J Driskill, Mary Driskill, Flynn Ranch of Townsend Inc, Wendell C Hull, Level 3 Communications LLC, Don Wayne McDaniel, Daniel McKenzie, Patricia Ann Polston, Sabre Group LLC, Scott Sim d/b/a S&T Automotive Corp., Todd Smith, Wayne Smith, Robert J Snyder, T.E. McKenna, Inc., Tri-County Feed Mill, Inc., Elizabeth Ware, Willaredt Acres, Inc. in support of motion for settlement, 233 . (kj, )
March 18, 2011 242 MINUTE entry before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Motions to appear pro hac vice [237, 238] granted. Mailed notice. (kj, )
March 18, 2011 241 MINUTE entry before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Motion hearing held. Motion to intervene of proposed settlement class representatives Wayne Smith, Brent Bauer, Willaredt Acres, Inc., Judy Boren, James Becherer, and the Tri-County Feed Mill, Inc. 230 granted. The court understands there will be no further delay or objection to the proposed settlement. Counsel for intervenors have leave to file their submission in further support of the settlement agreement on or before 4/1/2011. Preliminary Approval hearing set for 4/8/2011 at 9:00 AM. Plaintiffs' motions for preliminary approval [232, 233] entered and continued to 4/8/2011 at 9:00 AM. Plaintiffs' agreed motion for leave to file oversized brief 235 granted. Mailed notice (etv, )
March 17, 2011 240 NOTICE by Sabre Group LLC, Scott Sim d/b/a S&T Automotive Corp., Diane J Snyder, Randy C Snyder, T.E. McKenna, Inc. re Response 239 and Certificate of Service (Gotfryd, William)
March 17, 2011 239 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Sabre Group LLC, Scott Sim d/b/a S&T Automotive Corp., Diane J Snyder, Randy C Snyder, T.E. McKenna, Inc. to motion to intervene 230 (Gotfryd, William)
March 17, 2011 238 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-5807477. (Koenigs, Christopher)
March 17, 2011 237 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-5807414. (Carroll, Michael)
March 16, 2011 236 NOTICE of Motion by William T. Gotfryd for presentment of motion for leave to file 235 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/18/2011 at 09:30 AM. (Gotfryd, William)
March 16, 2011 235 MOTION by Plaintiffs Diane J Snyder, Randy C Snyder for leave to file (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Gotfryd, William)
March 16, 2011 234 NOTICE of Motion by William T. Gotfryd for presentment of motion for settlement, 233 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/18/2011 at 09:30 AM. (Gotfryd, William)
March 16, 2011 233 MOTION by Plaintiffs Diane J Snyder, Randy C Snyder for settlement (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Settlement Agreement, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit J 1, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Exhibit L)(Gotfryd, William) Modified on 3/17/2011 (kj, ).
March 16, 2011 232 MOTION by Plaintiffs Diane J Snyder, Randy C Snyder for settlement (Gotfryd, William)
March 16, 2011 231 NOTICE of Motion by Kathleen Clubb Kauffman for presentment of motion to intervene 230 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/18/2011 at 09:30 AM. (Kauffman, Kathleen)
March 16, 2011 230 MOTION by Plaintiffs Judy Boren, James Becherer, Willaredt Acres, Inc., Tri-County Feed Mill, Inc., Wayne Smith, Brent Bauer to intervene (Kauffman, Kathleen)
February 24, 2011 229 MINUTE entry before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Class settlement motion hearing set for 3/18/2011 at 9:30 AM. Mailed notice (etv, )
February 23, 2011 228 NOTICE by Sabre Group LLC, Scott Sim d/b/a S&T Automotive Corp., Diane J Snyder, Randy C Snyder, T.E. McKenna, Inc. re amended complaint, 227 and Certificate of Service (Gotfryd, William)
February 23, 2011 227 AMENDED complaint by Randy C Snyder, Diane J Snyder, T.E. McKenna, Inc., Scott Sim d/b/a S&T Automotive Corp., Sabre Group LLC against Level 3 Communications LLC, Sprint Coummunications Company LP, WilTel Communications, LLC, Qwest Communications Company, LLC (Gotfryd, William)
February 23, 2011 226 MINUTE entry before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Plaintiffs', Diane J. Snyder's and Randy C. Snyder's amended motion for leave to file Amended Complaint 224 granted, Plaintiff's motion for leave to file Amended Complaint 212 is stricken as moot. Oral argument set for 2/25/2011 stricken. Mailed notice (etv, )
February 17, 2011 225 NOTICE of Motion by William T. Gotfryd for presentment of motion for leave to file, 224 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 2/25/2011 at 10:00 AM. (Gotfryd, William)
February 17, 2011 224 MOTION by Plaintiffs Diane J Snyder, Randy C Snyder for leave to file AMENDED (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Joint Report of Settlement, # 2 Exhibit Transcript of Proceedings, # 3 Exhibit Motion for Leave, # 4 Exhibit Joint Statement Re Plntfs Mtn for Lv to File Amended Cmpnt, # 5 Exhibit Language for Stlmnt, # 6 Exhibit Rev Amnd Complaint)(Gotfryd, William)
February 4, 2011 223 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by Sprint Coummunications Company LP (Waris, Richard)
February 4, 2011 222 MINUTE entry before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Motion hearing held. Motion for leave to file Amended Complaint 212 entered and continued. Oral argument set for 2/25/2011 at 10:00 AM. Mailed notice (etv, )
February 3, 2011 221 NOTICE by Diane J Snyder, Randy C Snyder re other 220 (Gotfryd, William)
February 3, 2011 220 REDACTED Plaintiffs' Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by Diane J Snyder, Randy C Snyder (Gotfryd, William) Modified on 2/4/2011 (kj, ).
February 3, 2011 219 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Diane J Snyder, Randy C Snyder (Gotfryd, William)
January 31, 2011 218 MINUTE entry before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Trial Begins - Bench. Bench Trial held by way of submission of materials. Motion for leave to file Amended Complaint 212 entered and continued to 2/4/2011 at 9:30 AM. Trial Ends - Bench. Mailed notice (etv, )
January 28, 2011 217 NOTICE by Diane J Snyder, Randy C Snyder re statement 216 (Gotfryd, William)
January 28, 2011 216 JOINT STATEMENT Regarding Plaintiffs' Motion For Leave To File Amended Complaint by Diane J Snyder, Randy C Snyder (Gotfryd, William) Modified on 1/31/2011 (kj, ).
January 26, 2011 215 MINUTE entry before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Motion hearing held. Plaintiffs', Diane J. Snyder's and Randy C. Snyder's motion for leave to file Amended Complaint 212 entered and continued to 1/31/2011 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice (etv, )
January 24, 2011 214 MINUTE entry before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Final Pretrial Conference convened. Jury Trial set for 1/31/2011 is stricken and reset as a Bench Trial on 1/31/2011 at 9:30 AM. Findings of Fact And Conclusions of Law to be filed by close of business on 2/4/2011. Mailed notice (etv, )
January 24, 2011 213 NOTICE of Motion by William T. Gotfryd for presentment of motion for leave to file 212 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 1/26/2011 at 08:45 AM. (Gotfryd, William)
January 24, 2011 212 MOTION by Plaintiffs Diane J Snyder, Randy C Snyder for leave to file An Amended Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Gotfryd, William)
January 21, 2011 211 NOTICE by Diane J Snyder, Randy C Snyder re other 210 (Gotfryd, William)
January 21, 2011 210 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF JURY DEMAND by Diane J Snyder, Randy C Snyder (Gotfryd, William)
January 20, 2011 209 NOTICE by Diane J Snyder, Randy C Snyder re proposed pretrial order 208 and Certificate of Service (Gotfryd, William)
January 20, 2011 208 PROPOSED Pretrial Order (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation of Uncontested Facts, # 2 Description of Case, # 3 Schedule of Trial Exhibits, # 4 Proposed Jury Instructions and Verdict Forms, # 5 Proposed Voir Dire Questions)(Gotfryd, William)
January 6, 2011 207 MINUTE entry before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Status hearing held on 1/6/2011. Date for Plaintiff to submit draft Final Pretrial Order is extended to 1/11/2011. Joint Final Pretrial Order date extended to 1/20/2011. All other dates to stand. Requirement of trial brief and "issues" instructions are waived. Mailed notice (etv, )
January 5, 2011 206 NOTICE by Diane J Snyder, Randy C Snyder re reply 205 in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment (Gotfryd, William)
January 5, 2011 205 REPLY by Plaintiffs Diane J Snyder, Randy C Snyder to motion for summary judgment 190 Reply in Support of Mtn for Summary Judgment (Gotfryd, William)
January 5, 2011 204 REPLY by Defendant Sprint Coummunications Company LP to memorandum in support of motion 188 for Summary Judgment Against Plaintiffs Diane J. and Randy C. Snyder (Waris, Richard)
January 4, 2011 203 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 12/15/10 before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Court Reporter Contact Information: FRANCES WARD (312)435-5561 or frances_ward@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter FRANCES WARD (312)435-5561 before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter FRANCES WARD (312)435-5561 or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 1/25/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/4/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/4/2011. (Ward, Frances)
December 22, 2010 202 NOTICE by Diane J Snyder, Randy C Snyder re response in opposition to motion, 201 (Gotfryd, William)
December 22, 2010 201 RESPONSE by Diane J Snyder, Randy C Snyderin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Sprint Coummunications Company LP for summary judgment Against Plaintiffs Diane J. Snyder and Randy C. Snyder 187 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. A)(Gotfryd, William)
December 22, 2010 200 MEMORANDUM by Sprint Coummunications Company LP in Opposition to motion for summary judgment 190 on Issue of Liability of Plaintiffs Diane J. Snyder and Randy C. Snyder (Waris, Richard)
December 22, 2010 199 RESPONSE by Defendant Sprint Coummunications Company LP to Rule 56 statement 194 of Material Facts (Waris, Richard)
December 15, 2010 198 MINUTE entry before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Motion hearing held. Defendant Sprint Communications Company L.P.'s motion for summary judgment 187 and Plaintiffs Diane J. Snyder and Randy C. Snyder's motion for summary judgment 190 entered and continued for briefing. Responses to be filed by or on 12/22/2010; replies 1/5/2011. The court will attempt to rule prior to the trial now set for 1/31/2011 at 9:30 a.m., but this trial date will stand. Mailed notice (etv, )
December 10, 2010 197 NOTICE by Diane J Snyder, Randy C Snyder re other 196 and Certificate of Service (Gotfryd, William)
December 10, 2010 196 SUPPLEMENT to Joint Report of Settlement by Diane J Snyder, Randy C Snyder (Attachments: # 1 Attachment)(Gotfryd, William) Modified on 12/13/2010 (kj, ).
December 9, 2010 195 SEALED RESPONSE by Diane J Snyder, Randy C Snyder to response in support of motion, 192 , notice of motion 193 (Gotfryd, William)
December 9, 2010 194 RULE 56 1.a(3) Statement by Diane J Snyder, Randy C Snyder regarding motion for summary judgment 190 (Gotfryd, William)
December 9, 2010 193 NOTICE of Motion by William T. Gotfryd for presentment of motion for summary judgment 190 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 12/15/2010 at 08:45 AM. (Gotfryd, William)
December 9, 2010 192 MEMORANDUM by Diane J Snyder, Randy C Snyderin Support of MOTION by Plaintiffs Randy C Snyder, Diane J Snyder for summary judgment on the Issue of Liability 190 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Gotfryd, William) Modified on 12/10/2010 (kj, ).
December 9, 2010 191 NOTICE of Motion by Richard M. Waris for presentment of motion for summary judgment 187 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 12/15/2010 at 08:45 AM. (Waris, Richard)
December 9, 2010 190 MOTION by Plaintiffs Randy C Snyder, Diane J Snyder for summary judgment on the Issue of Liability (Gotfryd, William)
December 9, 2010 189 STATEMENT by Defendant Sprint Coummunications Company LPin Support of MOTION by Defendant Sprint Coummunications Company LP for summary judgment Against Plaintiffs Diane J. Snyder and Randy C. Snyder 187 (Waris, Richard)
December 9, 2010 188 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment Against Plaintiffs Diane J. Snyder and Randy C. Snyder (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Waris, Richard)
December 9, 2010 187 MOTION by Defendant Sprint Coummunications Company LP for summary judgment Against Plaintiffs Diane J. Snyder and Randy C. Snyder (Waris, Richard)
December 9, 2010 186 NOTICE by Diane J Snyder, Randy C Snyder re other 185 Joint Report of Settlement (Gotfryd, William)
December 9, 2010 185 Joint Report of Settlement by Diane J Snyder, Randy C Snyder (Gotfryd, William)
December 9, 2010 184 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Diane J Snyder, Randy C Snyder Exhibit G to Stipulation (Gotfryd, William)
December 9, 2010 183 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Diane J Snyder, Randy C Snyder Exhibit D to Stipulation (Gotfryd, William)
December 9, 2010 182 EXHIBIT F Part 2 to Stipulation by Diane J Snyder, Randy C Snyder (Poor Quality Original - Paper Document of File.) (Gotfryd, William) Modified on 12/13/2010 (kj, ).
December 9, 2010 181 EXHIBITS F Part 1 to Stipulation by Diane J Snyder, Randy C Snyder (Poor Quality Original - Paper Document on File.)(Gotfryd, William) Modified on 12/13/2010 (kj, ).
December 9, 2010 180 STIPULATION (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit E)(Gotfryd, William)
October 21, 2010 179 MINUTE entry before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Status hearing held on 10/21/2010. Status hearing set for 1/6/2011 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice (etv, )
September 16, 2010 178 MINUTE entry before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Status hearing held on 9/16/2010. Status hearing set for 10/21/2010 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice (etv, )
August 24, 2010 177 MINUTE entry before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Joint motion to extend fact discovery deadline 175 granted. Fact discovery deadline is extended from 8/31/2010 to 11/19/2010. All other dates to stand. Mailed notice (etv, )
August 23, 2010 176 NOTICE of Motion by William T. Gotfryd for presentment of extension of time, 175 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 8/25/2010 at 08:45 AM. (Gotfryd, William)
August 23, 2010 175 MOTION by Plaintiffs Billing Memorial LLC, John Butcher, E J Driskill, Mary Driskill, Flynn Ranch of Townsend Inc, Wendell C Hull, Don Wayne McDaniel, Daniel McKenzie, Patricia Ann Polston, Todd Smith, Diane J Snyder, Randy C Snyder, Robert J Snyder, Elizabeth Ware for extension of time Joint Motion to Extend Fact Discovery Deadline (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gotfryd, William)
August 11, 2010 174 MINUTE entry before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Status hearing held on 8/11/2010. Union Pacific Railroad Company's motion to quash subpoena, or alternatively, to modify subpoena 159 is granted without prejudice. Status hearing set for 9/16/2010 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice (etv, )
August 3, 2010 173 MINUTE entry before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: On the court's own motion, status hearing and Union Pacific Railroad Company's motion to quash 159 set for 8/4/2010 are stricken and reset to 8/11/2010 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice (etv, )
August 2, 2010 172 AGREED PROTECTIVE Order Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 8/2/2010. (kj, )
August 2, 2010 171 MINUTE entry before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Plaintiffs' motion for entry of agreed protective order 169 granted. Enter Agreed Protective Order. Mailed notice. [For further detail see separate order(s).] (kj, )
July 30, 2010 170 NOTICE of Motion by William T. Gotfryd for presentment of motion for protective order, 169 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 8/4/2010 at 09:00 AM. (Gotfryd, William)
July 30, 2010 169 MOTION by Plaintiffs Billing Memorial LLC, John Butcher, E J Driskill, Mary Driskill, Flynn Ranch of Townsend Inc, Wendell C Hull, Don Wayne McDaniel, Daniel McKenzie, Patricia Ann Polston, Todd Smith, Diane J Snyder, Randy C Snyder, Robert J Snyder, Elizabeth Ware for protective order (Attachments: # 1 Agreed Protective Order, # 2 Exhibit A to Agreed Protective Order)(Gotfryd, William)
July 6, 2010 168 MINUTE entry before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Status hearing held on 7/6/2010. Status hearing set for 8/4/2010 at 9:00 AM. Union Pacific Railroad Company's motion to quash to quash subpoena, or alternatively, to modify subpoena 159 entered and continued to 8/4/2010 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice (etv, )
July 2, 2010 167 REPLY by Daniel R. LaFave to MOTION by Movant Daniel R. LaFave to quash subpoena, or alternatively, to modify subpoena 159 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(LaFave, Daniel)
June 30, 2010 166 NOTICE by Don Wayne McDaniel re response in opposition to motion, 165 Notice of Filing and Certificate of Service (Gotfryd, William)
June 30, 2010 165 MEMORANDUM by Don Wayne McDaniel in Opposition to MOTION by Movant Daniel R. LaFave to quash subpoena, or alternatively, to modify subpoena 159 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, B, C)(Gotfryd, William) Modified on 7/1/2010 (kj, ).
June 17, 2010 164 MINUTE entry before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Motion hearing held. Motion for leave for non-party to file motion to quash, or in the alternative, modify subpoena 158 granted. Union Pacific Railroad Company's motion to quash to quash subpoena, or alternatively, to modify subpoena 159 entered and continued to 7/6/2010 at 9:00 AM; but by agreement, the 6/28/2010 response date for subpoena is stricken. Mailed notice (etv, )
June 14, 2010 163 NOTICE of Correction regarding 161 . (tc, )
June 12, 2010 162 Nonparty Union Pacific's NOTICE of Motion by Daniel Richard LaFave for presentment of motion to quash 159 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 6/17/2010 at 08:45 AM. (LaFave, Daniel)
June 12, 2010 161 MOTION by Movant Daniel R. LaFave for leave to file Nonparty Union Pacific's Motion to Quash or Modify Subpoena (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(LaFave, Daniel)(Duplicate filing of entry no. 158.) Modified on 6/14/2010 (tc, ).
June 11, 2010 160 NOTICE of Motion by Daniel Richard LaFave for presentment of motion to quash 159 , motion for leave to file 158 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 6/17/2010 at 08:45 AM. (LaFave, Daniel)
June 11, 2010 159 MOTION by Movant Daniel R. LaFave to quash subpoena, or alternatively, to modify subpoena (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(LaFave, Daniel)
June 11, 2010 158 MOTION by Movant Daniel R. LaFave for leave to file Motion to Quash, or in the Alternative, Modify Subpoena (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(LaFave, Daniel) Modified on 6/14/2010 (tc, ).
May 7, 2010 156 MINUTE entry before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Status hearing held on 5/6/2010. On May 24, 2008, the Court entered an order dismissing the case with leave to reinstate. The case is hereby reinstated. No additional parties may be joined in the absence of good cause shown. No further amendment of the pleadings shall be permitted, in the absence of good cause shown. The parties shall complete fact discovery on or before 8/3112010. All non-dispositive motions except motions in limine shall be filed by 12/3/2010. All dispositive motions due by 12/17/2010. Plaintiffs shall prepare a proposed PTO by 1/7/2011; Joint Final Pretrial Order due 1/14/2011. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/24/2011 at 10:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 1/31/2011 at 9:30 AM. Status hearing set for 7/6/010 at 9:00 AM. Enter Final Scheduling Order. Mailed notice. [For further detail see minute order.] (kj, )
May 6, 2010 157 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/6/2010. (kj, )
April 15, 2010 155 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 2/6/2007 before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Court Reporter Contact Information: ALEXANDRA ROTH, (312) 408-5038, alexandra_roth@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 5/6/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/17/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/14/2010. (Roth, Alexandra)
April 15, 2010 154 MINUTE entry before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Status hearing held on 4/15/2010. Status hearing set for 5/6/2010 at 9:00 AM; counsel should be prepared to set trial date. Mailed notice (etv, )
March 26, 2010 153 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 07/10/07 before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Court Reporter Contact Information: Colleen Conway@312.435.5594 or colleen_conway@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 4/16/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/26/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/24/2010. (Conway, Colleen)
March 3, 2010 152 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 10/22/09 before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Court Reporter Contact Information: FRANCES WARD (312)435-5561 or frances_ward@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter FRANCES WARD (312)435-5561 before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter FRANCES WARD (312)435-5561 or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 3/24/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/5/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/1/2010. (Ward, Frances)
March 3, 2010 151 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 12/22/08 before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Court Reporter Contact Information: FRANCES WARD (312)435-5561 or frances_ward@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter FRANCES WARD (312)435-5561 before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter FRANCES WARD (312)435-5561 or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 3/24/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/5/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/1/2010. (Ward, Frances)
March 3, 2010 150 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 4/18/08 before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Court Reporter Contact Information: FRANCES WARD (312)435-5561 or frances_ward@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter FRANCES WARD (312)435-5561 before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter FRANCES WARD (312)435-5561 or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 3/24/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/5/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/1/2010. (Ward, Frances)
March 3, 2010 149 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 1/16/08 before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Court Reporter Contact Information: FRANCES WARD (312)435-5561 or frances_ward@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter FRANCES WARD (312)435-5561 before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter FRANCES WARD (312)435-5561 or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 3/24/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/5/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/1/2010. (Ward, Frances)
March 3, 2010 148 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 11/20/07 before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Court Reporter Contact Information: FRANCES WARD (312)435-5561 or frances_ward@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter FRANCES WARD (312)435-5561 before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter FRANCES WARD (312)435-5561 or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 3/24/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/5/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/1/2010. (Ward, Frances)
March 3, 2010 147 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 9/26/07 before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Court Reporter Contact Information: FRANCES WARD (312)435-5561 or frances_ward@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter FRANCES WARD (312)435-5561 before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter FRANCES WARD (312)435-5561 or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 3/24/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/5/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/1/2010. (Ward, Frances)
March 3, 2010 146 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 8/16/07 before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Court Reporter Contact Information: FRANCES WARD (312)435-5561 or frances_ward@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter FRANCES WARD (312)435-5561 before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter FRANCES WARD (312)435-5561 or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 3/24/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/5/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/1/2010. (Ward, Frances)
March 3, 2010 145 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 4/4/07 before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Court Reporter Contact Information: FRANCES WARD (312)435-5561 or frances_ward@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter FRANCES WARD (312)435-5561 before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter FRANCES WARD (312)435-5561 or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 3/24/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/5/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/1/2010. (Ward, Frances)
March 3, 2010 144 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 10/31/06 before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Court Reporter Contact Information: FRANCES WARD (312)435-5561 or frances_ward@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter FRANCES WARD (312)435-5561 before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter FRANCES WARD (312)435-5561 or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 3/24/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/5/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/1/2010. (Ward, Frances)
March 3, 2010 143 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 8/15/06 before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Court Reporter Contact Information: FRANCES WARD (312)435-5561 or frances_ward@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter FRANCES WARD (312)435-5561 before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter FRANCES WARD (312)435-5561 or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 3/24/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/5/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/1/2010. (Ward, Frances)
March 3, 2010 142 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 7/18/06 before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Court Reporter Contact Information: FRANCES WARD (312)435-5561 or frances_ward@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter FRANCES WARD (312)435-5561 before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/ FRANCES WARD (312)435-5561 or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 3/24/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/5/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/1/2010. (Ward, Frances)
October 22, 2009 141 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Motion hearing held. Plaintiffs' motion to reinstate action, for an extension of time to file to reinstate action or other relief 139 granted. Date to reinstate extended to 4/15/2010. Status hearing set for 4/15/2010 at 9:00. Mailed notice. (kj, )
October 12, 2009 140 NOTICE of Motion by William T. Gotfryd for presentment of motion to reopen case, 139 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 10/22/2009 at 08:45 AM. (Gotfryd, William)
October 12, 2009 139 MOTION by Plaintiffs Todd Smith, Daniel McKenzie, Randy C Snyder, Diane J Snyder, Robert J Snyder, Patricia Ann Polston, Elizabeth Ware, Don Wayne McDaniel, John Butcher, Wendell C Hull, Flynn Ranch of Townsend Inc, Billing Memorial LLC, Mary Driskill, E J Driskill to reopen case or For an Extension of Time to Reinstate Action or Other Relief (Gotfryd, William)
July 16, 2009 138 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Motion by plaintiffs to reinstate action or for extension of time to seek leave to reinstate 136 is granted. No appearance is necessary on 7/29/09. The deadline to seek reinstatement is on or by 10/31/09. Mailed notice (lcw, )
July 15, 2009 137 NOTICE of Motion by William T. Gotfryd for presentment of motion to reopen case, 136 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/29/2009 at 08:45 AM. (Gotfryd, William)
July 15, 2009 136 MOTION by Plaintiffs Todd Smith, Daniel McKenzie, Randy C Snyder, Diane J Snyder, Robert J Snyder, Patricia Ann Polston, Elizabeth Ware, Don Wayne McDaniel, John Butcher, Wendell C Hull, Flynn Ranch of Townsend Inc, Billing Memorial LLC, Mary Driskill, E J Driskill to reopen case , 4th Alternative Motion to Reinstate Action or for Extension of Time to Seek Leave to Reinstate (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gotfryd, William)
May 22, 2009 135 Featured Case ORDER on Plaintiffs' third Alternative Motion to Reinstate or for Extension of Time to Seek Leave to Reinstate. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/22/2009. Mailed notice.(kj, )
May 22, 2009 134 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Plaintiff's third alternative motion to reinstate action or for extension of time to seek leave to reinstate 132 granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiffs shall have until July 30, 2009, or until a date 30 days after the United States District Court for the District of Massachusetts enters an order disposing of a pending Joint Motion for Final Approval of Class-Action Settlements and all rights to appeal that order have been exhausted, whichever date is earlier, to file their motion to reinstate. Enter Order on Plaintiff's Third alternative Motion To Reinstate Or For Extension of time to Seek leave to Reinstate. Mailed notice. [For further detail see separate order(s).] (kj, )
May 21, 2009 133 NOTICE of Motion by William T. Gotfryd for presentment of motion to reopen case, 132 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/27/2009 at 08:45 AM. (Gotfryd, William)
May 21, 2009 132 MOTION by Plaintiffs Todd Smith, Daniel McKenzie, Randy C Snyder, Diane J Snyder, Robert J Snyder, Patricia Ann Polston, Elizabeth Ware, Don Wayne McDaniel, John Butcher, Wendell C Hull, Flynn Ranch of Townsend Inc, Billing Memorial LLC, Mary Driskill, E J Driskill to reopen case 3rd Alternative Motion to Reinstate Action or for Extension of Time to Seek Leave to Reinstate (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gotfryd, William)
March 5, 2009 131 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Plaintiffs' second alternative motion to reinstate action or for extension of time to seek leave to reinstate 129 granted. Date in which to reinstate the case is extended to and including June 1, 2009. Mailed notice (etv, )
March 4, 2009 130 NOTICE of Motion by William T. Gotfryd for presentment of motion to reopen case, 129 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/12/2009 at 08:45 AM. (Gotfryd, William)
March 4, 2009 129 MOTION by Plaintiffs Todd Smith, Daniel McKenzie, Randy C Snyder, Diane J Snyder, Robert J Snyder, Patricia Ann Polston, Elizabeth Ware, Don Wayne McDaniel, John Butcher, Wendell C Hull, Flynn Ranch of Townsend Inc, Billing Memorial LLC, Mary Driskill, E J Driskill to Reinstate Action or For Extension of Time to Seek Leave to Reinstate Second Alternative Motion (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gotfryd, William) Modified on 3/5/2009 (kj, ).
December 22, 2008 128 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Motion hearing held. Plaintiffs' alternative motion to reinstate action or for extension of time to seek leave to reinstate 126 granted. Time to reinstate case granted to and including 3/23/2009. Mailed notice (etv, )
December 16, 2008 127 NOTICE of Motion by William T. Gotfryd for presentment of motion to reopen case, 126 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 12/22/2008 at 09:00 AM. (Gotfryd, William)
December 16, 2008 126 MOTION by Plaintiffs Todd Smith, Daniel McKenzie, Randy C Snyder, Diane J Snyder, Robert J Snyder, Patricia Ann Polston, Elizabeth Ware, Don Wayne McDaniel, John Butcher, Wendell C Hull, Flynn Ranch of Townsend Inc, Billing Memorial LLC, Mary Driskill, E J Driskill to reopen case or For Extension of Time to Seek Leave to Reinstate (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gotfryd, William)
May 14, 2008 125 Featured Case ORDER of Dismissal with leave to reinstate. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/14/2008:(ca, )
May 14, 2008 124 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer:Agreed motion for dismissal of claims with leave to reinstate 122 granted; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is hereby dismissed with leave to reinstate upon motion filed by the plaintiffs on or before December 31, 2008 in the event that settlements in this action are not fully approved for any reason, each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. Enter order of dismissal with leave to reinstate. Final Pretrial conference set for 5/21/08 and Jury trial set for 5/27/08 are stricken. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (ca, )
May 13, 2008 123 NOTICE of Motion by Arthur T. Susman for presentment of before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/19/2008 at 09:00 AM. (Susman, Arthur)
May 13, 2008 122 MOTION by Plaintiff Don Wayne McDaniel to dismiss Agreed Motion for Dismissal of Claims With Leave to Reinstate (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order of Dismissal With Leave to Reinstate)(Susman, Arthur)
May 6, 2008 121 MINUTE entry before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer:Pursuant to Stipulation, the parties agree to dismissal with prejudice of all claims by Plaintiffs Randy Snyder and Diane Snyder against Defendant Level 3 Communications, LLC, with each party to bear its own attorneys fees and costs. Case remains pending with respect to claims of remaining Plaintiffs, and with respect to the Snyders claims against remaining Defendants.Mailed notice (ca, )
May 5, 2008 120 NOTICE by Robert J Snyder re stipulation of dismissal 119 With Prejudice (Gotfryd, William)
May 5, 2008 119 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Stephaney Baker)(Gotfryd, William)
April 28, 2008 118 MINUTE entry before Judge Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Plaintiffs' unopposed motion to reset date for filing Final Pretrial Order 116 granted to and including 5/16/2008. Mailed notice (etv, )
April 25, 2008 117 NOTICE of Motion by Arthur T. Susman for presentment of motion to reset 116 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/30/2008 at 08:45 AM. (Susman, Arthur)
April 25, 2008 116 MOTION by Plaintiff Don Wayne McDaniel to reset Date For Filing Final Pretrial Order (Susman, Arthur)
April 22, 2008 115 MINUTE entry before Judge Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer:On the court's own motion, Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/19/2008 is stricken and reset to 5/21/2008 at 9:00. Mailed notice (etv, )
April 18, 2008 114 MINUTE entry before Judge Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer:Status hearing held on 4/18/2008. Jury trial set for 5/12/2008 is stricken and reset to 5/27/2008 at 9:30. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/5/2008 is stricken and reset to 5/19/2008 at 9:00. Mailed notice (etv, )
April 14, 2008 113 MINUTE entry before Judge Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer:At the parties' request, status hearing set for 4/18/08 at 9:00 a.m. Final pretrial conference set for 5/5/08 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (etv, )
April 7, 2008 112 MINUTE entry before Judge Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), all claims of Plaintiffs Randy Snyder and DianeSnyder against Defendant Qwest Communications Corporation, are dismissed, with each party to bear its own attorneys fees and costs. Case remains pending with respect to the remaining Plaintiffs. Diane J Snyder and Randy C Snyder terminated.Mailed notice (rbf, )
April 4, 2008 111 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Duff, Kevin)
February 21, 2008 110 CERTIFICATE of Service of First Request for Production of Documents to Snyder by Richard M. Waris on behalf of Sprint Coummunications Company LP (Waris, Richard)
February 21, 2008 109 CERTIFICATE of Service of Responses to Snyder First Request for Production of Documents by Richard M. Waris on behalf of Sprint Coummunications Company LP (Waris, Richard)
February 21, 2008 108 CERTIFICATE of Service First Set of Request for Production of Documents to Snyder by Richard M. Waris on behalf of Sprint Coummunications Company LP (Waris, Richard)
February 21, 2008 107 CERTIFICATE of Service of First Set of Interrogatories to Snyder by Richard M. Waris on behalf of Sprint Coummunications Company LP (Waris, Richard)
January 25, 2008 106 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs by Gina M. Lamancusa. (gmr, )
January 16, 2008 105 MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer :Status hearing held on 1/16/2008. Parties having reported that settlement efforts have been unsuccessful, jury trial is set for 5/12/2008 at 9:30 a.m. Joint Final Pretrial Order due 4/28/2008. Mailed notice (etv, )
November 20, 2007 104 MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer :Status hearing held on 11/20/2007. Status hearing set for 1/16/2008 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice (etv, )
September 26, 2007 103 MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Status hearing held and continued to 11/20/2007 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice by judge's staff. (srb,)
August 16, 2007 102 MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer :Status hearing held on 8/16/2007. Status hearing set for 9/26/2007 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice (etv, )
July 10, 2007 101 MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer :Status hearing held on 7/10/2007. Status hearing set for 8/16/2007 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice (etv, )
July 2, 2007 100 MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer :On the court's own motion, status hearing set for 7/5/2007 is stricken and reset to 7/10/2007 at 09:00 AM. Mailed/Telephoned notice (etv, )
June 28, 2007 99 MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer :On the court's own motion, status hearing set for 7/6/2007 is stricken and reset to 7/5/2007 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice (etv, )
June 25, 2007 98 MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer :On the court's own motion, status hearing set for 7/9/2007 is stricken and reset to 7/6/2007 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice (etv, )
April 4, 2007 97 MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer :Status hearing held on 4/4/2007. Status hearing set for 7/9/2007 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice (etv, )
February 6, 2007 96 MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer :Status hearing held on 2/6/2007. Status hearing set for 4/4/2007 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice (etv, )
October 31, 2006 95 MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer : Plaintiff's agreed motion to reset dates 93 granted. Status hearing set for 11/9/06 is stricken and reset to 2/6/2007 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice (mb, )
October 26, 2006 94 NOTICE of Motion by Arthur T. Susman for presentment of motion to reset, 93 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 10/31/2006 at 08:45 AM. (Susman, Arthur)
October 26, 2006 93 MOTION by Plaintiffs Todd Smith, Daniel McKenzie, Randy C Snyder, Diane J Snyder, Robert J Snyder, Patricia Ann Polston, Elizabeth Ware, Don Wayne McDaniel, John Butcher, Wendell C Hull, Flynn Ranch of Townsend Inc, Billing Memorial LLC, Mary Driskill, E J Driskill to reset Filing and Status Conference (Susman, Arthur)
September 27, 2006 92 MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer : Plaintiffs' motion for leave to reset date for filing Amended Complaint 90 granted to 10/31/06. Status hearing set for 11/9/2006 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice (mb, )
September 22, 2006 91 NOTICE of Motion by Arthur T. Susman for presentment of motion to reset 90 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 9/27/2006 at 09:00 AM. (Susman, Arthur)
September 22, 2006 90 MOTION by Plaintiff Don Wayne McDaniel to reset Date for Filing Amended Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Filing # 2 Certificate of Service)(Susman, Arthur)
September 11, 2006 89 MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer : Status hearing set for 10/16/2006 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice (etv, )
August 15, 2006 88 MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer : Status hearing held on 8/15/2006. Defendant's motion to strike amendment to class action complaint 84 is denied, but the Amendment does not substitute for an amended complaint, and no formal response to the filing is required. Plaintiff's oral request for leave to file Amended Complaint by 9/30/2006 is granted. Mailed notice (mb, )
August 14, 2006 87 NOTICE by all plaintiffs re memorandum in opposition to motion, 86 to Strike or Dismiss Amendment to Complaint (Susman, Arthur)
August 14, 2006 86 MEMORANDUM by Todd Smith, Daniel McKenzie, Randy C Snyder, Diane J Snyder, Robert J Snyder, Patricia Ann Polston, Elizabeth Ware, Don Wayne McDaniel, John Butcher, Wendell C Hull, Flynn Ranch of Townsend Inc, Billing Memorial LLC, Mary Driskill, E J Driskill in Opposition to motion to strike, motion for relief,, 84 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(Susman, Arthur)
August 10, 2006 85 NOTICE of Motion by Kevin Buckley Duff for presentment of motion to strike, motion for relief,, 84 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 8/15/2006 at 09:00 AM. (Duff, Kevin)
August 10, 2006 84 MOTION by Defendants QWest Communications Corporation, Sprint Coummunications Company LP, Level 3 Communications LLC, Williams Communications LLC to strike other 82 or Dismiss "Amendment to Class Action Complaint" (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Duff, Kevin)
July 27, 2006 83 CERTIFICATE of Service by Plaintiff Don Wayne McDaniel (Gotfryd, William)
July 27, 2006 82 Amendment to Complaint by Don Wayne McDaniel (Gotfryd, William)
July 27, 2006 81 NOTICE by Don Wayne McDaniel (Gotfryd, William)
July 18, 2006 79 MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer : Within ten (10) days, parties to submit stipulation or alternatively, Plaintiff to submit an amended complaint setting forth facts that would support the conclusion that the court has jurisdiction over the state law claims asserted here. Mailed notice (mb, )
July 18, 2006 78 MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer : Status hearing held on 7/18/2006. Status hearing set for 8/15/2006 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice (etv, )
July 13, 2006 80 LETTER from J. Emmett Logan dated 7/13/2006. (mb, )
July 11, 2006 76 MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer : Status hearing set for 7/13/2006 is stricken. Status hearing set for 7/18/2006 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice (etv, )
July 10, 2006 77 LETTER from William T. Gotfryd dated 7/10/06. (mb, )
June 13, 2006 75 MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer : Status hearing held on 6/13/2006. Status hearing set for 7/13/2006 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice (etv, )
May 23, 2006 74 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/23/2006:Mailed notice(hp, )
May 23, 2006 73 MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer : Enter Memorandum Opinion And Order. Plaintiffs' motion for class certification is denied. The court finds that Plaintiffs have not met their burden of establishing that a ten-subclass, six-issue class meets the requirements of typicality and adequacy under Rule 23(a) and could be certified under Rule 23(b)(1)(A) or 23(b)(3). The court, further, exercises its discretion to drop all non-Illinois Plaintiffs from this action. Status hearing set for 6/13/06 at 9:00. [ For further detail see separate order(s).] Mailed notice (hp, )
March 31, 2006 72 MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer : Defendants' request for joinder in motion to dismiss filed by Defendant Qwest 28 is granted. Mailed notice (rmm, )
March 31, 2006 71 MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer : For reasons explained in an opinion to be released next week, plaintiffs' motion for class certification 40 is denied without prejudice and defendants' motion to deny class certification 30 is denied as moot. Defendants' motions to dismiss claims of non-Illinois plaintiffs and to drop such parties 20 , 26 are granted without prejudice. Mailed notice (cem, )
March 9, 2006 70 MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer : Defendants' Motion for leave to File Supplemental Authority in Support of Defendants' Motion to Deny Class Certification and Opposing Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification 66 is granted. Mailed notice (rmm, )
March 7, 2006 69 NOTICE by all plaintiffs re supplement 68 Supplemental Authority in Support of Motion for Class Certification (Susman, Arthur)
March 7, 2006 68 SUPPLEMENT by Don Wayne McDaniel to Supplemental Authority in Support of Motion for Class Certification (Attachments: # 1)(Susman, Arthur)
March 7, 2006 67 NOTICE of Motion by Kevin Buckley Duff for presentment of motion to supplement, 66 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/10/2006 at 09:00 AM. (Duff, Kevin)
March 7, 2006 66 MOTION by Defendants QWest Communications Corporation, Sprint Coummunications Company LP, Level 3 Communications LLC, Williams Communications LLC to supplement Authority in Support of Defendants' Motion to Deny Class Certification and Opposing Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification (Duff, Kevin)
December 2, 2005 64 MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer : Ddfendants' motion to file supplemental authority in support of Defendants' motion to deny class certification 60 and amended motion to supplement 62 is granted. Mailed notices (gcy, )
December 1, 2005 65 LETTER from William T. Gotfryd dated 12/1/2005. (rmm, )
November 28, 2005 63 Amended NOTICE of Motion by Kevin Buckley Duff for presentment of motion to supplement 62 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 12/2/2005 at 09:00 AM. (Duff, Kevin)
November 28, 2005 62 MOTION by Defendants QWest Communications Corporation, Sprint Coummunications Company LP, Level 3 Communications LLC, Williams Communications LLC to supplement (Amended) (Duff, Kevin)
November 23, 2005 61 NOTICE of Motion by Kevin Buckley Duff for presentment of motion to supplement, 60 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 12/2/2005 at 09:00 AM. (Duff, Kevin)
November 23, 2005 60 MOTION by Defendants QWest Communications Corporation, Sprint Coummunications Company LP, Level 3 Communications LLC, Williams Communications LLC to supplement authority in support of Defendants' motion to deny class certification and opposing Plaintiffs' motion for class certification (Duff, Kevin)
November 2, 2005 59 REPLY Rejoinder in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification on Limited Issues Pursuant to Rule 23(C)(4), (B)(1)(A), and (B)(3) F.R.Civ.P. (Gotfryd, William)
October 26, 2005 57 MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer : Motion by Defendants for leave to file excess pages 33 granted nunc pro tunc 5/27/05. Mailed notice (rmm, )
October 25, 2005 56 MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer : Defendants' motion for leave to file surreply in support of Defendants' motion to deny class certification 52 granted. Sur-response, if any, to be filed in 10 days. Status hearing set for 10/31/05 is stricken. Mailed notice (rmm, )
October 25, 2005 55 NOTICE by QWest Communications Corporation, Sprint Coummunications Company LP, Level 3 Communications LLC, Williams Communications LLC re reply 54 (Notice of Filing and Certificate of Service) (Duff, Kevin)
October 25, 2005 54 REPLY by Defendants QWest Communications Corporation, Sprint Coummunications Company LP, Level 3 Communications LLC, Williams Communications LLC to reply 50 (Duff, Kevin)
October 24, 2005 58 LETTER from William T. Gotfryd dated 10/24/2005. (rmm, )
October 21, 2005 53 Certificate of Service and NOTICE of Motion by Kevin Buckley Duff for presentment of motion for leave to file, 52 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 10/25/2005 at 09:00 AM. (Duff, Kevin)
October 21, 2005 52 MOTION by Defendants QWest Communications Corporation, Sprint Coummunications Company LP, Level 3 Communications LLC, Williams Communications LLC for leave to file Surreply in Support of Defendants' Motion to Deny Class Certification and Opposing Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification (Duff, Kevin)
August 16, 2005 51 MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer : Agreed motion by plaintiffs for leave to file plaintiffs' reply brief in support of motion for class certification in excess of 15 pages 48 is granted. Status hearing held on 8/16/2005 Status hearing set for 10/31/2005 at 09:00 a.m. Mailed notices (gcy, )
August 16, 2005 50 REPLY by Plaintiffs in support of motion for class certification on limited issues pursuant to Rule 23 (C)(4), (b)(1)(A) and (b)(3), F.R.Civ.P. (gcy, )
August 12, 2005 49 NOTICE of Motion by William T. Gotfryd for presentment of plaintiffs' agreed motion for leave to file plaintifs' reply brief in support of motion for class certification in excess of 15 pages 48 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 8/16/2005 at 09:00 AM. (las, )
August 12, 2005 48 AGREED MOTION by Plaintiffs for leave to file plaintiffs' reply brief in support of motion for class certification in excess of 15 pages (las, )
July 27, 2005 47 NOTICE by all defendants re reply to response to motion,,, 46 of filing and certificate of service (Duff, Kevin)
July 27, 2005 46 REPLY by QWest Communications Corporation, Sprint Coummunications Company LP, Level 3 Communications LLC, Williams Communications LLCin Support of MOTION by Defendants QWest Communications Corporation, Sprint Coummunications Company LP, Level 3 Communications LLC, Williams Communications LLC 30 and Opposing Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification (Attachments: # 1 Appendix cover page# 2 Appendix Exhibit 16# 3 Appendix Exhibit 17 (part 1)# 4 Appendix Exhibit 17 (part 2)# 5 Appendix Exhibit 18# 6 Appendix Exhibit 19 (Part 1)# 7 Appendix Exhibit 19 (Part 2)# 8 Appendix Exhibit 20# 9 Appendix Exhibit 21# 10 Appendix Exhibit 22# 11 Appendix Exhibit 23# 12 Appendix Exhibit 24# 13 Appendix Exhibit 25# 14 Appendix Exhibit 26# 15 Appendix Exhibit 27)(Duff, Kevin)
July 21, 2005 45 MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer : Areed motion for extension of time for defendants to respond to motion for class certification 41 granted to and including 7/27/05. Plaintiffs are granted to and including 8/17/05 to file their reply. Agreed motion for leave to file defendants' brief in excess of 15 pages 43 granted. Mailed notices. (gcy, )
July 20, 2005 44 NOTICE of Motion by Kevin Buckley Duff for presentment of defendants' agreed motion for leave to file defendants' brief in excess of 15 pages 43 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/27/2005 at 09:00 AM. (las, )
July 20, 2005 43 AGREED MOTION by Defendants QWest Communications Corporation, Sprint Coummunications Company LP, Level 3 Communications LLC and Williams Communications LLC for leave to file defendants' brief in excess of 15 pages (las, )
July 20, 2005 42 NOTICE of Motion by Kevin Buckley Duff for presentment of defendants' agreed motion for extension of time for defendants to respond to motion for class certification 41 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/27/2005 at 09:00 AM. (las, )
July 20, 2005 41 AGREED MOTION by Defendants QWest Communications Corporation, Sprint Coummunications Company LP, Level 3 Communications LLC and Williams Communications LLC for extension of time for defendants to respond to motion for class certification 40 (las, )
June 29, 2005 40 MOTION by Plaintiffs for class certification on limited issues pursuant to Rules 23(C)(4), (B)(1)(A) and (B)(3), F.R.Civ.P.; Notice. (Attachments: # 1)(ntf, )
June 22, 2005 39 REPLY Memorandum in support of defendants' motion to drop parties; Notice. (gcy, )
June 15, 2005 38 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs in opposition to defendants' motion to drop parties. (gcy, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/20/2005 (gcy, ). Additional attachment(s) added on 6/20/2005 (gcy, ). Additional attachment(s) added on 6/20/2005 (gcy, ).
June 10, 2005 37 SURREPLY by Plaintiffs in opposition to motion to dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(B)(1) and RUle 12(b)(3).(gcy, )
June 7, 2005 36 REPLY by Defendant QWest Communications Corporation in suport of motion to dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(B)(1) and Rule 12(B)(3). (gcy, )
June 1, 2005 35 MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer : Defendant's motion to deny class certification 30 entered and continued. Response to defendant's motion to drop parties 26 to be filed by or on 6/15/05; reply 6/22/05. Plaintiff's motion for class certification to be filed by or on 6/29/05; response 7/20/05; reply 8/3/05. Status hearing set for 8/16/2005 at 09:00 a.m. Mailed notices (gcy, )
May 27, 2005 33 REQUEST by Defendants for approval to exceed page limitation (gma, )
May 27, 2005 32 SUPPLEMENTAL APPENDIX by defendants to MEMORANDUM in support of defendants' MOTION to deny class certification (gma, )
May 27, 2005 31 NOTICE of Motion by all defendants for presentment of MOTION by Defendants to deny class certification 30 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 6/1/2005 at 09:30 AM. (gma, )
May 27, 2005 30 MOTION by Defendants to deny class certification (gma, )
May 26, 2005 34 APPENDIX to memrandum in support of defendants' motion to drop parties.(gcy, )
May 26, 2005 29 MEMORANDUM by QWest Communications Corporation, Sprint Coummunications Company LP, Level 3 Communications LLC, Williams Communications LLC in Support of motion to drop parties. (gcy, )
May 26, 2005 28 JOINDER IN MOTION to dismiss by Defendants Sprint Coummunications Company LP, Level 3 Communications LLC,Williams Communications LLC. (gcy, )
May 26, 2005 27 NOTICE of Motion by all defendants for presentment of MOTION by Defendants to drop parties 26 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 6/1/2005 at 09:30 AM. (gma, )
May 26, 2005 26 MOTION by Defendants to drop parties(gma, )
May 24, 2005 25 MEMORANDUM by plaintiffs in Opposition to Qwest's motion to dismiss pursuant to Rules 12(B)(1) and 12(B)(3), F.R.Civ.P. (gcy, )
April 26, 2005 24 MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer : Plaintiff's response to defendant's motion to dismiss 20 to be filed by or on 5/24/05; reply by 6/7/05. Rule 16 conference set for 5/31/05 is stricken. Mailed notice (gcy, )
April 19, 2005 23 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant QWest Communications Corporation by Kevin Buckley Duff, Emily J Brubaker, John F Daum. (gcy, )
April 19, 2005 22 LOCAL RULE 3.2 Disclosure by QWest Communications Corporation. (gcy, )
April 19, 2005 21 NOTICE of Motion by QWest Communications Corporation for presentment of MOTION by Defendant QWest Communications Corporation to dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(B)(1) and Rule 12(B)(3) 20 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/26/2005 at 09:30 AM. (gma, )
April 19, 2005 20 MOTION by Defendant QWest Communications Corporation to dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(B)(1) and Rule 12(B)(3) (gma, )
April 7, 2005 19 MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer : Uncontested Motion for Order Resetting Dates for Pretrial Conference and Submission of Planning Report (17) granted. Rule 16 conference set for 4/12/05 stricken. Rule 16 conference reset to 5/31/2005 at 09:00 a.m. The parties planning report shall be submitted to Judge Pallmeyer in chambers no later than two business days prior to the conference. Mailed notice (gcy, )
April 5, 2005 18 NOTICE of Motion by all plaintiffs for presentment of UNCONTESTED MOTION by Plaintiffs for order resetting dates for pretrial conference and submission of planning report 17 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/7/2005 at 09:00 AM. (gma, )
April 5, 2005 17 UNCONTESTED MOTION by Plaintiffs for order resetting dates for pretrial conference and submission of planning report (gma, )
April 1, 2005 16 ANSWER to plaintiff's class action complaint with jury demand by Sprint Coummunications Company LP.(gcy, )
March 24, 2005 15 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by Level 3 Communications LLC.(gcy, )
March 16, 2005 13 MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer : Sprint's motion to enlarge time to answer or otherwise plead 10 granted to and including 4/1/05. Status set for 4/12/05 stricken. The parties are directed to appear through lead counsel for a pretrial conference pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 16 set for 9:00 on 4/12/05. Counsel are requested promptly to meet face-to-face for a discussion of possible settlement and for preparation of a planning report in the form that is enclosed. The form is accessible from the court's Internet site. http://10.205.15.104/JUDGE/PALLMEYER/rrppage.htm. Such report shall be submitted to Judge Pallmeyer in chambers no later than two business days prior to the conference. Mailed notice (eav, )
March 15, 2005 14 ANSWER by defendant Wiltel Communications, LLC to class action complaint and affirmative defenses.(mjc, )
March 14, 2005 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Sprint Coummunications Company LP by James Joseph Sipchen, Richard M. Waris, J Emmet Logan. (gcy, )
March 14, 2005 11 NOTICE of Motion by Sprint Coummunications Company LP for presentment of MOTION by Defendant Sprint Coummunications Company LP to enlarge time to answer or otherwise plead 10 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/17/2005 at 09:00 AM. (gma, )
March 14, 2005 10 MOTION by Defendant Sprint Coummunications Company LP to enlarge time to answer or otherwise plead 1 (gma, )
March 3, 2005 9 MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer : Status hearing set for 4/15/2005 at 09:00 AM, courtroom 2119. Mailed notice (etv, )
February 23, 2005 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by plantiffs as to Level 3 Communications LLC on 2/18/2005, answer due 3/10/2005. (gcy, )
February 23, 2005 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by plaintiffs as to Sprint Coummunications Company LP on 2/18/2005, answer due 3/10/2005. (gcy, )
February 23, 2005 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by plaintiffs as to QWest Communications Corporation on 2/18/2005, answer due 3/10/2005. (gcy, )
February 23, 2005 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by plaintiffs as to Williams Communications LLC on 2/18/2005, answer due 3/10/2005. (gcy, )
February 18, 2005 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Todd Smith, Daniel McKenzie, Randy C Snyder, Diane J Snyder, Robert J Snyder, Patricia Ann Polston, Elizabeth Ware, Don Wayne McDaniel, John Butcher, Wendell C Hull, Flynn Ranch of Townsend Inc, Billing Memorial LLC, Mary Driskill, E J Driskill by William T. Gotfryd, Arthur T. Susman (gcy, )
February 18, 2005 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (gcy, )
February 18, 2005 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed by plaintiffs; Jury Demand.(gcy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: McDaniel et al v. QWest Communications Corporation et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]