SKF USA Inc. v. Equipment Reliability Services, Inc.

Plaintiff: SKF USA Inc.
Defendant: Equipment Reliability Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv02232
Filed: April 13, 2009
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc. Office
County: XX US, Outside the State of IL
Presiding Judge: Rebecca R. Pallmeyer
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 30, 2009 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 12 Motion to Change Venue (Written Opinion). The Clerk of Court shall transfer this action to the Northern District of Illinois. Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 3/30/09. (GMO) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/13/2009.]
August 9, 2010 49 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 8/9/2010: Mailed notice(etv, )
September 27, 2011 55 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 9/27/2011: Mailed notice(etv, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SKF USA Inc. v. Equipment Reliability Services, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SKF USA Inc.
Represented By: Stephen J Sundheim
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equipment Reliability Services, Inc.
Represented By: Megan M Ruwe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]