Prestwick Capital Management Ltd. et al v. Peregrine Financial Group, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Prestwick Capital Management Ltd., Prestwick Capital Management 2 Ltd. and Prestwick Capital Management 3 Ltd.
Defendant: Renee Gattullo-Wilson
 
Case Number: 1:2010cv00023
Filed: January 5, 2010
 
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: XX US, Outside the State of IL
Presiding Judge: Elaine E. Bucklo
 
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 7:25 Fraud - Commodities Leverage Contracts
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
November 12, 2010 112 Featured Case MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 11/12/2010:Mailed notice(mpj, )
August 25, 2011 171 Featured Case MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 8/25/2011:Mailed notice(mpj, )
October 21, 2009 50 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER:# 98175 The August 21 motion of Peregrine, the August 24 motion of Acuvest Inc. and Caiazzo, and the September 9 motion of Grey to transfer the claims against them to the Northern District of Illinois are granted. The September 9 motion of Acuvest Brokers, LLC and Wilson for a severance is granted. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 10/21/2009) (jpo) Modified on 10/23/2009 (eef). [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/5/2010.]
October 21, 2009 51 Featured Case ORDER: It is hereby ordered that the claims against all defendants except Acuvest Brokers, LLC and Renee Gattullo-Wilson are severed and transferred to the Northern District of Illinois. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiffs may file an amended complaint against Acuvest Brokers and Wilson by October 30, 2009. In the event no amended complaint is filed by that day, the Court will address the pending motion to dismiss. No further amendment will be permitted after a decision is rendered on a motion to dismiss. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 10/21/2009) (jpo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/5/2010.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Prestwick Capital Management Ltd. et al v. Peregrine Financial Group, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prestwick Capital Management Ltd.
Represented By: Kate Suzanna Woodall
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prestwick Capital Management 2 Ltd.
Represented By: Kate Suzanna Woodall
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prestwick Capital Management 3 Ltd.
Represented By: Kate Suzanna Woodall
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renee Gattullo-Wilson
Represented By: Scott David Stechman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]