Powell v. XO Services, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Richard D. Powell
Defendant: XO Services, Inc., Scott Gentles, David Nash and Trent Edwards
 
Case Number: 1:2010cv06813
Filed: October 22, 2010
 
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Elaine E. Bucklo
 
Nature of Suit: Assault, Libel, and Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
November 7, 2012 118 Featured Case Enter MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 11/7/2012. Mailed notice (jdh)
April 1, 2011 34 Featured Case MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 4/1/2011:Mailed notice(mpj, )
February 7, 2012 75 Featured Case WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 2/7/2012: Plaintiff's motion for leave to amend his complaint 62 is granted. Any motion for summary judgment to be filed by April 30. 2012; Response by May 24, 2012, reply by 6/8/2012, and Ruling set for 7/9/12 at 9:30 a.m. (For further details see written opinion.) Mailed notice (ma,)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Powell v. XO Services, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard D. Powell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XO Services, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas R. Dee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Gentles
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Nash
Represented By: Thomas R. Dee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trent Edwards
Represented By: Thomas R. Dee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]