Huon v. Breaking Media et al Featured Case

Chicago lawyer Meanith Huon sued legal blog Above the Law, blogger Elie Mystal, and managing editor David Lat, for $50 million and control of the AboveTheLaw.com domain. Huon accuses ATL of defamation and incorrectly portraying him in a false light "as a serial rapist." The attorney's suit says that ATL failed to show that a blog post written by Mystal containing three different stories accusing Huon of sexual assault actually involved "the same complaining witness," not three different women, and involved a single case from which a jury acquitted him after deliberating for just 2 hours.

Plaintiff: Meanith Huon
Defendant: Breaking Media, Breakingmedia.com, Abovethelaw.com, Elie Mystal, David Lat, John Lerner, David Minkin and John Does 1 to 100
Case Number: 1:2011cv03054
Filed: May 6, 2011
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Marvin E. Aspen
Nature of Suit: Assault, Libel, and Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 11, 2013 210 REPLY by Defendants Breaking Media, Breaking Media, Inc., Breaking Media, LLC, David Lat, John Lerner, David Minkin, Elie Mystal to motion to dismiss 178 - in support of (Mandell, Steven)
April 11, 2013 209 MINUTE entry before Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: Minute order 208 is modified as follows:Unopposed Motion by Defendants Breaking Media, Breaking Media, Inc., Breaking Media, LLC, David Lat, John Lerner, David Minkin, Elie Mystal for extension of time to file their reply in support of their motion to dismiss 205 is granted. Defendants reply is due on 4/11/2013. No appearance on the motion is required. Mailed notice (air, )
April 11, 2013 208 MINUTE entry before Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Unopposed Motion by Defendants Breaking Media, Breaking Media, Inc., Breaking Media, LLC, David Lat, John Lerner, David Minkin, Elie Mystal for extension of time to file their reply in support of their motion to dismiss 205 . Defendants reply is due on 4/11/2013. No appearance on the motion is required.Mailed notice (air, )
April 9, 2013 207 REPLY by Defendants Irin Carmon, Gabby Darbyshire, Nick Denton, Gawker Entertainment, LLC, Gawker Media, Gawker Media Group, Inc, Gawker Media, LLC, Gawker Sales, LLC, Gawker Technology, LLC to response to motion, 200 (Feige, David)
April 9, 2013 206 NOTICE of Motion by Steven P. Mandell for presentment of extension of time, 205 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 4/16/2013 at 09:30 AM. (Mandell, Steven)
April 9, 2013 205 MOTION by Defendants Breaking Media, Breaking Media, Inc., Breaking Media, LLC, David Lat, John Lerner, David Minkin, Elie Mystal for extension of time to file their reply in support of their motion to dismiss plaintiff's fourth amended complaint - unopposed (Mandell, Steven)
April 8, 2013 204 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on January 10, 2013 before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr. Court Reporter Contact Information: Carolyn Cox, Carolyn_Cox@ilnd.uscourts.gov, (312) 435-5639. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 4/29/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/9/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/8/2013. (Cox, Carolyn)
April 8, 2013 203 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on August 23, 2012 before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr. Court Reporter Contact Information: Carolyn Cox, Carolyn_Cox@ilnd.uscourts.gov, (312) 435-5639. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 4/29/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/9/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/8/2013. (Cox, Carolyn)
March 19, 2013 201 MINUTE entry before Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: Defendants' motion to strike 198 Plaintiff's responses to their summary judgment motions is denied. No appearance on the motion is required. The responses are within the 30 pages allotted by the Court's prior order. Pages devoted to required tables of content do not count toward page limits under the local rules. Mailed notice (air, )
March 18, 2013 202 MINUTE entry before Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Plaintiff's motion to amend/correct response in opposition to motion 196 is granted. No appearance on the motion is required. The Clerk is directed to strike the original Exhibit H to the Plaintiff's response 194 and to replace it with the corrected Exhibit H included with the motion to amend 196 . mailed notice (tg, )
March 18, 2013 200 RESPONSE by Meanith Huon to MOTION by Defendants Breaking Media, Breaking Media, Inc., Breaking Media, LLC, Irin Carmon, Gabby Darbyshire, Nick Denton, Gawker Media, David Lat, John Lerner, David Minkin, Elie Mystal to strike response in opposition to motion, 195 , response i 198 (Huon, Meanith)
March 18, 2013 199 NOTICE of Motion by Steven P. Mandell for presentment of motion to strike,, motion for relief,,, 198 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 3/21/2013 at 09:30 AM. (Mandell, Steven)
March 18, 2013 198 MOTION by Defendants Breaking Media, Breaking Media, Inc., Breaking Media, LLC, Irin Carmon, Gabby Darbyshire, Nick Denton, Gawker Media, David Lat, John Lerner, David Minkin, Elie Mystal to strike response in opposition to motion, 195 , response in opposition to motion,, 194 - Joint (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Mandell, Steven)
March 17, 2013 197 NOTICE of Motion by Meanith Huon for presentment of motion to amend/correct, motion for relief 196 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 3/27/2013 at 09:30 AM. (Huon, Meanith)
March 17, 2013 196 MOTION by Plaintiff Meanith Huon to amend/correct response in opposition to motion,, 194 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed redacted and corrected Exhibit H)(Huon, Meanith)
March 12, 2013 195 RESPONSE by Meanith Huonin Opposition to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM 174 WITH EXHIBITS A TO M (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B1, # 3 Exhibit B2, # 4 Exhibit C1, # 5 Exhibit C2, # 6 Exhibit D1, # 7 Exhibit D2, # 8 Exhibit E, # 9 Exhibit F, # 10 Exhibit G, # 11 Exhibit H, # 12 Exhibit I1, # 13 Exhibit I2, # 14 Exhibit J, # 15 Exhibit K, # 16 Exhibit L, # 17 Exhibit M)(Huon, Meanith)
March 12, 2013 194 RESPONSE by Meanith Huonin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants John Lerner, Breaking Media, Breaking Media, LLC, David Lat, Breaking Media, Inc., David Minkin, Elie Mystal to dismiss Plaintiff's Fourth Amended Complaint 178 WITH EXHIBITS A TO J (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A1, # 2 Exhibit A2, # 3 Exhibit A3, # 4 Exhibit A4, # 5 Exhibit A5, # 6 Exhibit A6, # 7 Exhibit B, # 8 Exhibit C, # 9 Exhibit D, # 10 Exhibit E1, # 11 Exhibit E2, # 12 Exhibit E3, # 13 Exhibit F, # 14 Exhibit G, # 15 Exhibit H, # 16 Exhibit I, # 17 Exhibit J)(Huon, Meanith) (Attachment 15 Exhibit H replaced on 3/19/2013 pursuant to Judge's order of 3/18/2013) (tg, ).
March 12, 2013 193 RESPONSE by Meanith Huon to MOTION by Defendants John Lerner, Breaking Media, Breaking Media, LLC, David Lat, Breaking Media, Inc., David Minkin, Elie Mystal to dismiss Plaintiff's Fourth Amended Complaint 178 (Huon, Meanith)
March 12, 2013 192 RESPONSE by Meanith Huonin Opposition to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM 174 (Huon, Meanith)
January 30, 2013 191 MEMORANDUM memorandum 175 by Gawker Media, LLC REPLACEMENT Memorandum in Support of Gawker Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Giskan, Oren)
January 24, 2013 190 MEMORANDUM by Breaking Media, Inc., Breaking Media, LLC, David Lat, John Lerner, David Minkin, Elie Mystal in support of motion to dismiss 178 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Mandell, Steven)
January 11, 2013 189 Featured Case ORDER Signed by the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr on 1/11/2013:Mailed notice(air, )
January 11, 2013 188 MINUTE entry before Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: ENTER ORDER. (For further details see separate order)Mailed notice (air, )
January 10, 2013 187 MINUTE entry before Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: Status hearing held. Parties are directed to confer regarding plaintiffs concern regarding use of the transcript from his criminal trial in conjunction with the motions to dismiss. Defendants motions for leave to file briefs in excess of 15 pages [176, 1791] are granted. Plaintiffs consolidated response to defendants motions to dismiss [174, 178], not to exceed up to 50 pages or 30 pages each if individual responses are filed, is/are due by 3/12/2013. Defendants reply briefs (the ATL and Gawker groups), not to exceed 20 pages each, are due 4/9/2013. Rule 26(f) conference is deferred pending resolution of the motions to dismiss. Mailed notice (air, )
January 10, 2013 186 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP RULE 7.1 & LOCAL RULE 3.2 STATEMENT by Gawker Media, LLC (Feige, David)
January 10, 2013 185 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Gawker Media Group, Inc (Giskan, Oren)
January 9, 2013 184 NOTICE by Irin Carmon, Gabby Darbyshire, Nick Denton, Gawker Media re attorney appearance 183 (Mlinarcik, Amanda)
January 9, 2013 183 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Irin Carmon, Gabby Darbyshire, Nick Denton, Gawker Media by Amanda Szuch Mlinarcik (Mlinarcik, Amanda)
January 8, 2013 182 NOTICE of Motion by David L. Feige for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages 176 , Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim 174 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 1/10/2013 at 09:00 AM. (Feige, David)
January 8, 2013 181 NOTICE of Motion by Steven P. Mandell for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages, 179 , motion to dismiss 178 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 1/10/2013 at 09:00 AM. (Mandell, Steven)
January 7, 2013 180 NOTICE of Motion by Steven P. Mandell for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages, 179 , motion to dismiss 178 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 1/10/2013 at 09:00 AM. (Mandell, Steven)
January 7, 2013 179 MOTION by Defendants Breaking Media, Breaking Media, Inc., Breaking Media, LLC, David Lat, John Lerner, David Minkin, Elie Mystal for leave to file excess pages re memorandum in support of their motion to dismiss (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit A (to memo iso mtd), # 3 Exhibit B (to memo iso mtd), # 4 Exhibit C (to memo iso mtd))(Mandell, Steven)
January 7, 2013 178 MOTION by Defendants John Lerner, Breaking Media, Breaking Media, LLC, David Lat, Breaking Media, Inc., David Minkin, Elie Mystal to dismiss Plaintiff's Fourth Amended Complaint (Mandell, Steven)
January 7, 2013 177 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Breaking Media, Breaking Media, Inc., Breaking Media, LLC, David Lat, John Lerner, David Minkin, Elie Mystal (Mandell, Steven)
January 7, 2013 176 MOTION by Defendant Gawker Media, LLC for leave to file excess pages (Feige, David)
January 7, 2013 175 MEMORANDUM by Gawker Media, LLC (Feige, David) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 1/7/2013) (np, ).
January 7, 2013 174 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Feige, David)
December 14, 2012 173 MINUTE entry before Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:The plaintiff's motion 166 is denied as moot.Mailed notice (air, )
November 30, 2012 172 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Breaking Media, Breaking Media, Inc., David Lat, John Lerner, David Minkin, Elie Mystal by Elizabeth A.F. Morris (Morris, Elizabeth)
November 30, 2012 171 MINUTE entry before Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: Defendants' motion for extension of time to respond to the fourth amended complaint 169 is granted over plaintiff's objection. No appearance on the motion is required. Plaintiff has been allowed numerous extensions of time and opportunities to amend his pleadings. The proposed extension, to January 7, 2013, will not delay the status hearing set for 1/10/13 and will therefore be permitted. Responsive pleadings for all defendants who have been served are due January 7, 2013 (unless by rule and date of service a later date would apply). In the event that any defendant(s) respond to the complaint by means of motion, such motion should be noticed at the same time as the January 10, 2013 status hearing. Mailed notice (air, )
November 29, 2012 170 NOTICE of Motion by Steven P. Mandell for presentment of extension of time 169 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 12/5/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Mandell, Steven)
November 29, 2012 169 MOTION by Defendants Abovethelaw.com, Breaking Media, Breaking Media, Inc., Breaking Media, LLC, David Lat, John Lerner, David Minkin, Elie Mystal for extension of time to respond to fourth amended complaint (Mandell, Steven)
November 17, 2012 168 Notice of Filing Waiver OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS (Waivers are dated in June and July of 2011) by Meanith Huon (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Waiver OF SERVICE of summons)(Huon, Meanith)
November 17, 2012 167 Waiver of Summons dated in June of 2011 and August of 2011 by Meanith Huon (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Waiver of summons)(Huon, Meanith)
November 16, 2012 166 MOTION by Plaintiff Meanith Huon for discovery (AMENDED MOTION correcting name of Plaintiff in prayer for relief and correcting typo on page 7) (Huon, Meanith)
November 16, 2012 165 MINUTE entry before Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: Motion by Plaintiff Meanith Huon for Expedited and Limited Discovery and to compel Defendants to comply with FRCP 7.1 and Local Rule 3.2 163 is granted in part. All defendants named in the Fourth Amended Complaint are required, after service of the complaint, to file with their responsive pleading to the complaint the disclosures required by FRCP 7.1 and Local Rule 3.2. Plaintiff's request for limited discovery is taken under advisement and will be discussed at the status hearing previously set by the court for 1/10/13 at 9:00 a.m. All parties that have been served with the Fourth Amended Complaint are required to appear (personally or by counsel) at the status hearing. No hearing on the motion will be held on 11/21/12. Mailed notice (air, )
November 15, 2012 164 NOTICE of Motion by Meanith Huon for presentment of motion for discovery 163 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 11/21/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Huon, Meanith)
November 15, 2012 163 MOTION by Plaintiff Meanith Huon for discovery Expedited and Limited Discovery and to compel Defendants to comply with FRCP 7.1 and Local Rule 3.2 (Huon, Meanith)
November 15, 2012 162 FOURTH AMENDED complaint by Meanith Huon against Blogwire Hungary Szellemi Alkotast Hasznosito KFT, Breaking Media, Breaking Media, Inc., Breaking Media, LLC, Irin Carmon, Gabby Darbyshire, Nick Denton, Gawker Entertainment, LLC, Gawker Media, Gawker Media Group, Inc, Gawker Media, LLC, Gawker Sales, LLC, Gawker Technology, LLC, David Lat, John Lerner, David Minkin, Elie Mystal (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 9, # 9 Exhibit 10, # 10 Exhibit 11, # 11 Exhibit 12, # 12 Exhibit 13, # 13 Exhibit 14, # 14 Exhibit 15 Part 1, # 15 Exhibit 15 Part 2, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18 Part 1, # 19 Exhibit 18 Part 2, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20)(Huon, Meanith)
October 24, 2012 161 MINUTE entry before Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: On the court's own motion, status hearing is reset from 10/25/2012 to 1/10/2013 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (air, )
September 19, 2012 160 MINUTE entry before Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: Plaintiff's motion for an extension of time to file a fourth amended complaint 158 is granted. No appearance is required on the motion. Plaintiff's time in which to file a fourth amended complaint is extended to November 16, 2012. Mailed notice (air, )
September 14, 2012 159 NOTICE of Motion by Meanith Huon for presentment of extension of time 158 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 9/20/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Huon, Meanith)
September 14, 2012 158 MOTION by Plaintiff Meanith Huon for extension of time to file Fourth Amended Complaint (Huon, Meanith)
September 14, 2012 157 WRITTEN Opinion signed by the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr on 9/14/2012: For the reasons set forth in the statement section of this order, Plaintiff Meanith Huons Third Amended Complaint 156 is dismissed, sua sponte and without prejudice, for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. The plaintiff is granted leave to file a fourth amended complaint on or before 9/28/12, properly alleging complete diversity of citizenship. A status hearing will be conducted on 10/25/12 at 9:00 a.m. (For further details see minute order)Mailed notice(air, )
September 12, 2012 156 THIRD AMENDED complaint by Meanith Huon against Breaking Media, Irin Carmon, Gabby Darbyshire, Nick Denton, Gawker Media, David Lat, John Lerner, David Minkin, Elie Mystal, Breaking Media, LLC, Breaking Media, Inc., Gawker Media, LLC, BLOGWIRE HUNGARY SZELLEMI ALKOTAST HASZNOSITO KFT, GAWKER MEDIA GROUP, INC, GAWKER ENTERTAINMENT, LLC, GAWKER TECHNOLOGY, LLC, Gawker Sales, LLC and terminating Jezebel.com, John Doe No. 201, John Doe No.s 401, 402, 403, John Doe Nos. 101 to 200, John Does 1 to 100, Lawyergossip.com, newnation.org, Abovethelaw.com and Breakingmedia.com (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit D2, # 6 Exhibit D3, # 7 Exhibit D4, # 8 Exhibit E, # 9 Exhibit F, # 10 Exhibit F2, # 11 Exhibit F3, # 12 Exhibit F4, # 13 Exhibit F5, # 14 Exhibit F6, # 15 Exhibit F7, # 16 Exhibit G, # 17 Exhibit G2, # 18 Exhibit G3, # 19 Exhibit G4, # 20 Exhibit G5, # 21 Exhibit G6, # 22 Exhibit G7, # 23 Exhibit G8, # 24 Exhibit G9, # 25 Exhibit G10, # 26 Exhibit G11, # 27 Exhibit G12, # 28 Exhibit G13, # 29 Exhibit G14, # 30 Exhibit G15, # 31 Exhibit G16, # 32 Exhibit G17, # 33 Exhibit G18, # 34 Errata G19, # 35 Exhibit G20, # 36 Exhibit G21, # 37 Exhibit G22, # 38 Exhibit G23, # 39 Exhibit G24, # 40 Exhibit G25, # 41 Exhibit G26, # 42 Exhibit G27, # 43 Exhibit G28, # 44 Exhibit G29, # 45 Exhibit H)(Huon, Meanith)
August 24, 2012 155 MINUTE entry before Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: Defendants' motions to dismiss the second amended complaint [35, 57] are denied as moot in light of the Court's sua sponte dismissal of the second amended complaint, without prejudice 151 . If a third amended complaint is filed, defendants responsive pleadings (whether answer or motion) are due 10/3/12. Plaintiff's response will be due 10/31/12 and any replies will be due 11/14/12. Mailed notice(air, )
August 23, 2012 154 MINUTE entry before Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Status hearing held.Mailed notice(air, )
August 16, 2012 153 STATUS Report of Reassignment by Plaintiff (with A Corrected View of Exhibit A) by Meanith Huon (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Huon, Meanith)
August 16, 2012 152 STATUS Report of Reassignment by Plaintiff by Meanith Huon (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Huon, Meanith)
August 13, 2012 151 MINUTE entry before Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: For the reasons set forth in the statement section of this order, Plaintiff Meanith Huons Second Amended Complaint 22 is dismissed without prejudice for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. The plaintiff is granted leave to re-file a Third Amended Complaint on or before 9/12/12, addressing the jurisdictional issues noted in the Statement below. (For further details see minute order)Mailed notice (air, )
August 3, 2012 150 MINUTE entry before Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: This case has been reassigned to the calendar of Judge John J. Tharp, Jr. To assist the Court in acquiring the requisite knowledge of the case, counsel for the parties are directed to confer, and then to prepare and file a joint status report, not to exceed five pages, no later than August 17, 2012. A template for the status report, setting forth the information required, is attached and can be found here: www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judges. The status/ruling date of 8/16/12 set by Judge Aspen is stricken. A status hearing will be conducted on August 23, 2012, at 9:00 a.m. Unless otherwise ordered by this Court, all other hearing dates, deadlines, and schedules in effect as of the date of this Order remain in effect. (For further details see attached)Mailed notice(air, )
August 1, 2012 149 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr. for all further proceedings. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/1/2012.(psm, )
June 27, 2012 148 MINUTE entry before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen: The status/ruling date of 6/28/12 is stricken and reset to 8/16/2012 at 10:30 AM. Judicial staff mailed notice (gl, )
June 7, 2012 147 MINUTE entry before Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: All matters relating to the referral of this action having been resolved, the case is returned to the assigned judge. Referral terminated. Mailed notice (ep, )
April 24, 2012 146 MINUTE entry before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen:The status/ruling date of 5/24/12 is stricken and reset to 6/28/2012 at 10:30 AM. Judicial staff mailed notice (gl, )
April 9, 2012 145 MINUTE entry before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen: Attorney Justin David Kaplan's MOTION to withdraw as counsel for Defendants Irin Carmon, Gabby Darbyshire, Nick Denton, Gawker Media, Jezebel.com is granted. Justin David Kaplan terminated. The motion hearing set for 4/12/12 is stricken.Judicial staff mailed notice (gl, )
March 29, 2012 144 NOTICE by Irin Carmon, Gabby Darbyshire, Nick Denton, Gawker Media, Jezebel.com re attorney appearance 143 (Hansen, Amy)
March 29, 2012 143 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Irin Carmon, Gabby Darbyshire, Nick Denton, Gawker Media, Jezebel.com by Amy J. Hansen (Hansen, Amy)
March 19, 2012 142 NOTICE of Motion by Daniel Francis Lynch for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney 141 before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 4/12/2012 at 10:30 AM. (Lynch, Daniel)
March 19, 2012 141 MOTION by counsel for Defendants Irin Carmon, Gabby Darbyshire, Nick Denton, Gawker Media, Jezebel.com to withdraw as attorney Justin Kaplan (Lynch, Daniel)
February 14, 2012 140 MINUTE entry before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen:Attorney Sharon Albrecht's Motion to withdraw as attorney 138 for defendants is granted. Attorney Sharon Renae Albrecht terminated. The motion hearing set for 2/16/12 is stricken. Judicial staff mailed notice (gl, )
February 14, 2012 139 NOTICE of Motion by Sharon Renae Albrecht for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney 138 before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 2/16/2012 at 10:30 AM. (Albrecht, Sharon)
February 14, 2012 138 MOTION by counsel for Defendants Breaking Media, Breakingmedia.com, David Lat, John Lerner, David Minkin, Elie Mystal to withdraw as attorney - Sharon Albrecht (Albrecht, Sharon)
February 13, 2012 137 MINUTE entryions, motion for relief,,, 110 :The status/ruling date of 2/23/12 is stricken and reset to 5/24/2012 at 10:30 AM. Judicial staff mailed notice (gl, )
January 31, 2012 136 MINUTE entry before Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: Motion hearing held. Plaintiff's Amended Motion to Strike 123 is granted in part and denied in part for the reasons stated in open court. Mailed notice (ep, )
January 30, 2012 135 MEANITH HUON'S SUMMARY OF ARGUMENT OPPOSING THE ABOVE THE LAW DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS by Meanith Huon (Huon, Meanith)
January 30, 2012 134 SUMMARY OF MEANITH HUON'S ARGUMENTS OPPOSING THE JEZEBEL DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS by Meanith Huon (Huon, Meanith)
January 29, 2012 133 SUR-REPLY by Plaintiff Meanith Huon to reply 105 (Huon, Meanith)
January 29, 2012 132 SUR-REPLY by Plaintiff Meanith Huon to reply 117 , reply to response to motion 109 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit B (continued))(Huon, Meanith)
January 27, 2012 131 MINUTE entry before Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: The Clerk is directed to remove from the CM/ECF system and from the Court's server, Exhibit "A" to the Gawker Defendant's Reply in Support of Gawker Defendants Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to 12(b)(6) 109 . Mailed notice (ep, )
January 19, 2012 130 NOTICE of Motion by Meanith Huon for presentment of motion to strike, motion for relief 123 before Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert on 1/31/2012 at 09:15 AM. (Huon, Meanith)
January 19, 2012 129 EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Meanith Huon regarding MOTION by Plaintiff Meanith Huon to strike reply to response to motion 109 AMENDED MOTION TO STRIKE 123 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Page 1 of Police report, # 2 Exhibit Pages 2 to 5 of Police report indicating that the Jezebel Defendants' unredacted Exhibit "A" would not have contained an address)(Huon, Meanith)
January 19, 2012 128 EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Meanith Huon regarding MOTION by Plaintiff Meanith Huon to strike reply to response to motion 109 AMENDED MOTION TO STRIKE 123 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certified copy of nolle prosequi order)(Huon, Meanith)
January 19, 2012 127 MINUTE entry before Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: Plaintiff's Motion to Strike and for Sanctions has been referred to Magistrate Judge Gilbert. The movant shall re-notice his amended Motion to Strike 123 in accordance with Magistrate Judge Gilbert's motion procedures (available on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov.) Mailed notice (ep, )
January 19, 2012 126 REPLY by Meanith Huon to response to motion, 124 , MOTION by Plaintiff Meanith Huon to strike reply to response to motion 109 AMENDED MOTION TO STRIKE 123 , reply to response to motion 125 CORRECTED REPLY (Huon, Meanith)
January 19, 2012 125 REPLY by Meanith Huon to response to motion, 124 , MOTION by Plaintiff Meanith Huon to strike reply to response to motion 109 AMENDED MOTION TO STRIKE 123 (Huon, Meanith)
January 19, 2012 124 RESPONSE by Irin Carmon, Gabby Darbyshire, Nick Denton, Gawker Media, Jezebel.com to MOTION by Plaintiff Meanith Huon to strike reply to response to motion 109 AMENDED MOTION TO STRIKE 123 Response to Plaintiff's Amended Request to Strike and Motion to Disclose the Name and Address of the Victim in the Criminal Case Against Him (Feige, David)
January 18, 2012 123 MOTION by Plaintiff Meanith Huon to strike reply to response to motion 109 AMENDED MOTION TO STRIKE (Huon, Meanith)
January 17, 2012 122 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case referred to the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert pursuant to Local Rule 72.1. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/17/2012.(psm, )
January 17, 2012 121 MEMORANDUM by Irin Carmon, Gabby Darbyshire, Nick Denton, Gawker Media, Jezebel.com in support of motion to dismiss 57 Summary (Feige, David)
January 17, 2012 120 MINUTE entry before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen: Plaintiff's motion to strike and for sanctions is referred to Magistrate Judge Gilbert. The motion hearing date of 1/19/12 is stricken.Judicial staff mailed notice (gl, )
December 30, 2011 119 MINUTE entry before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen: Plaintiff's motion to strike and motion for sanctions is entered and continued to 1/19/12 at 10:30 a.m. Judicial staff mailed notice (gl, )
December 30, 2011 118 NOTICE of Correction 109 . (mr, )
December 30, 2011 117 REPLY by Defendants Irin Carmon, Gabby Darbyshire, Nick Denton, Gawker Media, Jezebel.com to response in opposition to motion, 96 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A --Huon Criminal Complaint)(Giskan, Oren)
December 30, 2011 116 REPLY by Meanith Huon to MOTION by Plaintiff Meanith Huon to strike reply to response to motion 109 EXHIBIT A OF GAWKER'S REPLY BRIEF FOR DISCLOSING MR. HUON'S SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER, DATE OF BIRTH, DRIVER'S LICENSE NUMBERMOTION by Plaintiff Meanith Huon to strike reply to response to motion 109 EXHIBIT A OF GAWKER'S REPLY BRIEF FOR DISCLOSING MR. HUON'S SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER, DATE OF BIRTH, DRIVER'S LICENSE NUMBERMOTION by Plaintiff Meanith Huon for sanctions 110 , response to motion,, 114 AMENDED REPLY (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Huon, Meanith)
December 29, 2011 115 REPLY by Meanith Huon to MOTION by Plaintiff Meanith Huon to strike reply to response to motion 109 EXHIBIT A OF GAWKER'S REPLY BRIEF FOR DISCLOSING MR. HUON'S SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER, DATE OF BIRTH, DRIVER'S LICENSE NUMBERMOTION by Plaintiff Meanith Huon to strike reply to response to motion 109 EXHIBIT A OF GAWKER'S REPLY BRIEF FOR DISCLOSING MR. HUON'S SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER, DATE OF BIRTH, DRIVER'S LICENSE NUMBERMOTION by Plaintiff Meanith Huon for sanctions 110 , response to motion,, 114 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Huon, Meanith)
December 29, 2011 114 RESPONSE by Gawker Media to MOTION by Plaintiff Meanith Huon to strike reply to response to motion 109 EXHIBIT A OF GAWKER'S REPLY BRIEF FOR DISCLOSING MR. HUON'S SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER, DATE OF BIRTH, DRIVER'S LICENSE NUMBERMOTION by Plaintiff Meanith Huon to strike reply to response to motion 109 EXHIBIT A OF GAWKER'S REPLY BRIEF FOR DISCLOSING MR. HUON'S SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER, DATE OF BIRTH, DRIVER'S LICENSE NUMBERMOTION by Plaintiff Meanith Huon for sanctions 110 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Letter to Plaintiff, # 2 Exhibit B-Follow Up Letter to PLaintiff, # 3 Exhibit C--Additionally Redacted Exhibit)(Feige, David)
December 29, 2011 113 AMENDED NOTICE of Motion by Meanith Huon for presentment of motion to strike,, motion for sanctions,, motion for relief, 110 before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 1/12/2012 at 10:30 AM. (Huon, Meanith)
December 29, 2011 112 NOTICE of Motion by Meanith Huon for presentment of motion to strike,, motion for sanctions,, motion for relief, 110 before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 1/12/2012 at 10:30 AM. (Huon, Meanith)
December 29, 2011 111 NOTICE of Motion by Meanith Huon for presentment of (Huon, Meanith)
December 29, 2011 110 MOTION by Plaintiff Meanith Huon to strike reply to response to motion 109 EXHIBIT A OF GAWKER'S REPLY BRIEF FOR DISCLOSING MR. HUON'S SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER, DATE OF BIRTH, DRIVER'S LICENSE NUMBER, MOTION by Plaintiff Meanith Huon for sanctions (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Huon, Meanith)
December 29, 2011 109 REPLY by Gawker Media to response in opposition to motion, 96 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A--Huon Criminal Complaint)(Feige, David) (Incorrect pdf document linked as Exhibit A- Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office). (mr, ).
December 20, 2011 108 MINUTE entry before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen:Plaintiff's Motion for leave to file 106 a 27-page sureply brief to all defendants' memorandum and replies, and 28-days to file his 15-page summaries is granted. Plaintiff is to file both his 27-page sur-reply and 15 page summaries by 1/28/12. The status hearing set for 1/26/12 is stricken and reset to 2/23/2012 at The motion hearing set for 12/22/11 is stricken. Judicial staff mailed notice (gl, )
December 19, 2011 107 NOTICE of Motion by Meanith Huon for presentment of motion for leave to file 106 before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 12/22/2011 at 10:30 AM. (Huon, Meanith)
December 19, 2011 106 MOTION by Plaintiff Meanith Huon for leave to file Sur-Replies and Summaries (Huon, Meanith)
December 19, 2011 105 REPLY by Defendants Abovethelaw.com, Breaking Media, Breakingmedia.com, David Lat, John Lerner, David Minkin, Elie Mystal to motion to dismiss 35 - in support of (Mandell, Steven)
December 19, 2011 104 MINUTE entry before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen: Plaintiffs' objection to the Jezebel, defendants corrected motion for extension of time ( 99 ) is overruled. All defendants motion ( 100 ) for extension of time to file a reply brief in support of their motion to dismiss, to and including 12/21/11, is granted. Gawker defendants corrected motion for extension of time to file summary statement and response to plaintiffs response to defendants motion to dismiss, up to and including 12/29/11 is granted. The motion hearing date of 12/20/11 is stricken. The status hearing date of 12/22/11 is stricken and reset to 1/26/12 at 10:30 a.m. Judicial staff mailed notice (gl, )
December 18, 2011 103 OBJECTIONS by Meanith Huon to notice of motion 101 , MOTION by Defendants Abovethelaw.com, Breaking Media, Breakingmedia.com, David Lat, John Lerner, David Minkin, Elie Mystal for extension of time to file Reply Brief 100 (Corrected) (Huon, Meanith)
December 18, 2011 102 OBJECTIONS by Meanith Huon to notice of motion 101 , MOTION by Defendants Abovethelaw.com, Breaking Media, Breakingmedia.com, David Lat, John Lerner, David Minkin, Elie Mystal for extension of time to file Reply Brief 100 (Huon, Meanith)
December 16, 2011 101 NOTICE of Motion by Steven P. Mandell for presentment of extension of time 100 before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 12/20/2011 at 10:30 AM. (Mandell, Steven)
December 16, 2011 100 MOTION by Defendants Abovethelaw.com, Breaking Media, Breakingmedia.com, David Lat, John Lerner, David Minkin, Elie Mystal for extension of time to file Reply Brief (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Mandell, Steven)
December 13, 2011 99 OBJECTIONS by Meanith Huon to MOTION by Defendants Irin Carmon, Gabby Darbyshire, Nick Denton, Gawker Media, Jezebel.com to amend/correct MOTION by Defendants Irin Carmon, Gabby Darbyshire, Nick Denton, Gawker Media, Jezebel.com for extension of time 92 97 , notice of motion 98 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Huon, Meanith)
December 13, 2011 98 Corrected NOTICE of Motion by Daniel Francis Lynch for presentment of motion to amend/correct, motion for relief 97 before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 12/20/2011 at 10:30 AM. (Lynch, Daniel)
December 13, 2011 97 MOTION by Defendants Irin Carmon, Gabby Darbyshire, Nick Denton, Gawker Media, Jezebel.com to amend/correct MOTION by Defendants Irin Carmon, Gabby Darbyshire, Nick Denton, Gawker Media, Jezebel.com for extension of time 92 (Lynch, Daniel)
December 12, 2011 96 RESPONSE by Meanith Huonin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Nick Denton, Gabby Darbyshire, Irin Carmon, Gawker Media, Jezebel.com to dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint 57 AMENDED REPONSE TO MEET THE 15 PAGE LIMITATION PER DECEMBER 5, 2011 COURT ORDER (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G)(Huon, Meanith)
December 12, 2011 95 RESPONSE by Meanith Huonin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants John Lerner, Breaking Media, David Lat, Breakingmedia.com, David Minkin, Abovethelaw.com, Elie Mystal to dismiss pursuant to rule 12(b)(6) 35 SECOND AMENDED RESPONSE TO COMPLY WITH 23PAGE LIMITATION PER DEC 5, 2011 ORDER (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Huon, Meanith)
December 12, 2011 94 OBJECTIONS by Meanith Huon to MOTION by Defendants Irin Carmon, Gabby Darbyshire, Nick Denton, Gawker Media, Jezebel.com for extension of time 92 , notice of motion 93 (Huon, Meanith)
December 12, 2011 93 NOTICE of Motion by Daniel Francis Lynch for presentment of extension of time 92 before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 12/20/2011 at 10:30 AM. (Lynch, Daniel)
December 12, 2011 92 MOTION by Defendants Irin Carmon, Gabby Darbyshire, Nick Denton, Gawker Media, Jezebel.com for extension of time (Lynch, Daniel)
December 12, 2011 91 MEMORANDUM by Abovethelaw.com, Breaking Media, Breakingmedia.com, David Lat, John Lerner, David Minkin, Elie Mystal in support of motion to dismiss 35 Summary of (Corrected) (Mandell, Steven)
December 12, 2011 90 MEMORANDUM by Abovethelaw.com, Breaking Media, Breakingmedia.com, David Lat, John Lerner, David Minkin, Elie Mystal in support of motion to dismiss 35 - Summary of (Mandell, Steven)
December 11, 2011 89 RESPONSE by Meanith Huonin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Nick Denton, Gabby Darbyshire, Irin Carmon, Gawker Media, Jezebel.com to dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint 57 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G)(Huon, Meanith)
December 5, 2011 88 Featured Case ORDER Signed by the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 12/5/2011:Judicial staff mailed notice(gl, )
December 5, 2011 87 MINUTE entry before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen: Plaintiff is granted leave to file a responsive brief of no more than 23 pages to the Above The Law Defendants Motion to Dismiss on or before December 12, 2011 2. As to all Memoranda relating to Above The Law Defendants Motion to Dismiss heretofore filed or scheduled to be filed, all parties shall file on or before December 12, 2011, a summary of no more than 15 pages of their respective Memoranda and a summary of no more than 15 pages of any exhibits to said Memoranda. (For further details, see Order in separate docket entry). The motion hearing set for 12/6/11 is stricken. Judicial staff mailed notice (gl, )
December 2, 2011 86 REPLY by Plaintiff Meanith Huon to memorandum in opposition to motion 85 , motion for leave to file excess pages,,, motion for extension of time to file response/reply,,, motion for relief,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, 80 (Huon, Meanith)
December 2, 2011 85 MEMORANDUM by Gabby Darbyshire, Nick Denton, Gawker Media, Jezebel.com in Opposition to motion for leave to file excess pages,, motion for extension of time to file response/reply,, motion for relief,,, 82 (Feige, David)
December 1, 2011 84 RESPONSE by Meanith Huonin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants John Lerner, Breaking Media, David Lat, Breakingmedia.com, David Minkin, Abovethelaw.com, Elie Mystal to dismiss pursuant to rule 12(b)(6) 35 AMENDED RESPONSE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Huon, Meanith)
November 30, 2011 83 NOTICE of Motion by Meanith Huon for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages,, motion for extension of time to file response/reply,, motion for relief,,, 82 before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 12/6/2011 at 10:30 AM. (Huon, Meanith)
November 30, 2011 82 MOTION by Plaintiff Meanith Huon for leave to file excess pages, MOTION by Plaintiff Meanith Huon for extension of time to file response/reply as to memorandum in support of motion 58 , memorandum in support of motion, 49 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Huon's Response Brief to Above the Law Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit to Huon's Response Brief)(Huon, Meanith)
November 30, 2011 81 NOTICE of Motion by Meanith Huon for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages,,, motion for extension of time to file response/reply,,, motion for relief,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, 80 before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 12/6/2011 at 10:30 AM. (Huon, Meanith)
November 30, 2011 80 MOTION by Plaintiff Meanith Huon for leave to file excess pages, MOTION by Plaintiff Meanith Huon for extension of time to file response/reply as to memorandum in support of motion 58 , memorandum in support of motion, 49 , order on motion to strike,,,,, order on motion to compel,,,,,,,,,, in court hearing,,,,, terminate hearings,,,,, set motion and R&R deadlines/hearings,,,, 74 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Huon's Response Brief to Above the Law Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Huon's Motion)(Huon, Meanith)
November 30, 2011 79 RESPONSE by Meanith Huon to MOTION by Defendants John Lerner, Breaking Media, David Lat, Breakingmedia.com, David Minkin, Abovethelaw.com, Elie Mystal to dismiss pursuant to rule 12(b)(6) 35 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Huon, Meanith)
November 23, 2011 78 EXHIBIT by Defendants Abovethelaw.com, Breaking Media, Breakingmedia.com, David Lat, John Lerner, David Minkin, Elie Mystal B - redacted pursuant to Court order of October 12, 2011 regarding memorandum in support of motion, 49 (Mandell, Steven)
November 2, 2011 77 MINUTE entry before Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: On 10/12/11, the Court entered an order granting Plaintiff's amended motion to strike 50 Exhibit B (a trial transcript) attached to Defendant Abovethelaw.com's Memorandum In Support Of its Motion To Dismiss which, in turn, was attached to Defendant's Motion For Leave To File Brief In Excess of 15 Pages filed on 9/21/11 36 . On 9/26/11, the District Judge granted Defendant's motion for leave to file the oversize memorandum and Defendant filed that memorandum on the same date in accordance with the Court's order with the offending transcript attached 49 . Plaintiff now has brought to the attention of the Court's courtroom deputy that the offending transcript is still on the CM/ECF system as Exhibit 2 to Defendant Abovethelaw.com's Memorandum in Support of its Motion to Dismiss as filed on 9/26/11 49 . Although Plaintiff's amended motion to strike 50 did not reference the offending transcript in Docket Entry 49 as well as Docket Entry 36 , the Court now directs the Clerk to remove from the CM/ECF system Exhibit B to Defendant Abovethelaw.com's Memorandum in Support of its Motion to Dismiss 49 for the same reasons stated in the Court's order of 10/12/11. Mailed notice (ep, )
October 12, 2011 76 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case referred to the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert pursuant to Local Rule 72.1. Signed by Executive Committee on 10/12/11.(psm, )
October 12, 2011 75 MINUTE entry before Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: In addition to the Court's previous order issued on 10/12/11 74 , Plaintiff's Motion to Clarify 59 is treated as moot in light of the briefing schedule entered on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 35 and Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint 57 . Mailed notice (ep, )
October 12, 2011 74 MINUTE entry before Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: Oral argument held on 10/11/11 on pending motions. Plaintiff's Amended Motion to Strike Exhibit B to Defendants' Memorandum 50 is granted to the extent it contains personally identifying information such as names, addresses or social security numbers from people who are not parties to this case. The transcript shall be stricken from the record under Rule 12(f) with leave to refile a redacted transcript. For the reasons stated on the record, Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendants to Produce the Entire Trial Transcript in its Possession 40 is denied without prejudice. The Court sets the following briefing schedule on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 35 and Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint 57 : Plaintiff's response shall be filed on or before 11/30/11. Defendants' replies shall be filed on or before 12/16/11. Plaintiff's Motion to Strike 38 is denied as moot in light of Plaintiff's Amended Motion to Strike 50 . Mailed notice (ep, )
October 12, 2011 73 MINUTE entry before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen: Plaintiff's motion to clarify 59 is referred to Magistrate Judge Gilbert. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Gilbert with authority to set and adjust all briefing schedules on pending motions and to set and adjust page and exhibit limits on pending motions. The pending motions will be decided by Judge Aspen. The motion hearing set for 10/13/11 is stricken. Judicial staff mailed notice (gl, )
October 12, 2011 72 MINUTE entry before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen:Application of David L. Feige to appear pro hac vice 69 is granted. Attorney David L. Feige for Irin Carmon,David L. Feige for Gabby Darbyshire,David L. Feige for Nick Denton,David L. Feige for Gawker Media,David L. Feige for Jezebel.com added. Judicial staff mailed notice (gl, )
October 11, 2011 71 NOTICE by Irin Carmon, Gabby Darbyshire, Nick Denton, Gawker Media, Jezebel.com re attorney appearance 70 (Kaplan, Justin)
October 11, 2011 70 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Irin Carmon, Gabby Darbyshire, Nick Denton, Gawker Media, Jezebel.com by Justin David Kaplan (Kaplan, Justin)
October 11, 2011 69 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6455732. (Feige, David)
October 4, 2011 68 REPLY by Meanith Huon to response to motion, 66 , response to motion 67 (Huon, Meanith)
October 4, 2011 67 RESPONSE by Irin Carmon, Gabby Darbyshire, Nick Denton, Gawker Media, Jezebel.com to MOTION by Plaintiff Meanith Huon to clarify 59 (Giskan, Oren)
October 4, 2011 66 RESPONSE by Irin Carmon, Gabby Darbyshire, Nick Denton, Gawker Media, Jezebel.com to MOTION by Defendants Nick Denton, Gabby Darbyshire, Irin Carmon, Gawker Media, Jezebel.com to dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint 57 (Giskan, Oren)
October 4, 2011 65 AMENDED NOTICE of Motion by Oren S. Giskan for presentment of motion to dismiss 57 before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 10/13/2011 at 10:30 AM. (Giskan, Oren)
October 4, 2011 64 MINUTE entry before Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: At the parties' request, the oral argument set for 10/5/11 at 9:30 a.m. is stricken. Oral argument on both Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Exhibit B 38 and Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendants to Produce the Entire Trial Transcript in its Possession 40 are set for 10/11/11 at 10:30 a.m. Mailed notice (ep, )
October 4, 2011 63 NOTICE of Motion by Oren S. Giskan for presentment of motion to dismiss 57 before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 11/10/2011 at 10:30 AM. (Giskan, Oren)
October 3, 2011 62 MOTION by Defendants Nick Denton, Gabby Darbyshire, Irin Carmon, Gawker Media, Jezebel.com to dismiss Notice of Motion to Dismiss (Giskan, Oren)
October 3, 2011 61 MINUTE entry before Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: This case has been referred to Magistrate Judge Gilbert. Oral argument on both Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Exhibit B 38 and Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendants to Produce the Entire Trial Transcript in its Possession 40 are set for 10/5/11 at 9:30 a.m. If that date or time presents a problem for any of the parties, they shall contact the Court's courtroom deputy to reschedule. Mailed notice (ep, )
September 30, 2011 60 NOTICE of Motion by Meanith Huon for presentment of motion to clarify 59 before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 10/13/2011 at 10:30 AM. (Huon, Meanith) Docket text modified by the Clerk's office on 10/3/2011 (psm, ).
September 30, 2011 59 MOTION by Plaintiff Meanith Huon to clarify (Huon, Meanith)
September 30, 2011 58 MEMORANDUM by Irin Carmon, Gabby Darbyshire, Nick Denton, Gawker Media, Jezebel.com in support of motion to dismiss 57 (Giskan, Oren)
September 30, 2011 57 MOTION by Defendants Nick Denton, Gabby Darbyshire, Irin Carmon, Gawker Media, Jezebel.com to dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint (Giskan, Oren)
September 27, 2011 56 MINUTE entry before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen:Plaintiff's amended Motion to modify briefing schedule regarding defendants' motion to dismiss and to file a responsive brief in excess of 15 pages 52 is granted. Plaintiff is to respond to defendants' motion to dismiss on or before 10/31/11. Defendants to reply by 11/7/11. Plaintiff responsive brief is not to exceed 22 pages. The motion hearing set for 10/4/11 is stricken. Judicial staff mailed notice (gl, )
September 27, 2011 55 NOTICE of Motion by Meanith Huon for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply, motion for leave to file excess pages, motion for relief,,,,,,,,,,, 52 before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 10/4/2011 at 10:30 AM. (Huon, Meanith)
September 26, 2011 54 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case referred to the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert pursuant to Local Rule 72.1. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/26/2011.(psm, )
September 26, 2011 53 NOTICE of Motion by Meanith Huon for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply, motion for leave to file excess pages, motion for relief,,,,,,,,,,, 52 before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 9/4/2012 at 10:30 AM. (Huon, Meanith)
September 26, 2011 52 MOTION by Plaintiff Meanith Huon for extension of time to file response/reply as to motion for extension of time to file response/reply, motion for relief,,,,,,,, 51 , memorandum in support of motion 49 , terminate hearings, motion hearing, set motion and R&R deadlines/hearings,,, 46 , MOTION by Plaintiff Meanith Huon for leave to file excess pages (AMENDED MOTION) (Huon, Meanith)
September 26, 2011 51 MOTION by Plaintiff Meanith Huon for extension of time to file response/reply as to memorandum in support of motion 49 , terminate hearings, motion hearing, set motion and R&R deadlines/hearings,,, 46 Modify Briefing Schedule and to File Response Brief in Excess of 15 Pages (Huon, Meanith)
September 26, 2011 50 MOTION by Plaintiff Meanith Huon to strike 38 Amended (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Huon, Meanith) Docket text modified by the Clerk's office on 9/27/2011 (psm, ).
September 26, 2011 49 MEMORANDUM by Abovethelaw.com, Breaking Media, Breakingmedia.com, David Lat, John Lerner, David Minkin, Elie Mystal in support of motion to dismiss 35 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Mandell, Steven)
September 26, 2011 48 MINUTE entry before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen:Defendnats' Motion for leave to file 44 brief in excess of 15 pages is granted. Th Motions terminated: Judicial staff mailed notice (gl, )
September 26, 2011 47 MINUTE entry before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen:Plaintiff's motion to strike 38 Exhibit B to defendants' memorandum in support of their motion to dismiss and Plaintiff's motion to compel 40 , are referred to Magistrate Judge Gilbert. The motion hearing set for 9/27/11 is stricken. Judicial staff mailed notice (gl, )
September 26, 2011 46 MINUTE entry before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen: Plaintiff is to respond to defendants' motion to dismiss 35 on or before 10/12/2011. Defendants to reply by 10/19/2011. The status hearing set for 10/13/11 is stricken and reset to 12/22/2011 at 10:30 AM. The motion hearing set for 9/27/11 is stricken.Judicial staff mailed notice (gl, )
September 26, 2011 45 MINUTE entry before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen:Defendants' unopposed Motion for leave to file their memorandum in support of their motion to dismiss in excess of 15 pages 36 is granted. The motion hearing set for 9/27/11 is stricken.Judicial staff mailed notice (gl, )
September 23, 2011 44 MOTION by Defendants Irin Carmon, Gabby Darbyshire, Nick Denton, Gawker Media, Jezebel.com for leave to file brief in excess of page limit. (Giskan, Oren)
September 23, 2011 43 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Irin Carmon, Gabby Darbyshire, Nick Denton, Gawker Media, Jezebel.com by Oren S. Giskan (Giskan, Oren)
September 22, 2011 42 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Irin Carmon, Gabby Darbyshire, Nick Denton, Gawker Media, Jezebel.com by Daniel Francis Lynch (Lynch, Daniel)
September 21, 2011 41 NOTICE of Motion by Meanith Huon for presentment of motion to compel 40 before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 9/27/2011 at 10:30 AM. (Huon, Meanith)
September 21, 2011 40 MOTION by Plaintiff Meanith Huon to compel Defendants to Produce Entire Trial Transcript in Its Possession (Huon, Meanith)
September 21, 2011 39 NOTICE of Motion by Meanith Huon for presentment of motion to strike, motion for relief,, 38 before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 9/27/2011 at 10:30 AM. (Huon, Meanith)
September 21, 2011 38 MOTION by Plaintiff Meanith Huon to strike MOTION by Defendants Abovethelaw.com, Breaking Media, Breakingmedia.com, David Lat, John Lerner, David Minkin, Elie Mystal for leave to file excess pages - Unopposed 36 TO STRIKE EXHIBIT B (Huon, Meanith)
September 21, 2011 37 NOTICE of Motion by Steven P. Mandell for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages, 36 , motion to dismiss 35 before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 9/27/2011 at 10:30 AM. (Mandell, Steven)
September 21, 2011 36 MOTION by Defendants Abovethelaw.com, Breaking Media, Breakingmedia.com, David Lat, John Lerner, David Minkin, Elie Mystal for leave to file excess pages - Unopposed (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Memo iso mtd), # 2 Exhibit A to Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit B to Exhibit 1)(Mandell, Steven)
September 21, 2011 35 MOTION by Defendants John Lerner, Breaking Media, David Lat, Breakingmedia.com, David Minkin, Abovethelaw.com, Elie Mystal to dismiss pursuant to rule 12(b)(6) (Mandell, Steven)
August 24, 2011 34 INITIAL JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN STATEMENT by Meanith Huon (Huon, Meanith)
August 23, 2011 33 MINUTE entry before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen:Defendants' unopposed Motion for extension of time 31 to respond to second amended complaint, up to and including 9/21/11, is granted. Motion terminated. The Status hearing set 8/25/11 is stricken and reset to 10/13/2011 at 10:30 AM. The motion hearing set for 8/25/11 is stricken. Judicial staff mailed notice (gl, )
August 22, 2011 32 NOTICE of Motion by Steven P. Mandell for presentment of extension of time 31 before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 8/25/2011 at 10:30 AM. (Mandell, Steven)
August 22, 2011 31 MOTION by Defendants Abovethelaw.com, Breaking Media, Breakingmedia.com, David Lat, John Lerner, David Minkin, Elie Mystal for extension of time to respond to Second Amended Complaint - Unopposed (Mandell, Steven)
July 29, 2011 30 MINUTE entry before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen:Defendants' unoppsed Motion for extension of time 26 to respond to second amended complaint, to 8/22/11, is granted. Motion terminated. The status hearing set for 8/25/11 to stand. The motion hearing set for 8/2/11 is stricken. 26 Judicial staff mailed notice (gl, )
July 29, 2011 29 NOTICE by Sharon Renae Albrecht of Change of Address (Albrecht, Sharon)
July 28, 2011 28 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 06/23/11 before the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen. Court Reporter Contact Information: Mary M. Hacker (312) 435-5564, Mary_Hacker@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 8/18/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/29/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/26/2011. (Hacker, Mary)
July 27, 2011 27 NOTICE of Motion by Steven P. Mandell for presentment of extension of time 26 before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 8/2/2011 at 10:30 AM. (Mandell, Steven)
July 27, 2011 26 MOTION by Defendants Abovethelaw.com, Breaking Media, Breakingmedia.com, David Lat, John Lerner, David Minkin, Elie Mystal for extension of time to respond to second amended complaint - Unopposed (Mandell, Steven)
July 22, 2011 25 EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Meanith Huon H, K, M regarding amended complaint, 22 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit H, # 2 Exhibit K, # 3 Exhibit M)(Huon, Meanith)
July 22, 2011 24 EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Meanith Huon E through G regarding amended complaint, 22 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit E, # 2 Exhibit F, # 3 Exhibit G)(Huon, Meanith)
July 22, 2011 23 EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Meanith Huon A through E regarding amended complaint, 22 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Huon, Meanith)
July 21, 2011 22 SECOND AMENDED complaint by Meanith Huon against Abovethelaw.com, Breaking Media, Breakingmedia.com, Irin Carmon, Gabby Darbyshire, Nick Denton, Gawker Media, Jezebel.com, John Doe No. 201, John Doe No.s 401, 402, 403, John Doe Nos. 101 to 200, John Does 1 to 100, David Lat, Lawyergossip.com, John Lerner, David Minkin, Elie Mystal, newnation.org.(psm, )
July 21, 2011 21 MINUTE entry before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen:Plaintiff's Motion for leave to file second amended complaint 19 is granted. Motion terminated. Defendants, Beth Hundsdorfer, John Doe No. 301, John Doe Nos. 501 to 600, Steve Korris, Madison Record, Holly Meyer, Sanford Schmidt, The Alton Telegraph, Brian Timpone, Jim shrader, Belleville News-Democrat and Steve Gonzalez are dismissed without prejudice and are terminated. The case continues as to the remaining defendants. The status hearing set for 8/25/11 at 10:30 a.m. to stand. The motion hearing set for 7/28/11 is stricken. Judicial staff mailed notice (gl, )
July 13, 2011 20 NOTICE of Motion by Meanith Huon for presentment of motion to amend/correct, motion for relief 19 before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 7/28/2011 at 10:30 AM. (Huon, Meanith)
July 13, 2011 19 MOTION by Plaintiff Meanith Huon to amend/correct amended complaint 12 and file Second Amended Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Second Amended Complaint)(Huon, Meanith)
July 11, 2011 18 EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Meanith Huon Exhibit P3 regarding amended complaint 12 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit P3)(Huon, Meanith)
July 11, 2011 17 EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Meanith Huon Exhibit P2 regarding amended complaint 12 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit P2)(Huon, Meanith)
July 11, 2011 16 EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Meanith Huon Exhibit P1 regarding amended complaint 12 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit P1)(Huon, Meanith)
July 11, 2011 15 EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Meanith Huon N, O, and Q1 throough Q5 regarding amended complaint 12 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit N, # 2 Exhibit O, # 3 Exhibit Q1, # 4 Exhibit Q2, # 5 Exhibit Q3, # 6 Exhibit Q4, # 7 Exhibit Q5)(Huon, Meanith)
July 11, 2011 14 EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Meanith Huon Exhibits G through M regarding amended complaint 12 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit G, # 2 Exhibit H, # 3 Exhibit I, # 4 Exhibit J, # 5 Exhibit K, # 6 Exhibit L, # 7 Exhibit M)(Huon, Meanith)
July 11, 2011 13 EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Meanith Huon Exhibits A through F regarding amended complaint 12 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Huon, Meanith)
July 11, 2011 12 FIRST AMENDED complaint by Meanith Huon against All Defendants (Huon, Meanith)
June 23, 2011 11 MINUTE entry before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen:Status hearing held on 6/23/2011, and continued to 8/25/2011 at 10:30 AM. Plaintiff is grantd leave to file amended complaint. Defendant(s) is to respond to the amended complaint by 8/1/11. Parties are to meet and hold a discovery conference and file with the Court a joint discovery plan, with a courtesy copy to Chambers, Room 2578, two days in advance of the status hearing. Judicial staff mailed notice (gl, )
June 15, 2011 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Abovethelaw.com, Breaking Media, Breakingmedia.com, David Lat, John Lerner, David Minkin, Elie Mystal by Steven P. Mandell (Mandell, Steven)
June 15, 2011 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Abovethelaw.com, Breaking Media, Breakingmedia.com, David Lat, John Lerner, David Minkin, Elie Mystal by Steven L. Baron (Baron, Steven)
June 15, 2011 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Abovethelaw.com, Breaking Media, Breakingmedia.com, David Lat, John Lerner, David Minkin, Elie Mystal by Sharon Renae Albrecht (Albrecht, Sharon)
May 13, 2011 7 MINUTE entry before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen: Status hearing set for 6/23/2011 at 10:30 AM., in Courtroom 2525. The plaintiff is to notify the defendants of status date.judicial staff mailed notice (gl, ) .
May 12, 2011 6 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Abovethelaw.com, Breaking Media, Breakingmedia.com, John Does 1 to 100, David Lat, John Lerner, David Minkin, Elie Mystal. (psm, )
May 9, 2011 5 EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Meanith Huon regarding complaint 1 (Huon, Meanith)
May 9, 2011 4 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Huon, Meanith)
May 9, 2011 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. (mh, )
May 6, 2011 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Meanith Huon by Meanith Huon (Huon, Meanith)
May 6, 2011 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Huon, Meanith)
May 6, 2011 1 COMPLAINT filed by Meanith Huon; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0752-5978416. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits)(Huon, Meanith)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huon v. Breaking Media et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meanith Huon
Represented By: Meanith Huon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Breaking Media
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Breakingmedia.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abovethelaw.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elie Mystal
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Lat
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Lerner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Minkin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1 to 100
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]