Committee For A Fair And Balanced Map et al v. Illinois State Board of Elections et al

Plaintiff: Michelle Caballero, Edmund Brezinski, Laura Waxweiler, Committee For A Fair And Balanced Map, Judy Biggert, Robert J Dold, Randy Hultgren, Adam Kinzinger, Donald Manzullo, Peter J Roskam, Bobby Schilling, Aaron Schock, John M Shimkus, Joe Walsh, Ralph Rangel, Lou Sandoval and Luis Sanabria
Defendant: Illinois State Board of Elections, William M McGuffage, Jesse R. Smart, Bryan A. Schneider, Betty J. Coffrin, Harold D. Byers, Judith C Rice, Charles W. Scholz and Ernest L Gowen
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv05065
Filed: July 27, 2011
 
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
0 Judge: Joan H. Lefkow
1 Judge: Robert L. Miller
2 Judge: John Daniel Tinder
 
Nature of Suit: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
December 15, 2011 150 Featured Case OPINION and ORDER Signed by the Honorable John Daniel Tinder, Robert L. Miller, Jr. and Joan H. Lefkow on 12/15/2011. Mailed notice by judge's staff. (srb,)
October 12, 2011 77 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER Signed by the Honorable John Daniel Tinder, the Honorable Robert L. Miller and the Honorable Joan Humphrey Lefkow on 10/12/2011:Mailed notice(mad, )
November 1, 2011 98 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER Signed by the Honorable John Daniel Tinder, the Honorable Robert L. Miller, Jr., and the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 11/1/2011:Mailed notice(mad, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Committee For A Fair And Balanced Map et al v. Illinois State Board of Elections et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Caballero
Represented By: Dana S Douglas
Represented By: Tyrone C. Fahner
Represented By: John Albert Janicik
Represented By: Lori E. Lightfoot
Represented By: Thomas Vangel Panoff
Represented By: Joshua D Yount
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edmund Brezinski
Represented By: Dana S Douglas
Represented By: Tyrone C. Fahner
Represented By: John Albert Janicik
Represented By: Lori E. Lightfoot
Represented By: Thomas Vangel Panoff
Represented By: Joshua D Yount
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Waxweiler
Represented By: Dana S Douglas
Represented By: Tyrone C. Fahner
Represented By: John Albert Janicik
Represented By: Lori E. Lightfoot
Represented By: Thomas Vangel Panoff
Represented By: Joshua D Yount
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Committee For A Fair And Balanced Map
Represented By: Joshua D Yount
Represented By: Thomas Vangel Panoff
Represented By: Lori E. Lightfoot
Represented By: John Albert Janicik
Represented By: Tyrone C. Fahner
Represented By: Dana S Douglas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Biggert
Represented By: Joshua D Yount
Represented By: Thomas Vangel Panoff
Represented By: Lori E. Lightfoot
Represented By: John Albert Janicik
Represented By: Tyrone C. Fahner
Represented By: Dana S Douglas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert J Dold
Represented By: Joshua D Yount
Represented By: Thomas Vangel Panoff
Represented By: Lori E. Lightfoot
Represented By: John Albert Janicik
Represented By: Tyrone C. Fahner
Represented By: Dana S Douglas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Hultgren
Represented By: Thomas Vangel Panoff
Represented By: Lori E. Lightfoot
Represented By: John Albert Janicik
Represented By: Tyrone C. Fahner
Represented By: Dana S Douglas
Represented By: Joshua D Yount
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Kinzinger
Represented By: Dana S Douglas
Represented By: Tyrone C. Fahner
Represented By: John Albert Janicik
Represented By: Lori E. Lightfoot
Represented By: Thomas Vangel Panoff
Represented By: Joshua D Yount
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Manzullo
Represented By: Dana S Douglas
Represented By: Tyrone C. Fahner
Represented By: John Albert Janicik
Represented By: Lori E. Lightfoot
Represented By: Thomas Vangel Panoff
Represented By: Joshua D Yount
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter J Roskam
Represented By: Dana S Douglas
Represented By: Tyrone C. Fahner
Represented By: John Albert Janicik
Represented By: Lori E. Lightfoot
Represented By: Thomas Vangel Panoff
Represented By: Joshua D Yount
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Schilling
Represented By: Dana S Douglas
Represented By: Tyrone C. Fahner
Represented By: John Albert Janicik
Represented By: Lori E. Lightfoot
Represented By: Thomas Vangel Panoff
Represented By: Joshua D Yount
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Schock
Represented By: Dana S Douglas
Represented By: Tyrone C. Fahner
Represented By: John Albert Janicik
Represented By: Lori E. Lightfoot
Represented By: Thomas Vangel Panoff
Represented By: Joshua D Yount
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John M Shimkus
Represented By: Dana S Douglas
Represented By: Tyrone C. Fahner
Represented By: John Albert Janicik
Represented By: Lori E. Lightfoot
Represented By: Thomas Vangel Panoff
Represented By: Joshua D Yount
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Walsh
Represented By: Dana S Douglas
Represented By: Tyrone C. Fahner
Represented By: John Albert Janicik
Represented By: Lori E. Lightfoot
Represented By: Thomas Vangel Panoff
Represented By: Joshua D Yount
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph Rangel
Represented By: Dana S Douglas
Represented By: Tyrone C. Fahner
Represented By: John Albert Janicik
Represented By: Lori E. Lightfoot
Represented By: Thomas Vangel Panoff
Represented By: Joshua D Yount
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lou Sandoval
Represented By: Dana S Douglas
Represented By: Tyrone C. Fahner
Represented By: John Albert Janicik
Represented By: Lori E. Lightfoot
Represented By: Thomas Vangel Panoff
Represented By: Joshua D Yount
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Sanabria
Represented By: Dana S Douglas
Represented By: Tyrone C. Fahner
Represented By: John Albert Janicik
Represented By: Lori E. Lightfoot
Represented By: Thomas Vangel Panoff
Represented By: Joshua D Yount
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illinois State Board of Elections
Represented By: Carl Thomas Bergetz
Represented By: Jonathan A. Rosenblatt
Represented By: Brent Douglas Stratton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William M McGuffage
Represented By: Carl Thomas Bergetz
Represented By: Jonathan A. Rosenblatt
Represented By: Brent Douglas Stratton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesse R. Smart
Represented By: Carl Thomas Bergetz
Represented By: Jonathan A. Rosenblatt
Represented By: Brent Douglas Stratton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan A. Schneider
Represented By: Carl Thomas Bergetz
Represented By: Jonathan A. Rosenblatt
Represented By: Brent Douglas Stratton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betty J. Coffrin
Represented By: Carl Thomas Bergetz
Represented By: Jonathan A. Rosenblatt
Represented By: Brent Douglas Stratton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold D. Byers
Represented By: Carl Thomas Bergetz
Represented By: Jonathan A. Rosenblatt
Represented By: Brent Douglas Stratton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judith C Rice
Represented By: Carl Thomas Bergetz
Represented By: Jonathan A. Rosenblatt
Represented By: Brent Douglas Stratton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles W. Scholz
Represented By: Carl Thomas Bergetz
Represented By: Jonathan A. Rosenblatt
Represented By: Brent Douglas Stratton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernest L Gowen
Represented By: Carl Thomas Bergetz
Represented By: Jonathan A. Rosenblatt
Represented By: Brent Douglas Stratton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]