Braddock v. Jolie et al Featured Case

Defendant: FilmDistrict, Scout Film, Edin Sarkic, Angelina Jolie and GK Films
Plaintiff: James J Braddock
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv08597
Filed: December 2, 2011
 
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Robert M. Dow
 
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 10, 2012 ELECTRONIC Acknowledgment of case transferred to the United States District Court, Central District of California as case 2:12-cv-05883, filed 07/09/2012. (lcw, )
July 3, 2012 50 TRANSFERRED electronically the complete file record to the Central District of California. (jmp, )
June 15, 2012 49 ENTER MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 6/15/2012: Mailed notice (jmp, )
June 15, 2012 48 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Pursuant to Memorandum Opinion and Order, dated 6/15/2012, the Court grants Defendant Film District's motion to transfer venue to the Central District of California 35 . The Clerk is directed to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California. The Court denies as moot Defendant Jolie's motion to dismiss 38 and Defendant GK Films' motion to dismiss 41 . Civil case terminated. [For further detail see separate order(s).] Mailed notice (jmp, )
April 19, 2012 47 REPLY by FilmDistrict, GK Films, Angelina Jolie to response in opposition to motion,, 45 to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction and/or improper venue or, in the alternative, transfer under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - March 14, 2012 Transcript of Proceedings before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr.)(Achterhof, Kristin)
April 6, 2012 46 NOTICE by James J Braddock re response in opposition to motion,, 45 (Saindon, Kelly)
April 6, 2012 45 RESPONSE by James J Braddockin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant GK Films to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction (personal) and/or improper venue or, in the alternative, transfer under 28 U.S.C § 1404(a) 41 , MOTION by Defendant Angelina Jolie to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction (personal) and/or improper venue or, in the alternative, transfer under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) 38 , MOTION by Defendant FilmDistrict to transfer case to the Central District of California pursuant to 28 U.S.C.§ 1404(a) 35 (Saindon, Kelly)
March 14, 2012 44 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Motion to transfer case 35 , Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction 38 and Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction 41 are taken under advisement; Plaintiff's Responses due by 4/5/2012 ; Defendants' Replies due by 4/19/2012. Initial status hearing date of 3/20/2012 is stricken. Filing of joint status report is vacated. Mailed notice (tbk, )
March 6, 2012 43 MEMORANDUM by GK Films in support of motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction 41 (Achterhof, Kristin)
March 6, 2012 42 NOTICE of Motion by Kristin Joy Achterhof for presentment of motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction 41 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 3/14/2012 at 09:15 AM. (Achterhof, Kristin)
March 6, 2012 41 MOTION by Defendant GK Films to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction (personal) and/or improper venue or, in the alternative, transfer under 28 U.S.C § 1404(a) (Achterhof, Kristin)
March 6, 2012 40 MEMORANDUM by Angelina Jolie in support of motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction 38 (Achterhof, Kristin)
March 6, 2012 39 NOTICE of Motion by Kristin Joy Achterhof for presentment of motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction 38 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 3/14/2012 at 09:15 AM. (Achterhof, Kristin)
March 6, 2012 38 MOTION by Defendant Angelina Jolie to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction (personal) and/or improper venue or, in the alternative, transfer under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) (Achterhof, Kristin)
March 6, 2012 37 MEMORANDUM by FilmDistrict in support of motion to transfer case 35 (Achterhof, Kristin)
March 6, 2012 36 NOTICE of Motion by Kristin Joy Achterhof for presentment of motion to transfer case 35 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 3/14/2012 at 09:15 AM. (Achterhof, Kristin)
March 6, 2012 35 MOTION by Defendant FilmDistrict to transfer case to the Central District of California pursuant to 28 U.S.C.§ 1404(a) (Achterhof, Kristin)
March 6, 2012 34 DECLARATION of Adrian Alperovich in Support of Filmdistrict Distribution, LLC's Motion to Transfer Venue to the Central District of California (Achterhof, Kristin)
March 6, 2012 33 DECLARATION of Angelina Jolie in Support of Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Transfer (Achterhof, Kristin)
March 6, 2012 32 DECLARATION of Julie Roach in Support of GK Films, LLC's Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Transfer (Achterhof, Kristin)
March 5, 2012 31 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Initial Status hearing is set for March 20, 2012 at 10:00 a.m. and parties are to report the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to get the case ready for trial. Plaintiff is to advise all other parties of the courts action herein. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. Parties to prepare and submit a joint status report on or before March 15, 2012. (See Judges web page for status report) Mailed notice (tbk, )
February 29, 2012 30 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 12-9-11 before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Court Reporter Contact Information: Lois A. LaCorte, lois_lacorte@ilnd.uscourts.gov, (312) 435-5558. <P>IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings.</P> Redaction Request due 3/21/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/2/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/29/2012. (LaCorte, Lois)
February 3, 2012 29 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: MOTION by Defendants Film District, GK Films, Angelina Jolie for extension of time 27 to Respond to Complaint, to and including 3/6/2012, is granted. Notice of Motion date of 2/7/2012 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. Mailed notice (tbk, )
February 1, 2012 28 NOTICE of Motion by Kristin Joy Achterhof for presentment of extension of time 27 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 2/7/2012 at 09:15 AM. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Achterhof, Kristin)
February 1, 2012 27 MOTION by Defendants FilmDistrict, GK Films, Angelina Jolie for extension of time (UNOPPOSED) to Respond to Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Achterhof, Kristin)
February 1, 2012 26 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Angelina Jolie by Cathay Y.N. Smith (Smith, Cathay)
February 1, 2012 25 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant GK Films by Cathay Y.N. Smith (Smith, Cathay)
February 1, 2012 24 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant GK Films by Kristin Joy Achterhof (Achterhof, Kristin)
February 1, 2012 23 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Angelina Jolie by Kristin Joy Achterhof (Achterhof, Kristin)
February 1, 2012 22 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant GK Films by Floyd A. Mandell (Mandell, Floyd)
February 1, 2012 21 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Angelina Jolie by Floyd A. Mandell (Mandell, Floyd)
January 11, 2012 20 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Motion by Belongia, counsel for plaintiff James J. Braddock, to withdraw as attorney 16 is granted. Notice of motion date of 1/12/2012 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date; Attorney Mark D Belongia terminated. Mailed notice (jmp, )
January 11, 2012 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by James J Braddock. FilmDistrict waiver sent on 12/8/2011, answer due 2/6/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Filing Notice of Filing and Certificate of Service)(Belongia, Mark) (Docket Text modified by Clerk's Office) (jmp, ).
January 11, 2012 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by James J Braddock. GK Films waiver sent on 12/8/2011, answer due 2/6/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Filing Notice of filing and Certificate of Service)(Belongia, Mark) (Docket Text modified by Clerk's Office) (jmp, ).
January 6, 2012 17 NOTICE of Motion by Mark D Belongia for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney 16 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 1/12/2012 at 09:15 AM. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Belongia, Mark)
January 6, 2012 16 MOTION by counsel for Plaintiff James J Braddock to withdraw as attorney (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Belongia, Mark)
December 13, 2011 15 Brief by James J Braddock Plaintiff's Brief in Support of Retaining This Matter in The Northern District of Illinois (Saindon, Kelly)
December 12, 2011 14 REQUEST for Waiver of Service sent to Angelina Jolie, c/o Robert Offer on December 12, 2011 by Plaintiff James J Braddock., CERTIFICATE of Service by Plaintiff James J Braddock Waiver of service due by 1/11/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Saindon, Kelly)
December 9, 2011 13 WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 12/9/2011: Plaintiffs oral motion to withdraw his ex parte verified motion for a temporary restraining order and/or preliminary injunction is granted. The ex parte TRO motion 5 is withdrawn. In addition, if Plaintiff wishes to proceed with his lawsuit in this jurisdiction, the Court directs Plaintiff (and invites any Defendant who is served with the complaint) to submit a brief by 12/13/2011 addressing the issues relating to personal jurisdiction, venue, and forum set forth below. Mailed notice(tbk, )
December 9, 2011 12 OBJECTIONS by FilmDistrict to notice of motion, 6 (Preliminary) (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Kristin J. Achterhof, # 2 Declaration of Robert Berney)(Achterhof, Kristin)
December 9, 2011 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant FilmDistrict by Cathay Y.N. Smith (Smith, Cathay)
December 9, 2011 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant FilmDistrict by Kristin Joy Achterhof (Achterhof, Kristin)
December 9, 2011 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant FilmDistrict by Floyd A. Mandell (Mandell, Floyd)
December 8, 2011 8 REQUEST for Waiver of Service sent to GK Films, LLC c/o Registered Agent, Julie Roach on 12/8/11 by Plaintiff James J Braddock., CERTIFICATE of Service by Plaintiff James J Braddock Waiver of service due by 1/9/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Saindon, Kelly)
December 8, 2011 7 REQUEST for Waiver of Service sent to Filmdistrict, c/o Registered Agent CT Corporation System on 12/8/11 by Plaintiff James J Braddock., CERTIFICATE of Service by Plaintiff James J Braddock Waiver of service due by 1/9/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Saindon, Kelly)
December 6, 2011 6 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Verified Motion For A Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction NOTICE of Motion by Kelly A Saindon for presentment of motion for temporary restraining order 5 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 12/9/2011 at 10:00 AM. (Saindon, Kelly)
December 6, 2011 5 MOTION by Plaintiff James J Braddock for temporary restraining order Plaintiff's Ex Parte Verified Motion For A Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Saindon, Kelly)
December 5, 2011 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. (nsf, )
December 2, 2011 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff James J Braddock by Mark D Belongia (Belongia, Mark)
December 2, 2011 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff James J Braddock by Kelly A Saindon (Saindon, Kelly)
December 2, 2011 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Saindon, Kelly)
December 2, 2011 1 COMPLAINT filed by James J Braddock; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0752-6623890.(Saindon, Kelly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Braddock v. Jolie et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FilmDistrict
Represented By: Kristin Joy Achterhof
Represented By: Floyd A. Mandell
Represented By: Cathay Y.N. Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scout Film
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edin Sarkic
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angelina Jolie
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GK Films
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James J Braddock
Represented By: Kelly A Saindon
Represented By: Mark D Belongia
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]