Dernis v. Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, as Receiver for Premier Bank et al Featured Case

Defendant: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, as Receiver for Premier Bank, Dr. Zulfikar Esmail, Shamim Esmail, Aliya Hussaini, Aliya Hussaini 2006 Irrevocable Trust, Kassim Esmail, Kassim Esmail 2006 Irrevocable Trust, Amyna Esmail and Amyna Esmail 2006 Irrevocable Trust
Plaintiff: George D. Dernis
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv02856
Filed: April 17, 2012
 
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Gary Feinerman
 
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 12:1819
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 3, 2013 61 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held. Plaintiff's unopposed oral motion to voluntarily dismiss this case without prejudice is granted. All pending motions are denied as moot. This case is dismissed without prejudice. Civil case closed.Mailed notice. (jlj)
December 2, 2013 60 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Status hearing set for 12/3/2013 at 9:00 a.m. 59 is re-set for 9:15 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj)
September 19, 2013 59 MINUTE entry before Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held and continued to 12/3/2013 at 9:00 a.m. The Trustee from Plaintiff Dernis's bankruptcy case appeared. The Trustee will decide by 12/3/2013 whether he intends to pursue this litigation.Mailed notice. (jlj)
September 18, 2013 58 MINUTE entry before Honorable Gary Feinerman:Hearing on Esmails' motion to dismiss 49 and status hearing scheduled for 9/19/2013 54 and 57 at 9:00 a.m. are re-set for 9:30 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
August 12, 2013 57 MINUTE entry before Honorable Gary Feinerman:Hearing on Esmails' motion to dismiss 56 scheduled for 8/15/2013 is stricken and re-set for 9/19/2013 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed/Telephoned notice. (jlj)
July 31, 2013 56 MINUTE entry before Honorable Gary Feinerman:Hearing on Esmails' motion to dismiss 49 scheduled for 8/8/2013 51 is stricken and re-set for 8/15/2013 at 9:00 a.m. Status hearing set for 9/19/2013 54 at 9:00 a.m. shall stand.Mailed notice. (jlj)
July 19, 2013 55 ATTORNEY Appearance for Trustee David P. Leibowitz by David Perry Leibowitz (Leibowitz, David)
July 3, 2013 54 MINUTE entry before Honorable Gary Feinerman: Status hearing held and continued to 9/19/2013 at 9:00 a.m. The Trustee from Dernis's Chapter 7 case appeared. The briefing, discovery, and dispositive motion schedule set on 6/6/2013 48 is vacated. Status hearing set for 8/8/2013 at 9:00 a.m. is stricken. Mailed notice (lcw, )
July 1, 2013 53 SUGGESTION of Bankruptcy by George D. Dernis (Vail, Andrew) (Docket text modified by Clerks Office Staff)
July 1, 2013 52 MINUTE entry before Honorable Gary Feinerman: Status hearing set for 7/3/2013 at 9:00 a.m. as to Mr. Dernis bankruptcy proceedings.Mailed/Telephoned notice. (jlj)
June 7, 2013 51 NOTICE of Motion by Robert F. Coleman for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim 49 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 8/8/2013 at 09:00 AM. (Coleman, Robert)
June 7, 2013 50 MEMORANDUM by Dr. Zulfikar Esmail, Shamim Esmail in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim 49 (Coleman, Robert)
June 7, 2013 49 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Coleman, Robert)
June 6, 2013 48 MINUTE entry before Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held and continued to 8/8/2013 at 9:00 a.m. Defendant FDIC's Rule 12(e) motion 44 is entered and continued. Response due by 7/9/2013; reply due by 7/23/2013. The Esmail Defendants shall file their motion to dismiss by 6/7/2013; response due by 7/9/2013; reply due by 7/23/2013. Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures shall be served by 7/18/2013. Initial written discovery request shall be served by 9/6/2013. Fact discovery shall close 1/15/2014. Rule 26(a)(2) disclosures shall be served by 12/2/2013. Expert depositions shall be completed by 2/14/2014. Parties shall move to amend pleadings and add new parties by 12/5/2013. Dispositive motions shall be filed by 3/28/2014.Mailed notice. (jlj)
June 3, 2013 47 STATUS Report / Joint Initial Status Report by George D. Dernis, Dr. Zulfikar Esmail, Shamim Esmail, Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, as Receiver for Premier Bank (Vail, Andrew)
June 3, 2013 46 MINUTE entry before Honorable Gary Feinerman:Esmails' unopposed motion for extension of time to answer 42 is granted. The time for Defendants Zulfikar and Shamim Esmail to answer or otherwise plead to the complaint is extended to 6/7/2013. Motion hearing scheduled for 6/5/2013 43 is stricken.Mailed notice. (jlj)
May 31, 2013 45 NOTICE of Motion by Andrew J Abrams for presentment of motion for more definite statement 44 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 6/6/2013 at 09:30 AM. (Abrams, Andrew)
May 31, 2013 44 MOTION by Defendant Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, as Receiver for Premier Bankfor more definite statement (Abrams, Andrew)
May 31, 2013 43 NOTICE of Motion by Robert F. Coleman for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer 42 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 6/5/2013 at 09:00 AM. (Coleman, Robert)
May 31, 2013 42 MOTION by Defendants Dr. Zulfikar Esmail, Shamim Esmail for extension of time to file answer ESMAILS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD to complaint (Coleman, Robert)
May 9, 2013 41 NOTICE of Correction regarding Document Number 31 . (meg, )
April 25, 2013 40 MINUTE entry before Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion to withdraw as attorney 38 is granted. Attorney Vilia Margaret Dedinas terminated as counsel for defendant Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. Motion hearing scheduled for 5/2/2013 39 is stricken.Mailed notice. (jlj)
April 25, 2013 39 NOTICE of Motion by Vilia Margaret Dedinas for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney 38 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 5/2/2013 at 09:00 AM. (Dedinas, Vilia)
April 25, 2013 38 MOTION by counsel for Defendant Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, as Receiver for Premier Bank to withdraw as attorney (Dedinas, Vilia)
April 24, 2013 37 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, as Receiver for Premier Bank by Max A Stein (Stein, Max)
April 22, 2013 36 MINUTE entry before Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held and continued to 6/6/2013 at 9:30 a.m. Defendants shall answer or otherwise plead to the complaint by 5/31/2013. Parties shall file a joint status report by 6/3/2013.Mailed notice. (jlj)
April 19, 2013 35 MINUTE entry before Honorable Gary Feinerman: Status hearing set for 4/22/2013 33 at 9:30 a.m. is re-set for 9:15 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj)
March 21, 2013 34 REQUEST for Clerk of Court to refund filing fee in the amount of 350.00, receipt no. 256D4501, regarding notice of removal,, 3 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Abrams, Andrew)
March 13, 2013 33 MINUTE entry before Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held and continued to 4/22/2013 at 9:30 a.m. By agreement of the parties, the stay of this matter is extended to 4/22/2013. The deadline for Defendants to answer or otherwise plead to the complaint will be re-set at the status hearing on 4/22/2013.Mailed notice. (jlj)
February 11, 2013 32 MINUTE entry before Honorable Gary Feinerman:By agreement of the parties, status hearing scheduled for 2/12/2013 31 is stricken and re-set for 3/13/2013 at 9:30 a.m. due to settlement discussions. By agreement of the parties, the stay of this matter is extended to 3/13/2013. The deadline for Defendants to answer or otherwise plead to the complaint will be re-set at the status hearing on 3/13/2013.Mailed/Telephoned notice. (jlj )
January 8, 2013 31 MINUTE entry before Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held and continued to 2/12/2013 at 9:00 a.m. By agreement of the parties, the stay of this matter is extended to 2/12/2013. The deadline for Defendants to answer or otherwise plead to the complaint will be re-set at the status hearing on 2/12/2013.Mailed notice. (jlj) Modified on 5/9/2013 (meg, ).
September 11, 2012 30 MINUTE entry before Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held and continued to 1/8/2013 at 9:30 a.m. Motion to lift stay order 24 is denied as moot. By agreement of the parties, the stay of this matter is extended to 12/24/2012. The deadline for Defendants to answer or otherwise plead to the complaint will be re-set at the status hearing on 1/8/2013.Mailed notice. (jlj)
August 16, 2012 29 MINUTE entry before Honorable Gary Feinerman: By agreement of the parties, status hearing set for 8/21/2012 is stricken and re-set to 9/11/2012 at 9:00 A.M. Mailed notice by judge's staff. (srb,)
July 31, 2012 28 MINUTE entry before Honorable Gary Feinerman:Plaintiff having filed a notice of voluntary dismissal of Defendants Aliya Hussaini, Aliya Hussaini 2006 Irrevocable Trust,Kassim Esmail, Kassim Esmail 2006 Irrevocable Trust, Amyna Esmail, Amyna Esmail 2006 Irrevocable Trust 27 , the Clerk is requested to terminate them as party defendants.Mailed notice. (jlj)
July 30, 2012 27 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by George D. Dernis with Prejudice of Defendants Aliya Hussaini, Aliya Hussaini 2006 Irrevocable Trust, Kassim Esmail, Kassim Esmail 2006 Irrevocable Trust, Amyna Esmail, Amyna Esmail 2006 Irrevocable Trust (Vail, Andrew) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office.)
July 2, 2012 26 MINUTE entry before Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion to lift stay order 24 is entered and continued. Plaintiff shall respond to motion to lift stay by 8/2/2012; reply due by 8/9/2012. Motion hearing scheduled for 7/2/2012 25 is stricken.Mailed notice. (jlj)
June 20, 2012 25 NOTICE of Motion by Robert Ronald Tepper for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief 24 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 7/2/2012 at 09:00 AM. (Tepper, Robert)
June 20, 2012 24 MOTION by Defendants Amyna Esmail, Kassim Esmail, Amyna Esmail 2006 Irrevocable Trust, Kassim Esmail 2006 Irrevocable Trust, Aliya Hussaini, Aliya Hussaini 2006 Irrevocable Trustto lift stay (Tepper, Robert)
May 15, 2012 23 STAY ORDER Signed by the Honorable Gary Feinerman on 5/15/2012.Mailed notice.(jlj)
May 15, 2012 22 MINUTE entry before Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion hearing held. For the reasons stated in open court, Defendant FDIC's motion to stay proceedings pending exhaustion of statutorily mandated administrative remedies 10 is granted. Enter stay order. Pursuant to the stay order, this matter is stayed through 8/13/2012. The deadline for Defendants to answer or otherwise plead to the complaint is vacated and will be reset at the status hearing on 8/21/2012 at 9:00 a.m. For the reasons stated in open court, Defendant FDIC's motion for reassignment based on relatedeness 19 is granted. Case No. 12 C 3100, FDIC, as Receiver for Premier Bank vs. Dernis (Lindberg, J.), and Case No. 12 C 3379, FDIC, as Receiver for Premier Bank vs. Dernis (Conlon, J.) will be forwarded to the Executive Committee for reassignment based on relatedness to Case No. 12 C 2856, Dernis vs. FDIC, as Receiver for Premier Bank (Feinerman, J.).Mailed notice. (jlj)
May 14, 2012 21 MINUTE entry before Honorable Gary Feinerman:Hearing on FDIC's motion to stay 10 and motion for reassignment 19 scheduled for 5/15/2012 is re-set for 9:45 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj)
May 11, 2012 20 NOTICE of Motion by Andrew J Abrams for presentment of motion to transfer case 19 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 5/15/2012 at 09:00 AM. (Abrams, Andrew)
May 11, 2012 19 MOTION by Defendant Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, as Receiver for Premier Bank to transfer case (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Abrams, Andrew)
May 8, 2012 18 RESPONSE by George D. Dernisin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, as Receiver for Premier Bank to stay proceedings pending exhaustion of statutorily mandated administrative remedies and memorandum in support 10 (Vail, Andrew)
May 1, 2012 17 MINUTE entry before Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion hearing held. FDICs motion to stay 10 is entered and continued. Plaintiff shall respond to the FDIC's motion by 5/8/2012; reply (if any) due by 5/11/2012. Hearing on the FDIC's motion 10 set for 5/15/2012 at 10:30 a.m. Mailed notice. (jlj)
April 30, 2012 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff George D. Dernis by Andrew D Hoeg (Hoeg, Andrew)
April 30, 2012 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff George D. Dernis by Andrew William Vail (Vail, Andrew)
April 30, 2012 14 MINUTE entry before Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion for extension of time to answer 12 is granted. Defendants Zulfikar Esmail and Shamim Esmail shall answer or otherwise plead to the complaint by 5/24/2012. Motion hearing scheduled for 5/1/2012 13 is stricken. Mailed notice. (jlj)
April 24, 2012 13 NOTICE of Motion by Elizabeth E Richert for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer 12 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 5/1/2012 at 09:00 AM. (Richert, Elizabeth)
April 24, 2012 12 MOTION by Defendants Dr. Zulfikar Esmail, Shamim Esmail for extension of time to file answer or otherwise plead (Richert, Elizabeth)
April 23, 2012 11 NOTICE of Motion by Andrew J Abrams for presentment of motion to stay, 10 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 5/1/2012 at 09:00 AM. (Abrams, Andrew)
April 23, 2012 10 MOTION by Plaintiff Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, as Receiver for Premier Bank to stay proceedings pending exhaustion of statutorily mandated administrative remedies and memorandum in support (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Abrams, Andrew)
April 23, 2012 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Dr. Zulfikar Esmail, Shamim Esmail by Eugene J. Schiltz (Schiltz, Eugene)
April 20, 2012 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Amyna Esmail, Kassim Esmail, Amyna Esmail 2006 Irrevocable Trust, Kassim Esmail 2006 Irrevocable Trust, Aliya Hussaini, Aliya Hussaini 2006 Irrevocable Trust by Robert Ronald Tepper (Tepper, Robert)
April 18, 2012 MAILED Notice of Removal letter with an attorney appearance form to counsel of record. (ao,)
April 18, 2012 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Dr. Zulfikar Esmail, Shamim Esmail by Robert F. Coleman (Coleman, Robert)
April 18, 2012 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Dr. Zulfikar Esmail, Shamim Esmail by Elizabeth E Richert (Richert, Elizabeth)
April 18, 2012 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Gary Feinerman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. (jn, )
April 18, 2012 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, as Receiver for Premier Bank by Vilia Margaret Dedinas (Dedinas, Vilia)
April 18, 2012 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, as Receiver for Premier Bank by Jasmina Djordjevic Varvitsiotis (Varvitsiotis, Jasmina)
April 17, 2012 3 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County Chancery Division, case number (2012 CH 09161) filed by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, as Receiver for Premier Bank Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0752-7058183. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A part 1, # 2 Exhibit A part 2, # 3 Exhibit A part 3, # 4 Exhibit A part 4, # 5 Exhibit A part 5, # 6 Exhibit A part 6, # 7 Exhibit A part 7, # 8 Exhibit B, # 9 Exhibit C, # 10 Exhibit D, # 11 Exhibit E)(Abrams, Andrew)
April 17, 2012 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, as Receiver for Premier Bank by Andrew J Abrams (Abrams, Andrew)
April 17, 2012 1 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Abrams, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Dernis v. Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, as Receiver for Premier Bank et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, as Receiver for Premier Bank
Represented By: Jasmina Djordjevic Varvitsiotis
Represented By: Vilia Margaret Dedinas
Represented By: Andrew J Abrams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Zulfikar Esmail
Represented By: Eugene J. Schiltz
Represented By: Elizabeth E Richert
Represented By: Robert F. Coleman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shamim Esmail
Represented By: Robert F. Coleman
Represented By: Elizabeth E Richert
Represented By: Eugene J. Schiltz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aliya Hussaini
Represented By: Robert Ronald Tepper
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aliya Hussaini 2006 Irrevocable Trust
Represented By: Robert Ronald Tepper
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kassim Esmail
Represented By: Robert Ronald Tepper
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kassim Esmail 2006 Irrevocable Trust
Represented By: Robert Ronald Tepper
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amyna Esmail
Represented By: Robert Ronald Tepper
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amyna Esmail 2006 Irrevocable Trust
Represented By: Robert Ronald Tepper
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George D. Dernis
Represented By: Andrew William Vail
Represented By: Andrew D Hoeg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]