Jackson v. Owens Corning, Asbestos Settlement Trust

Plaintiff: William Jackson
Defendant: Owens Corning, Asbestos Settlement Trust
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv04525
Filed: June 11, 2012
 
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: George M. Marovich
 
Nature of Suit: Asbestos Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 28, 2012 15 Featured Case WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable George M. Marovich on 8/28/2012:The Court sua sponte dismisses plaintiff's amended complaint for want of jurisdiction. (For further details see written opinion). Mailed notice(smm)
June 26, 2012 5 Featured Case WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable George M. Marovich on 6/26/2012:Petitioner William Jackson's petition 3 to proceed in forma pauperis is denied. Jackson's motion 4 for appointment of counsel is denied. Jackson is granted until 7/26/12 either to pay the filing fee or to file a new, complete and truthful petition to proceed in forma pauperis. (For further detail see written opinion). Mailed notice(smm)
August 7, 2012 9 Featured Case WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable George M. Marovich on 8/7/2012:Petitioner William Jackson's renewed petition 8 to proceed in forma pauperis is denied. The Court dismisses his complaint without prejudice. In order to proceed with this suit, Jackson must: (1) pay the filing fee of $350 by 9/11/12; and (2) file by 9/11/12 an amended complaint that adequately alleges a basis for this Court's jurisdiction. (For further detail see written opinion). Mailed notice(smm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Jackson v. Owens Corning, Asbestos Settlement Trust
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Jackson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Owens Corning, Asbestos Settlement Trust
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]