VLM Food Trading International, Inc. v. Illinois Trading Company et al

Plaintiff: VLM Food Trading International, Inc.
Defendant: Illinois Trading Company, Obee Family Partnership, Lawrence N. Oberman and FJ Management, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2012cv08154
Filed: October 10, 2012
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: Harry D. Leinenweber
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499 Agricultural Commodities Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 11, 2013 112 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 7/11/2013:Mailed notice(wp, )
February 14, 2013 57 Opinion or Order of the Court MOTION by Plaintiff VLM Food Trading International, Inc. for judgment as a matter of law (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Keaton, Michael)
March 5, 2013 70 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 3/5/2013:Mailed notice(wp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VLM Food Trading International, Inc. v. Illinois Trading Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VLM Food Trading International, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin Paul Kelley
Represented By: Michael John Keaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illinois Trading Company
Represented By: George D Sax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Obee Family Partnership
Represented By: George D Sax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence N. Oberman
Represented By: George D Sax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FJ Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.