United States of America V. Gaya

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Jose Gaya
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv09268
Filed: November 19, 2012
 
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: XX US, Outside the State of IL
Presiding Judge: Milton I. Shadur
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255 Remedies on motion attacking sentence
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 23, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 1/23/2013. Mailed notice by judge's staff. (srb,)
May 2, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 5/2/2013. Mailed notice by judge's staff. (srb,)
July 17, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ENTER MEMORANDUM Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 7/17/2013. Mailed notice by judge's staff. (srb,)
August 12, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 8/12/2013. Mailed notice by judge's staff. (srb,)
November 27, 2012 7 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 11/27/2012:Mailed notice(srn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: United States of America V. Gaya
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Andrew C. Porter
Represented By: AUSA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Gaya
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]