nClosures Inc. v. Block and Company Inc.

Plaintiff: nClosures Inc.
Defendant: Block and Company Inc.
Case Number: 1:2012cv09358
Filed: November 21, 2012
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: XX US, Outside the State of IL
Presiding Judge: Samuel Der-Yeghiayan
Nature of Suit: Personal Prop.: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 11, 2013 140 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion Signed by the Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan on 12/11/2013: Mailed notice (mw, )
January 15, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion Signed by the Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan on 1/15/2013: Mailed notice (mw, )
March 19, 2013 77 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion Signed by the Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan on 3/19/2013: Mailed notice (mw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: nClosures Inc. v. Block and Company Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: nClosures Inc.
Represented By: Martin D. Snyder
Represented By: Matthew Michael Wawrzyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Block and Company Inc.
Represented By: John Louis Alex
Represented By: Louis J Alex
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.