Illinois League of Advocates for the Developmental et al v. Illinois Department of Human Services et al

Defendant: Community Resource Alliance, Illinois Department of Human Services, Kevin Casey and Michelle R.B. Saddler
Plaintiff: Gail K. Myers, Barbara Cozzone-Achino, Robyn Pannier, Jeannie L. Williams, Robert Pokorny, Lauren Stengler, Rita Winkeler, Karen Kelly, Stan Krainiski, Illinois League of Advocates for the Developmentally Disabled, David Iacono-Harris, Elizabeth Gersbacher and Murray Parents Association, Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv01300
Filed: February 19, 2013
 
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Marvin E. Aspen
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 28, 2013 112 Featured Case MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 6/28/2013. Mailed notice(meg, )
July 18, 2013 135 Featured Case MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 7/18/2013. Mailed notice(meg, )
September 3, 2013 215 Featured Case MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 9/3/2013:Judicial staff mailed notice(gl, )
October 8, 2013 286 Featured Case MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 10/8/2013:Judicial staff mailed notice(gl, )
December 5, 2013 321 Featured Case MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 12/5/2013:Judicial staff mailed notice(gl, )
July 21, 2014 400 Featured Case MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. We deny Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction 8 . We also lift the temporary restraining order previously entered on June 12, 2013 90 . It is so ordered. Signed by the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 7/21/2014. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
June 20, 2013 98 Featured Case MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 6/20/2013:Judicial staff mailed notice(gl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Illinois League of Advocates for the Developmental et al v. Illinois Department of Human Services et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Community Resource Alliance
Represented By: Patrick J Boyle
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illinois Department of Human Services
Represented By: Thomas A. Ioppolo
Represented By: Marni M. Malowitz
Represented By: Laura Marie Rawski
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Casey
Represented By: Thomas A. Ioppolo
Represented By: Marni M. Malowitz
Represented By: Laura Marie Rawski
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle R.B. Saddler
Represented By: Thomas A. Ioppolo
Represented By: Marni M. Malowitz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gail K. Myers
Represented By: Sarah R Burky
Represented By: Kathleen Fitzgerald Howlett
Represented By: Judith Schwartz Sherwin
Represented By: Sherri L. Thornton-Pierce
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Cozzone-Achino
Represented By: Sherri L. Thornton-Pierce
Represented By: Judith Schwartz Sherwin
Represented By: Kathleen Fitzgerald Howlett
Represented By: Sarah R Burky
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robyn Pannier
Represented By: Sherri L. Thornton-Pierce
Represented By: Judith Schwartz Sherwin
Represented By: Kathleen Fitzgerald Howlett
Represented By: Sarah R Burky
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeannie L. Williams
Represented By: Judith Schwartz Sherwin
Represented By: Kathleen Fitzgerald Howlett
Represented By: Sarah R Burky
Represented By: Sherri L. Thornton-Pierce
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Pokorny
Represented By: Sarah R Burky
Represented By: Kathleen Fitzgerald Howlett
Represented By: Judith Schwartz Sherwin
Represented By: Sherri L. Thornton-Pierce
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren Stengler
Represented By: Sherri L. Thornton-Pierce
Represented By: Judith Schwartz Sherwin
Represented By: Sarah R Burky
Represented By: Kathleen Fitzgerald Howlett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rita Winkeler
Represented By: Sherri L. Thornton-Pierce
Represented By: Judith Schwartz Sherwin
Represented By: Kathleen Fitzgerald Howlett
Represented By: Sarah R Burky
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Kelly
Represented By: Sherri L. Thornton-Pierce
Represented By: Judith Schwartz Sherwin
Represented By: Sarah R Burky
Represented By: Kathleen Fitzgerald Howlett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stan Krainiski
Represented By: Judith Schwartz Sherwin
Represented By: Sherri L. Thornton-Pierce
Represented By: Sarah R Burky
Represented By: Kathleen Fitzgerald Howlett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Illinois League of Advocates for the Developmentally Disabled
Represented By: Sherri L. Thornton-Pierce
Represented By: Judith Schwartz Sherwin
Represented By: Kathleen Fitzgerald Howlett
Represented By: Sarah R Burky
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Iacono-Harris
Represented By: Sarah R Burky
Represented By: Kathleen Fitzgerald Howlett
Represented By: Judith Schwartz Sherwin
Represented By: Sherri L. Thornton-Pierce
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Gersbacher
Represented By: Sherri L. Thornton-Pierce
Represented By: Judith Schwartz Sherwin
Represented By: Kathleen Fitzgerald Howlett
Represented By: Sarah R Burky
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Murray Parents Association, Inc.
Represented By: Sherri L. Thornton-Pierce
Represented By: Judith Schwartz Sherwin
Represented By: Kathleen Fitzgerald Howlett
Represented By: Sarah R Burky
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]