Simpson v. Safeguard Properties, LLC

Plaintiff: Lucille Simpson
Defendant: Safeguard Properties, LLC
Case Number: 1:2013cv02453
Filed: April 2, 2013
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Will
Presiding Judge: Joan B. Gottschall
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 7, 2015 102 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 5/7/2015. Mailed notice(mjc, )
June 12, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 6/12/2013: Mailed notice(tlp, )
September 17, 2014 79 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 9/17/2014. Mailed notice(ef, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simpson v. Safeguard Properties, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucille Simpson
Represented By: Cathleen M. Combs
Represented By: Daniel A. Edelman
Represented By: James O. Latturner
Represented By: Sharon Goott Nissim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeguard Properties, LLC
Represented By: Jeremy P. Cole
Represented By: Gregory R. Hanthorn
Represented By: Meghan Eileen Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.