Owens et al v. Apple, Inc. Featured Case

As Reported on Ars Technica, the Plaintiffs allege that Apple intentionally misleads consumers by marketing on their iTunes Gift Cards that songs are $0.99 when many are $1.29

Plaintiff: Daniel E. Owens and Barbara S. Owens
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2009cv00479
Filed: June 24, 2009
Court: Illinois Southern District Court
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: St. Clair
Presiding Judge: William D. Stiehl
Referring Judge: Donald G. Wilkerson
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 9, 2011 53 Featured Case ORDER re 52 Status Report filed by Barbara S. Owens, Daniel E. Owens: Having reviewed the status report filed by Plaintiffs today(Doc. 52), the Court DIRECTS Plaintiffs to file another status report on June 9, 2011, unless action or events before then warrant the filing of an earlier report. [Status Report due by 6/9/2011]. Signed by Judge Michael J. Reagan on 3/9/11. (caa)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 9, 2011 52 STATUS REPORT by Barbara S. Owens, Daniel E. Owens. (Niemeyer, Mark)
December 20, 2010 51 Featured Case ORDER. In light of the representation of the parties that the case has settled, 43 Motion for Protective Order and 45 Motion for Protective Order are DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 12/20/2010. (hbs) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 9, 2010 50 Featured Case ORDER: Plaintiff's counsel has advised the Court that this action has settled but that a 60-day order would not be appropriate because additional time is required for preliminary and final approval of the settlement. Accordingly, the Court DIRECTS the parties to file a joint status report by March 9, 2011, unless events warrant the filing of an earlier report. [Status Report due by 3/9/2011]. Signed by Judge Michael J. Reagan on 12/9/10. (caa)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 6, 2010 49 Minute Entry for Telephonic Status Conference held before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 12/6/2010. Mark R. Niemeyer and James G. Onder appeared by phone on behalf of Plaintiffs; John W. Rogers and Andrew Muhlbach appeared by phone on behalf of Defendant. Parties informed the Court that the case has settled, but more than 60 days will be required to finalize settlement. (hbs) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 2, 2010 48 Minute Entry for Telephonic Status Conference held before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 11/2/2010. Mark R. Niemeyer and James G. Onder appeared by phone on behalf of Plaintiffs; John W. Rogers and Andrew Muhlbach appeared by phone on behalf of Defendant. The parties informed the Court that the October 2010 private mediation was successful, but many details remain unresolved. The parties reported that they would be meeting a second time with the private mediator to work out the final details of settlement. A second Telephonic Status Conference is set for 12/6/2010 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson. At that conference the parties will report to the Court whether settlement has been finalized. Plaintiffs are directed to initiate the conference call by dialing the Court's teleconference number, (618) 482-9004, after all parties are on the line. The parties are reminded that the schedule previously entered by the Court remains in effect. (hbs) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 4, 2010 47 Featured Case ORDER. A Telephonic Status Conference is set for 11/2/2010 at 2:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson. Plaintiffs shall initiate the telephonic conference and call the Court's teleconference line (618/482-9004) after all parties are on the line. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 10/4/2010. (hbs) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 9, 2010 46 Featured Case ORDER. The Court has been informed that the private mediation scheduled for 8/23/2010 was canceled and reset for 9/28/2010. In light of this change, Counsel for Plaintiff is directed to notify the Court by telephone by 10/1/2010 the results of that private mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 9/9/2010. (hbs) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 26, 2010 45 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Apple, Inc., Barbara S. Owens, Daniel E. Owens. (Rogers, John)
July 26, 2010 44 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re 43 Motion for Protective Order filed by Barbara S. Owens, Daniel E. Owens. See attached document for specifics (jaj)
July 25, 2010 43 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Barbara S. Owens, Daniel E. Owens. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Protective Order)(Kruse, Michael)
June 4, 2010 42 Featured Case ORDER. The Settlement Conference scheduled for 8/25/2010 is hereby VACATED. Counsel for plaintiff shall notify the Court by telephone by 8/25/2010 the results of the private mediation currently scheduled for 8/23/2010 in California. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 6/4/2010. (hbs) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 8, 2010 41 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 3/8/2010. (jmp)
March 8, 2010 40 Featured Case ORDER AND NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 8/25/2010 at 9:00 AM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson. (jmp)
March 8, 2010 39 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 11/1/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 3/8/2010. (jmp)
March 8, 2010 38 Minute Entry for Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 3/8/2010 before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson. Michael S. Kruse, James G. Onder, and Mark R. Niemeyer appeared by phone on behalf of Plaintiffs; John W. Rogers and Kathy A. Wisniewski appeared by phone on behalf of Defendant. Scheduling orders to issue. (hbs) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 10, 2010 37 Featured Case ORDER granting 36 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice regarding Attorney Christopher Hood; 34 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice regarding Attorney Gayle L. Douglas; and 35 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice regarding Attorney W. Lewis Garrison, Jr. for Plaintiffs Daniel E. Owens and Barbara S. Owens. (jaj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 9, 2010 36 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by AttorneyChristopher B. Hood $100 fee paid,receipt number 0754-1047016 by on behalf of Barbara S. Owens, Daniel E. Owens. (Hood, Christopher)
February 9, 2010 35 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by AttorneyWilliam L. Garrison, Jr $100 fee paid,receipt number 0754-1047003 by on behalf of Barbara S. Owens, Daniel E. Owens. (Garrison, William)
February 9, 2010 34 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by AttorneyGayle L. Douglas $100 fee paid,receipt number 0754-1046988 by on behalf of Barbara S. Owens, Daniel E. Owens. (Douglas, Gayle)
January 14, 2010 33 ANSWER to 26 Amended Complaint by Apple, Inc..(Rogers, John)
December 30, 2009 32 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Telephonic Scheduling/Discovery Conference set for 3/5/2010 at 2:00 PM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson. (jmp)
December 30, 2009 31 Featured Case ORDER granting 30 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Apple Inc. shall file a responsive pleading by 1/14/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 12/30/2009. (hbs) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 23, 2009 30 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Unopposed) by Apple, Inc.. (Rogers, John)
December 23, 2009 29 CJRA TRACK D assigned: Final Pretrial Conference is set for 7/8/2011, 10:00 AM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Judge Michael J. Reagan. Jury Trial is set for 7/25/2011, 09:00 AM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Judge Michael J. Reagan. Assigned by Judge Michael J. Reagan on 12/23/09. (acm)
December 21, 2009 28 Featured Case ORDER denying 17 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Michael J. Reagan on 12/21/09. (caa)
December 21, 2009 27 Featured Case ORDER: In response to the Court's Order of December 8, 2009, Plaintiffs filed an amended complaint. The Court has verified that subject matter jurisdiction lies under 28 USC 1332, and a firm trial date now will be assigned. Signed by Judge Michael J. Reagan on 12/21/09. (caa)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 18, 2009 26 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Apple, Inc., filed by Daniel E. Owens, Barbara S. Owens.(Kruse, Michael)
December 8, 2009 25 Featured Case ORDER Regarding Action due by 12/21/2009: This case comes before the undersigned District Judge on threshold review, the purpose of which is to ascertain whether federal subject matter jurisdiction lies under the federal diversity statute (28 U.S.C. 1332). The complaint fails to properly address the citizenship of Plaintiffs Daniel and Barbara Owens. Under the diversity statute, "district courts... have original jurisdiction of any civil action in which the matter in controversy exceeds the sum or value of $5,000,000, exclusive of interest and costs, and is a class action in which... (A) any member of a class of plaintiffs is a citizen of a State different from any defendant;..." 28 U.S.C. 1332(d)(2)(A). The complaint pleads Plaintiffs' "residence" as opposed to their "citizenship." The law of this Circuit plainly provides that residence and citizenship are not synonyms, and "it is the latter that matters for purposes of diversity jurisdiction." Camico Mutual Ins. Co. v. Citizens Bank, 474 F.3d 989, 992 (7th Cir. 2007). Accordingly, the Court DIRECTS Plaintiffs' counsel - on or before 12/21/2009 - to file an amended complaint properly setting forth Plaintiffs' citizenship. [Action due by 12/21/2009]. Signed by Judge Michael J. Reagan on 12/8/09. (caa)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 13, 2009 24 REPLY to Response to Motion re 17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Apple, Inc.. (Rogers, John)
October 2, 2009 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Apple, Inc.. (Rogers, John)
September 28, 2009 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re 17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Daniel E. Owens, Barbara S. Owens. (Niemeyer, Mark)
August 27, 2009 21 MEMORANDUM in Support re 17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Apple, Inc.. (Rogers, John)
August 27, 2009 20 Featured Case ORDER: The Court GRANTS 19 Unopposed Motion for Leave to Withdraw Brief and File Substitute Brief. The Court hereby withdraws Apple's brief in support of its motion to dismiss (Doc. 18) and grants leave to file a corrected brief. Signed by Judge Michael J. Reagan on 082709. (caa)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 27, 2009 19 MOTION for Leave to File Unopposed Motion for Leave to Withdrawal Brief and File Substitute Brief by Apple, Inc.. (Rogers, John)
August 26, 2009 18 WITHDRAWN (See Order at doc. 20) - MEMORANDUM in Support re 17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Apple, Inc.. (Rogers, John) Modified on 8/27/2009 (tkm ).
August 26, 2009 17 MOTION to Dismiss by Apple, Inc.. Responses due by 9/28/2009 (Rogers, John)
July 22, 2009 16 NOTICE of Appearance by James G. Onder on behalf of Daniel E. Owens, Barbara S. Owens (Onder, James)
July 16, 2009 15 Featured Case ORDER granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall file a responsive pleading by 8/26/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 7/16/2009. (hbs) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 16, 2009 14 NOTICE of Appearance by John W. Rogers on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Rogers, John)
July 15, 2009 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Apple, Inc.. (Wisniewski, Kathy)
July 15, 2009 12 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re 10 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Barbara S. Owens, Daniel E. Owens. See attached document for specifics (tkm )
July 15, 2009 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark R. Niemeyer on behalf of Daniel E. Owens, Barbara S. Owens (Niemeyer, Mark)
July 15, 2009 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Daniel E. Owens, Barbara S. Owens. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order - Deleted)(Niemeyer, Mark) Modified on 7/15/2009 (tkm ).
July 14, 2009 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Apple, Inc.. (Wisniewski, Kathy)
July 14, 2009 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathy A. Wisniewski on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Wisniewski, Kathy)
July 13, 2009 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daniel E. Owens, Barbara S. Owens. Apple, Inc. served on 7/6/2009, answer due 7/27/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)(Kruse, Michael)
July 13, 2009 6 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking 5 Return of Service Executed filed by Barbara S. Owens, Daniel E. Owens. See attached document for specifics (tkm )
July 13, 2009 5 ENTRY STRICKEN - RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED by Daniel E. Owens, Barbara S. Owens on July 6, 2009. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)(Kruse, Michael) Modified on 7/13/2009 (tkm ).
June 30, 2009 4 Featured Case ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge William D. Stiehl recused. Case reassigned to Judge Michael J. Reagan for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge William D. Stiehl on 06/30/09. (jkb)
June 30, 2009 3 Summons Issued as to Apple, Inc.. (lmt)
June 24, 2009 2 COMPLAINT against all defendants (Filing fee $ 350.), filed by Daniel E. Owens, Barbara S. Owens. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kruse, Michael)
June 24, 2009 1 Case Opened. Filing fee paid $350.00, Receipt Number 34625013797. Documents may now be electronically filed. Case number 09-479-WDS must be placed on all documents prior to filing them electronically. (Attachments: # 1 notice of consent to magistrate judge)(lmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Owens et al v. Apple, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel E. Owens
Represented By: Michael S. Kruse
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara S. Owens
Represented By: Michael S. Kruse
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]