Casimere-Cooks v. AT&T Umbrella Benefit Plan No. 1 - AT&T Sickness and Accident Disability Plan for Occupational Employees et al

Plaintiff: Lawanda Casimere-Cooks
Defendant: AT&T Umbrella Benefit Plan No. 1 - AT&T Sickness and Accident Disability Plan for Occupational Employees, AT&T Inc. and AT&T Corp
 
Case Number: 3:2011cv00402
Filed: May 12, 2011
 
Court: Illinois Southern District Court
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: St. Clair
Presiding Judge: David R. Herndon
Referring Judge: Donald G. Wilkerson
 
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 13, 2011 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Defendants to file Rule 7.1 disclosures by June 27, 2011. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 6/13/11. (klh, )
July 18, 2011 12 Opinion or Order of the Court 60 DAY ORDER advising that case has settled. Responses due by 9/19/2011. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 7/18/11. (skp)
August 30, 2011 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice pursuant to the stipulation of dismissal. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 8/30/11. (klh, )
August 30, 2011 15 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT dismissing case with prejudice. Approved by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 8/30/11. (skp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Casimere-Cooks v. AT&T Umbrella Benefit Plan No. 1 - AT&T Sickness and Accident Disability Plan for Occupational Employees et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawanda Casimere-Cooks
Represented By: Mark C. Scoggins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Umbrella Benefit Plan No. 1 - AT&T Sickness and Accident Disability Plan for Occupational Employees
Represented By: Eric P. Mathisen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Inc.
Represented By: Eric P. Mathisen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Corp
Represented By: Eric P. Mathisen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]