Crompton v. BNSF Railway Company

Plaintiff: Brian Crompton
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
 
Case Number: 3:2011cv00431
Filed: May 23, 2011
 
Court: Illinois Southern District Court
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: Marion
Presiding Judge: J. Phil Gilbert
Referring Judge: Donald G. Wilkerson
 
Nature of Suit: Federal Employers Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 27, 2012 40 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 26 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by BNSF Railway Company. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 9/26/2012. (dka, )
December 3, 2012 80 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT (NJR/dka) in favor of Brian Crompton against BNSF Railway Company for a total recovery of $1,600,000.00. Approved by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 12/3/2012. (dka, )
January 16, 2013 95 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. Clerk of Court to tax costs in the amount of $10,739.93. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 1/16/13. (bkl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Crompton v. BNSF Railway Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Crompton
Represented By: Randall Seth Crompton
Represented By: Eric D. Holland
Represented By: Steven J. Stolze
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]