Boothe et al v. Marshall Browning Hospital et al

Plaintiff: Patrick E. Boothe and Judy Boothe
Defendant: Marshall Browning Hospital and K. Rajasekhara Warrier, M.D.
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv00025
Filed: January 10, 2012
 
Court: Illinois Southern District Court
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Reagan
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Williams
 
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 26, 2012 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Threshold Jurisdictional Review, setting March 30, 2012, deadline for Plaintiffs to file a jurisdictional memorandum. Signed by Judge Michael J. Reagan on 3/26/2012. (mmr)
August 13, 2012 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, GRANTING 23 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction & Failure to State a Claim filed by K. Rajasekhara Warrier, M.D.. August 31, 2012, deadline set for Plaintiffs to seek leave to amend. Failure to file a motion by that deadline w ill automatically cause Dr. Warrier to be dismissed as a party, with prejudice. Similarly, failure to secure leave to amend the complaint will result in the dismissal of Dr. Warrier, with prejudice. See Order for details.Signed by Judge Michael J. Reagan on 8/13/2012. (mmr)
October 31, 2012 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, DENYING 38 MOTION to Dismiss Count III of the Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by K. Rajasekhara Warrier, M.D. Signed by Judge Michael J. Reagan on 10/31/2012. (mmr)
October 4, 2013 85 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT IN A CIVIL CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 10/4/13. (amv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Boothe et al v. Marshall Browning Hospital et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick E. Boothe
Represented By: Kennith W. Blan, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Boothe
Represented By: Kennith W. Blan, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshall Browning Hospital
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Rajasekhara Warrier, M.D.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]