Boyles et al v. United States of America et al

Plaintiff: Kenneth E Boyles and Leeann Boyles
Defendant: United States of America and Eric Shineski
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv00197
Filed: March 2, 2012
 
Court: Illinois Southern District Court
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: J. Phil Gilbert
Referring Judge: Donald G. Wilkerson
 
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 1, 2012 20 Featured Case ENTRY granting Defendants' 14 Motion to Transfer Venue. This cause is hereby transferred to the Southern District of Illinois, Benton Division. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 3/1/2012. (PG) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 3/2/2012.]
April 15, 2013 52 Featured Case ORDER granting 45 Motion to Substitute Party. Amended Complaint due by April 18, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 4/15/13. (sgp)
July 31, 2013 83 Featured Case ORDER granting 72 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or, in the alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment: For the reasons thoroughly delineated in the attached Memorandum and Order, the Court (construing the motion as one for dismissa l, not summary judgment) GRANTS Defendant USA's motion (Doc. 72) and DISMISSES without prejudice Plaintiffs' first amended complaint (Doc. 53) based on Plaintiffs' failure to fully exhaust under 28 U.S.C. 2675(a). No operative/viable complaint remains before the Court at this time, and the Court sets an August 21, 2013 deadline for Plaintiffs to take action (see Order for details). Signed by Judge Michael J. Reagan on 7/31/13. (soh )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Boyles et al v. United States of America et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth E Boyles
Represented By: Hugo E. Martz
Represented By: Andrew E. Lucas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leeann Boyles
Represented By: Hugo E. Martz
Represented By: Andrew E. Lucas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: James M. Hipkiss
Represented By: Margaret A. Schutte
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Shineski
Represented By: James M. Hipkiss
Represented By: Margaret A. Schutte
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]