Super Products, LLC v. Hydro-Exc. Inc.

Plaintiff: Super Products, LLC
Defendant: Hydro-Exc. Inc. and Navistar, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv00272
Filed: March 28, 2012
Court: Illinois Southern District Court
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: David R. Herndon
Referring Judge: Donald G. Wilkerson
Nature of Suit: Property Damage Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 17, 2012 22 Opinion or Order of the Court 60 DAY ORDER advising that case has settled. Responses due by 7/19/2012. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 5/17/12. (skp)
July 24, 2012 23 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT dismissing case with prejudice. Approved by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 7/24/12. (skp)
April 4, 2012 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing defendant to submit a jurisdictional briefaddressing the issue of the citizenship of plaintiff. The brief is due by 4/20/2012. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 4/4/2012. (msdi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Super Products, LLC v. Hydro-Exc. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Super Products, LLC
Represented By: Bradley S Levison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hydro-Exc. Inc.
Represented By: Aaron D. French
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navistar, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.