Russell v. CSX Transportation, Inc.

Plaintiff: James Melvin Russell
Defendant: CSX Transportation, Inc.
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv00316
Filed: April 17, 2012
 
Court: Illinois Southern District Court
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: Jefferson
Referring Judge: Philip M. Frazier
Presiding Judge: David R. Herndon
 
Nature of Suit: Federal Employers Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 9, 2012 17 Featured Case ORDER granting 11 Motion to Strike. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 7/9/12. (mtm)
March 4, 2014 50 Featured Case ORDER denying 41 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CSX Transportation, Inc. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/8/2014 at 9:00 AM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Chief Judge David R. Herndon. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 3/3/2014. (mtm)
March 11, 2014 52 Featured Case 60 DAY ORDER advising case has settled. Responses due by 5/15/2014. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 3/11/2014. (slj)
May 1, 2014 62 Featured Case ORDER re 61 Order Dismissing Case. The Court inadvertently failed to attach the pdf to the text entry. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 5/1/2014. (mtm)
May 2, 2014 63 Featured Case CLERK'S JUDGMENT dismissing case with prejudice.. Approved by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 5/2/14. (cekf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Russell v. CSX Transportation, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Melvin Russell
Represented By: John P. Kujawski
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX Transportation, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]