Travelstead v. Commissioner of Social Security

Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Anthony E Travelstead
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv00896
Filed: August 13, 2012
 
Court: Illinois Southern District Court
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: Gallatin
Presiding Judge: J. Phil Gilbert
Referring Judge: Clifford J. Proud
 
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 26, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 23 Motion to Remand. The Clerk of Court shall enter judgment in favor of plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Clifford J. Proud on 6/26/2013. (jmt)
July 29, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 27 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Clifford J. Proud on 7/29/2013. (jmt)
August 23, 2012 5 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Granting 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Anthony E Travelstead. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 8/23/12. (bkl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Travelstead v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony E Travelstead
Represented By: Barry A. Schultz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]