Levine v. Barnes-Jewish Hospital et al

Defendant: Barnes-Jewish Hospital and Washington University
Plaintiff: Susan R Levine
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv00948
Filed: August 28, 2012
 
Court: Illinois Southern District Court
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: Marion
Presiding Judge: David R. Herndon
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Williams
 
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 28, 2014 46 Opinion or Order of the Court 60 DAY ORDER. Responses due by 9/29/2014. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 7/28/14. (cekf)
September 12, 2014 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. The Court acknowledges 48 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice and Without Costs is hereby dismissed with prejudice. As both defendants have now been dismissed with prejudice, this action is hereby DISMISSED with prejudice. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 9/12/14. (lmp)
September 15, 2014 50 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT dismissing case with prejudice. Approved by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 9/15/14. (cekf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Levine v. Barnes-Jewish Hospital et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barnes-Jewish Hospital
Represented By: Theodore J. MacDonald, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel W. Farroll
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington University
Represented By: Alphonse J. Pranaitis, Jr.
Represented By: David A. Schott
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan R Levine
Represented By: Joseph A. Bartholomew
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]