Jefferson v. Hodge et al

Defendant: AFSME, Assistant Warden Storm, Ernest Shelton, Gina Allen, Director Godinez and Marc Hodge
Plaintiff: Walter Jefferson
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00106
Filed: February 4, 2013
 
Court: Illinois Southern District Court
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: Lawrence
Presiding Judge: G. Patrick Murphy
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 22, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson. The Fourteenth Amendment due process and equal protection claims in Counts 1 and 2, and the Eighth Amendment (non-food related) condition of confinement claims in Count 3 are DISMISSED w ith prejudice. The claims in Count 4 regarding the temperature of the breakfast meals and Plaintiff's inability to go to the dining hall to eat breakfast are DISMISSED with prejudice. Plaintiff's Eighth Amendment claims in Count 4 regard ing inadequate nutrition are DISMISSED without prejudice. Defendants GODINEZ and STORM shall be DISMISSED from this action without prejudice. The Clerk of Court shall prepare for Defendants DENSMORE, KOHN and LINGLE: (1) Form 5 (Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons), and (2) Form 6 (Waiver of Service of Summons). Signed by Judge G. Patrick Murphy on 5/21/2013. (tjk)
September 30, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court RULE 56 NOTICE and ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 9/30/13. (sgp)
November 5, 2013 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 7 Order Directing Prisoner Payment and initial filing fee.Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 11/5/13. (sgp)
January 15, 2014 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART 56 Motion to Amend/Correct; DENYING 62 Motion for Reconsideration ; DENYING 62 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 1/15/14. (sgp)
February 12, 2014 69 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 64 in its entirety. The Court grants the motion for summary judgment filed by defendants Hodge, Densmore, Lingle and Kohn 37 . The Court denies the motion for summary judgment filed by plai ntiff Walter Jefferson 45 and dismisses without prejudice count 4 against defendants Densmore, Kohn, Lingle and Hodge (in his official capacity) to the extent it complains of unsanitary food trays, and directs the Clerk of Court to enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 2/12/2014. (jdh)
March 22, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER : Defendant AFSCME and all claims lodged against that union are DISMISSED with prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction under 42 U.S.C. § 1983. Plaintiff's Fourteenth Amendment equal protection claim is DISMISSED with prejudi ce for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Plaintiff's claim against Defendants SHELTON, HODGE, ALLEN and GODINEZ, regarding the denial of his December 4, 2012, grievance is DISMISSED with prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Plaintiff's Eighth Amendment conditions of confinement claims(s) shall beDISMISSED without prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted.Should Plaintiff wish to proceed with his Eighth Amendment conditions of confinement claim, the amended complaint shall be filed with this Court on or before April 22, 2013. (Action due by 4/22/2013). Signed by Judge G. Patrick Murphy on 3/22/2013. (tjk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Jefferson v. Hodge et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AFSME
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assistant Warden Storm
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernest Shelton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gina Allen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Godinez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc Hodge
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Jefferson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]